Klunck v. NYC Medical Practice, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Megin Klunck
Defendant: P.A. Alexandra Elizabeth Barker, M.D. Sergey Voskin and NYC Medical Practice, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09045
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332tn
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shelly A. Leonard on behalf of Megin Klunck. (Leonard, Shelly)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Megin Klunck on 1/17/19 at 10am.Document filed by NYC Medical Practice, P.C..(Munro, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Patrick Munro on behalf of NYC Medical Practice, P.C.. (Munro, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Megin Klunck.Document filed by NYC Medical Practice, P.C..(Munro, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by NYC Medical Practice, P.C..(Munro, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alexandra Elizabeth Barker served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; NYC Medical Practice, P.C. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Sergey Voskin served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service was accepted by Alisha, Agent. Document filed by Megin Klunck. (Leonard, Shelly)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexandra Elizabeth Barker. (dnh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sergey Voskin. (dnh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Medical Practice, P.C.. (dnh)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (As further set forth in this Order.) Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/10/2018) (cf)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexandra Elizabeth Barker, P.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Megin Klunck. (Blau, Steven)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sergey Voskin, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Megin Klunck. (Blau, Steven)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Medical Practice, P.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Megin Klunck. (Blau, Steven)
October 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: No district court selection was made on the summons request form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
October 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
October 4, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 4, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 4, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alexandra Elizabeth Barker, P.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Megin Klunck. (Blau, Steven) Modified on 10/4/2018 (pne).
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sergey Voskin, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Megin Klunck. (Blau, Steven) Modified on 10/4/2018 (pne).
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Medical Practice, P.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Megin Klunck. (Blau, Steven) Modified on 10/4/2018 (pne).
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Blau, Steven)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexandra Elizabeth Barker, NYC Medical Practice, P.C., Sergey Voskin. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15652086)Document filed by Megin Klunck.(Blau, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klunck v. NYC Medical Practice, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Alexandra Elizabeth Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Sergey Voskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Medical Practice, P.C.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megin Klunck
Represented By: Steven Bennett Blau
Represented By: Shelly A. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?