In Re: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Appellee: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Appellant: Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Wintrust Mortgage Corporation, Arlington Capital Mortgage Corporation, Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc., Loan Simple, Inc., MC Advantage, LLC, Guild Mortgage Company, First Mortgage Corporation, loanDeport.com, LLC, Ross Mortgage Corporation, First National Bank of Omaha, WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP, Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc., CMG Mortgage, Inc., Residential Home Funding Corp., Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P., BWC Mortgage Services, PMC Bancorp., PMAC Lending Services, Inc., MegaStar Financial Corp., Security National Mortgage Company, New Fed Mortgage Corp., Approved Funding Corp., Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Oaktree Funding Corp., Bondcorp Realty Services, Inc., Republic State Mortgage Co., Response Mortgage Services, Inc., Broadview Mortgage Corporation, Congressional Bancshares, Inc., imortgage.com, Inc., Sun America Mortgage Company, Suburban Mortgage, Inc., Ditech Financial LLC, Mega Capital Funding, Inc., Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation and Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv08986
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Referring Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company. (Lenz, George)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #41 Motion for Tracy L. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/28/2018) (js)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #43 Motion for George Ehrich Lenz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/28/2018) (js)
November 27, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for George Ehrich Lenz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Guild Mortgage Company. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 26, 2018 Filing 45 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 JOINT MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Courts Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Security National Mortgage Company. (Attachments: #1 Legislative History of 1292(b))(Price, Gifford)
November 26, 2018 Filing 44 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 JOINT MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Courts Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. . Document filed by Security National Mortgage Company. (Price, Gifford)
November 26, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for George Ehrich Lenz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Guild Mortgage Company. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Guild Mortgage Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lenz, George)
November 26, 2018 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for George Ehrich Lenz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15957324. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Guild Mortgage Company.(Lenz, George) Modified on 11/27/2018 (wb).
November 20, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Tracy L. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15941141. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Tracy L. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15941141. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Approved Funding Corp., Arlington Capital Mortgage Corporation, BWC Mortgage Services, Bondcorp Realty Services, Inc., Broadview Mortgage Corporation, CMG Mortgage, Inc., Congressional Bancshares, Inc., First Mortgage Corporation, Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P., Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc., Loan Simple, Inc., MC Advantage, LLC, Mega Capital Funding, Inc., New Fed Mortgage Corp., Oaktree Funding Corp., Republic State Mortgage Co., Residential Home Funding Corp., Ross Mortgage Corporation, Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc., Sun America Mortgage Company, WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP, Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration (28 U.S.C. 1746) of Tracy L. Henderson, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, Tracy)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part #39 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. This application is granted in part. Appellants may file areply brief of no more than 25 pages. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/5/2018) (js)
November 2, 2018 Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (on behalf of all Appellants) addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jonathan M. Jenkins dated 11/02/2018. Document filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc..(Jenkins, Jonathan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maritza Dominguez Braswell on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Braswell, Maritza)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE; granting #36 Motion for Jonathan M. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/24/2018) (js)
October 24, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 AMENDED MOTION for Jonathan M. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Originally Filed at #19 ). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 36 AMENDED MOTION for Jonathan M. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Originally Filed at #19 ). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jonathan M. Jenkins, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Cert - Cal. Sup. Crt., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Jonathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Courts Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue., #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal, #25 JOINT MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Courts Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue., #15 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lawlor, James)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #30 Motion for Maritza Dominguez Braswell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/18/2018) (js)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/18/2018) (rj)
