Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. v. Willis
Plaintiff: Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.
Defendant: Nareasha D. Willis and Avenue N, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv08912
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. Document filed by Nareasha D. Willis, Avenue N, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Vogue Article on Defendants, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Plaintiff's use of V-Black, #3 Affidavit Verification of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff)(White, Norman)
November 23, 2018 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Avenue N, LLC.(White, Norman)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Avenue N, LLC served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service was accepted by Keith White, Esq.. Document filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. (Lavine, Jordan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Norman Keith White, Jr on behalf of Avenue N, LLC. (White, Norman)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Norman Keith White, Jr on behalf of Nareasha D. Willis. (White, Norman)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Avenue N, LLC. (sj)
November 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan Andrew Lavine. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Avenue N, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Avenue N, LLC, re: #11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. (Lavine, Jordan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Nareasha D. Willis, Avenue N, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Lavine, Jordan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nareasha D. Willis served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. Service was accepted by Keith White, Esq.. Document filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. (Lavine, Jordan)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Initial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/26/2018) (jca)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nareasha D. Willis. (dnh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Lavine, Jordan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nareasha D. Willis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. (Lavine, Jordan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lavine, Jordan)
October 1, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jordan Andrew Lavine to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Nature of Suit codes selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 1, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Jordan Andrew Lavine to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Advance Publications, Inc. for Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. Document filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc..(Lavine, Jordan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lavine, Jordan) Modified on 10/1/2018 (jgo).
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nareasha D. Willis. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15633110)Document filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lavine, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. v. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nareasha D. Willis
Represented By: Norman Keith White, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avenue N, LLC
Represented By: Norman Keith White, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Andrew Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?