De Jesus Aguirre et al v. Maxdelivery 2, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abelardo Perez Torralba, Valente Ascencio, Jesus Angel Basurto, Roman Olguin, Adrian Olguin Martinez, Javier De Jesus Armenta, Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano, Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon, Misael Leon Sanchez, Javier Flores Segundo, Armando Rafael Mesinas, Marcos Alcantara Hernandez, Horwin Ventura Candia, Josue Mendez Olguin, William Paladines, Jose Antonio Romero Romero, Juan Palacios, Armando Hernandez, Carlos Vidals Ramos, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco, Hernan Lopez Carranza, Abel De Jesus Aguirre and Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera
Defendant: Maxdelivery 2, LLC, Paul Abramsky and Christopher Siragusa
Case Number: 1:2018cv08998
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gennadiy Naydenskiy on behalf of Marcos Alcantara Hernandez, Valente Ascencio, Jesus Angel Basurto, Abel De Jesus Aguirre, Javier De Jesus Armenta, Javier Flores Segundo, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco, Armando Hernandez, Misael Leon Sanchez, Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon, Hernan Lopez Carranza, Josue Mendez Olguin, Armando Rafael Mesinas, Roman Olguin, Adrian Olguin Martinez, Juan Palacios, William Paladines, Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano, Abelardo Perez Torralba, Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera, Jose Antonio Romero Romero, Horwin Ventura Candia, Carlos Vidals Ramos. (Naydenskiy, Gennadiy)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/1/2018) (jca)
October 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Paul Abramsky answer due 12/24/2018; Maxdelivery 2, LLC answer due 12/24/2018; Christopher Siragusa answer due 12/24/2018. (jca)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED among the parties to the above-captioned case, by and through their undersigned counsel, that Defendants' deadline to answer or move with respect to the Complaint shall be extended from October 25, 2018 until December 24, 2018. The Defendants require the extension because they have just been retained to handle to matter and need time to investigate the Complaint. This is the first such request. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED among the parties to the above-captioned case, by and through their undersigned counsel, that Defendants will not dispute the proper service of Plaintiffs' summons and complaint upon Defendants. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation may be signed in counterparts, electronically or in writing, and that a facsimile/PDF version is deemed as an original. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/31/2018) (jca)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. It is further ORDERED that the conference scheduled for February 7, 2019 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/31/2018) (jca)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer via Stipulation among All Parties addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from John M. Harras dated 10/24/2018. Document filed by Paul Abramsky, Maxdelivery 2, LLC, Christopher Siragusa.(Harras, John) Modified on 11/26/2018 (ldi).
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Paul Abramsky served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service was accepted by Giovanni Smith, Co-Worker. Document filed by Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco; Marcos Alcantara Hernandez; Jose Antonio Romero Romero; Carlos Vidals Ramos; Adrian Olguin Martinez; Jesus Angel Basurto; Abel De Jesus Aguirre; Misael Leon Sanchez; Abelardo Perez Torralba; Javier Flores Segundo; Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez; Javier De Jesus Armenta; Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon; Armando Hernandez; Josue Mendez Olguin; Roman Olguin; William Paladines; Juan Palacios; Hernan Lopez Carranza; Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera; Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano; Valente Ascencio; Armando Rafael Mesinas; Horwin Ventura Candia. (Faillace, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Christopher Siragusa served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. Service was accepted by Giovanni Smith, Co-Worker. Document filed by Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco; Marcos Alcantara Hernandez; Jose Antonio Romero Romero; Carlos Vidals Ramos; Adrian Olguin Martinez; Jesus Angel Basurto; Abel De Jesus Aguirre; Misael Leon Sanchez; Abelardo Perez Torralba; Javier Flores Segundo; Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez; Javier De Jesus Armenta; Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon; Armando Hernandez; Josue Mendez Olguin; Roman Olguin; William Paladines; Juan Palacios; Hernan Lopez Carranza; Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera; Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano; Valente Ascencio; Armando Rafael Mesinas; Horwin Ventura Candia. (Faillace, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/9/2018) (jca)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Abramsky. (dnh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Siragusa. (dnh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maxdelivery 2, LLC. (dnh)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Abramsky, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Marcos Alcantara Hernandez, Valente Ascencio, Jesus Angel Basurto, Abel De Jesus Aguirre, Javier De Jesus Armenta, Javier Flores Segundo, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco, Armando Hernandez, Misael Leon Sanchez, Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon, Hernan Lopez Carranza, Josue Mendez Olguin, Armando Rafael Mesinas, Roman Olguin, Adrian Olguin Martinez, Juan Palacios, William Paladines, Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano, Abelardo Perez Torralba, Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera, Jose Antonio Romero Romero, Horwin Ventura Candia, Carlos Vidals Ramos. (Faillace, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Siragusa, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Marcos Alcantara Hernandez, Valente Ascencio, Jesus Angel Basurto, Abel De Jesus Aguirre, Javier De Jesus Armenta, Javier Flores Segundo, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco, Armando Hernandez, Misael Leon Sanchez, Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon, Hernan Lopez Carranza, Josue Mendez Olguin, Armando Rafael Mesinas, Roman Olguin, Adrian Olguin Martinez, Juan Palacios, William Paladines, Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano, Abelardo Perez Torralba, Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera, Jose Antonio Romero Romero, Horwin Ventura Candia, Carlos Vidals Ramos. (Faillace, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maxdelivery 2, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Marcos Alcantara Hernandez, Valente Ascencio, Jesus Angel Basurto, Abel De Jesus Aguirre, Javier De Jesus Armenta, Javier Flores Segundo, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco, Armando Hernandez, Misael Leon Sanchez, Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon, Hernan Lopez Carranza, Josue Mendez Olguin, Armando Rafael Mesinas, Roman Olguin, Adrian Olguin Martinez, Juan Palacios, William Paladines, Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano, Abelardo Perez Torralba, Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera, Jose Antonio Romero Romero, Horwin Ventura Candia, Carlos Vidals Ramos. (Faillace, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 2, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 2, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Abramsky, Maxdelivery 2, LLC, Christopher Siragusa. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15643288)Document filed by Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco, Marcos Alcantara Hernandez, Jose Antonio Romero Romero, Carlos Vidals Ramos, Adrian Olguin Martinez, Jesus Angel Basurto, Abel De Jesus Aguirre, Misael Leon Sanchez, Abelardo Perez Torralba, Javier Flores Segundo, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Javier De Jesus Armenta, Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon, Armando Hernandez, Josue Mendez Olguin, Roman Olguin, William Paladines, Juan Palacios, Hernan Lopez Carranza, Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera, Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano, Valente Ascencio, Armando Rafael Mesinas, Horwin Ventura Candia.(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus Aguirre et al v. Maxdelivery 2, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelardo Perez Torralba
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valente Ascencio
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Angel Basurto
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Olguin
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Olguin Martinez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier De Jesus Armenta
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gustavo Peralta Avendano
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osban Yovany Londono Castrillon
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misael Leon Sanchez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Flores Segundo
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Rafael Mesinas
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Alcantara Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horwin Ventura Candia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Mendez Olguin
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Paladines
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Romero Romero
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Palacios
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Vidals Ramos
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonier Alberto Giraldo Orozco
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernan Lopez Carranza
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel De Jesus Aguirre
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Humberto Reyes Herrera
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Gennadiy Naydenskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxdelivery 2, LLC
Represented By: John Martin Harras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Abramsky
Represented By: John Martin Harras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Siragusa
Represented By: John Martin Harras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?