October 18, 2018 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James N. Lawlor dated October 18, 2018. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Lawlor, James)
October 17, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Maritza Dominguez Braswell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15759432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lani A. Adler on behalf of Suburban Mortgage, Inc.. (Adler, Lani)
October 16, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Maritza Dominguez Braswell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15759432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Maritza Dominguez Braswell, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rollin, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Andrew Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. New Address: Fox Rothschild LLP, 101 Park Avenue, 17th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10178, 212-878-7900. (Rollin, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Andrew Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gina Lauren Del Tatto on behalf of Guaranteed Rate, Inc.. (Del Tatto, Gina)
October 16, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gifford W. Price on behalf of Security National Mortgage Company. (Price, Gifford)
October 16, 2018 Filing 25 JOINT MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Courts Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC, First National Bank of Omaha, Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Guild Mortgage Company, MegaStar Financial Corp., PMAC Lending Services, Inc., PMC Bancorp., Response Mortgage Services, Inc., Security National Mortgage Company, Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc., Suburban Mortgage, Inc., imortgage.com, Inc., loanDeport.com, LLC.(Valinoti, Jack)
October 16, 2018 Filing 24 JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC, First National Bank of Omaha, Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Guild Mortgage Company, MegaStar Financial Corp., PMAC Lending Services, Inc., PMC Bancorp., Response Mortgage Services, Inc., Security National Mortgage Company, Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc., Suburban Mortgage, Inc., imortgage.com, Inc., loanDeport.com, LLC. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Valinoti, Jack)
October 16, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Michael Jenkins on behalf of Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Jenkins, Jonathan)
October 16, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Jonathan M. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Appellant Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15757420. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Courts Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by Approved Funding Corp., Arlington Capital Mortgage Corporation, BWC Mortgage Services, Bondcorp Realty Services, Inc., Broadview Mortgage Corporation, CMG Mortgage, Inc., Congressional Bancshares, Inc., First Mortgage Corporation, Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P., Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc., Loan Simple, Inc., MC Advantage, LLC, Mega Capital Funding, Inc., New Fed Mortgage Corp., Oaktree Funding Corp., Republic State Mortgage Co., Residential Home Funding Corp., Ross Mortgage Corporation, Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc., Sun America Mortgage Company, WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP, Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation.(Valinoti, Jack)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Approved Funding Corp., Arlington Capital Mortgage Corporation, BWC Mortgage Services, Bondcorp Realty Services, Inc., Broadview Mortgage Corporation, CMG Mortgage, Inc., Congressional Bancshares, Inc., First Mortgage Corporation, Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P., Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc., Loan Simple, Inc., MC Advantage, LLC, Mega Capital Funding, Inc., New Fed Mortgage Corp., Oaktree Funding Corp., Republic State Mortgage Co., Residential Home Funding Corp., Ross Mortgage Corporation, Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc., Sun America Mortgage Company, WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP, Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Valinoti, Jack)
October 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Vincent Valinoti on behalf of Approved Funding Corp., Arlington Capital Mortgage Corporation, BWC Mortgage Services, Bondcorp Realty Services, Inc., Broadview Mortgage Corporation, CMG Mortgage, Inc., Congressional Bancshares, Inc., First Mortgage Corporation, Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P., Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc., Loan Simple, Inc., MC Advantage, LLC, Mega Capital Funding, Inc., New Fed Mortgage Corp., Oaktree Funding Corp., Republic State Mortgage Co., Residential Home Funding Corp., Ross Mortgage Corporation, Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc., Sun America Mortgage Company, WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP, Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation. (Valinoti, Jack)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan M. Jenkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Appellant Sierra Pacific Mortgage Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15757420. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration (28 U.S.C. 1746) of Jonathan M. Jenkins, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Jonathan) Modified on 10/16/2018 (wb).
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Security National Mortgage Company. (Magaliff, Howard)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Andrew Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Michael Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Venditto, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court to the SDNY from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated August 13, 2018 (Notice of Appeal from SDNY Case No. 18-CV-9006 (VEC) Pursuant to Consolidation Order Docket # 12) re: #12 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Venditto, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Venditto on behalf of Ditech Financial LLC. (Venditto, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/26/2018. Motions due by 10/16/2018. Responses due by 10/22/2018 Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-08986-VEC, 1:18-cv-09006-VEC, 1:18-cv-09176-VEC(ama)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting in part (4) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting in part (5) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases. WHEREAS LHBI has moved to consolidate all of the above-referenced cases; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. LHBI's motion for consolidation is granted in part. Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18- CV-9006, and 18-CV-9176 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes onto the docket of Case No. 18-CV-8986. No later than October 16, 2018, the Appellants in Case Nos. 18-CV- 9006 and 18-CV-9176 must resubmit their notices of appeal and motions for leave to appeal on the docket of Case No. 18-CV-8986. By the same date, all parties in Case Nos. 18-CV-9006 and 18-CV-9176 must file notices of appearance in Case No. 18-CV-8986. All parties in Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18-CV-9006, and 18-CV-9176 must file all future submissions on the docket of Case No. 18-CV-8986. 2. The Court will not, however, consolidate the above referenced cases with Case No. 18-MC-392; to the extent that LHBI moves to consolidate Case No. 18-MC-392 with the other cases, that motion is denied. 3. No later than October 22, 2018, LHBI must file a single, omnibus brief in response to the motions for leave to appeal that have been filed in Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18- CV-9006, and 18-CV-9176. No later than November 26, 2018, the Appellants in these cases must file a single, joint reply brief in support of their motions. 4. All parties are directed to review the undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Caproni. 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to DOCKET this order in Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18-CV-9006, 18-CV-9176, and 18-MC-392. The Clerk is further directed to CLOSE Case Nos. 18-CV-9006 and 18-CV-9176, and to terminate all open motions therein. 6. LHBI is responsible for distributing copies of this order to all parties in the above-referenced cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-08986-VEC, 1:18-cv-09006-VEC, 1:18-cv-09176-VEC (ama)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 10, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-09006-UA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER terminating [28 in 18-MC-392] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: If the Appellee requires an extension of time to respond in the case that has not yet been docketed, the Appellee must submit this application to the Part I judge. Given that the case has not yet been docketed or assigned to any Judge, this Court has no power to grant that request. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/9/2018) (jwh)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Appellee shall have an additional two weeks to file its oppositions to the motions for appeal in this case and in case no. l8-cv-8986. The requests to deem these cases related and to consolidate them remain pending. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this endorsed letter in both case no. 18-cv-8986 and 18-cv-9006. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 10/22/2018) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/5/2018) (jca)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (DeFilippo, Paul)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James N. Lawlor dated October 4, 2018. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Lawlor, James)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mara Rose Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James N Lawlor on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lawlor, James)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #9 Notice) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (DeFilippo, Paul) Modified on 10/5/2018 (db).
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-cv-09006; 18-mc-000392 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from James N. Lawlor dated October 3, 2018. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Lawlor, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Wintrust Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(bkar)
October 1, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
October 1, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated August 13, 2018. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 16-1019A, 08-B-13555 (SCC). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Wintrust Mortgage Corporation, Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Adam Michael Bialek
Represented By: Michael Andrew Rollin
Represented By: James N Lawlor
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: Mara Rose Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Franke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wintrust Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Andrea J. Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Arlington Capital Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Loan Simple, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MC Advantage, LLC
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Guild Mortgage Company
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: George Ehrich Lenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: First Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: loanDeport.com, LLC
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ross Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CMG Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Residential Home Funding Corp.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BWC Mortgage Services
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PMC Bancorp.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Amjad M. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PMAC Lending Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Amjad M. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MegaStar Financial Corp.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Security National Mortgage Company
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Howard P. Magaliff
Represented By: Gifford W. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: New Fed Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Approved Funding Corp.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Christopher James Houpt
Represented By: Thomas V Panoff
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Gina Lauren Del Tatto
Represented By: Christopher Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oaktree Funding Corp.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bondcorp Realty Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Republic State Mortgage Co.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Response Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Larry Tillem
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Allison Michelle Holubis
Represented By: Peter Alexander Meisels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Broadview Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Congressional Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: imortgage.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sun America Mortgage Company
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Suburban Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Lani A. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Venditto
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mega Capital Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Jenkins
Represented By: Jack Vincent Valinoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?