Washington v. NYC Medical Practice, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Tyesha Washington
Defendant: M.D. Anthony Ray Perkins, M.D. Sergey Voskin and NYC Medical Practice, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09052
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332tn
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Steven Bennett Blau dated 11/28/2018 re: Signed Letter Doc. No. 19. Document filed by Tyesha Washington.(Blau, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Steven Bennett Blau dated 11/28/2018 re: Permission to correct Docket Entry - Amended Complaint Doc. No. 14. Document filed by Tyesha Washington.(Blau, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shelly A. Leonard on behalf of Tyesha Washington. (Leonard, Shelly)
November 15, 2018 Notice of Pre-Motion Conference: A Pre-Motion Conference is scheduled to go forward on: Wednesday, December 19, 2018 @ 10:45 AM, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: David_C_Gonzalez@nysd.uscourts.gov ----- A PDF IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY ----- (By: David Gonzalez - Courtroom Deputy).(dgo)
November 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau re: Document No. #14 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (sj)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua M. Lurie dated November 14, 2018 re: Response to Plaintiff's Premotion Letter. Document filed by NYC Medical Practice, P.C., Sergey Voskin.(Lurie, Joshua)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Patrick P. Mevs dated 11/14/2018 re: Conference. Document filed by Anthony Ray Perkins.(Mevs, Patrick)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Philippe Mevs on behalf of Anthony Ray Perkins. (Mevs, Patrick)
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON- COMPLIANCE SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #12 Amended Complaint against NYC Medical Practice, P.C., Anthony Ray Perkins, Sergey Voskin.Document filed by Tyesha Washington. Related document: #12 Amended Complaint.(Blau, Steven) Modified on 11/15/2018 (sj).
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Steven Bennett Blau dated 11/13/2018 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Tyesha Washington.(Blau, Steven)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against NYC Medical Practice, P.C., Anthony Ray Perkins, Sergey Voskin.Document filed by Tyesha Washington. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Blau, Steven)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Matthew Lurie on behalf of NYC Medical Practice, P.C., Sergey Voskin. (Lurie, Joshua)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Joshua M. Lurie dated November 12, 2018 re: Request for Pre-motion conference. Document filed by NYC Medical Practice, P.C., Sergey Voskin.(Lurie, Joshua)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. NYC Medical Practice, P.C. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Anthony Ray Perkins served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Sergey Voskin served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service was accepted by Alisha, Agent. Document filed by Tyesha Washington. (Leonard, Shelly)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sergey Voskin. (pne)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Medical Practice, P.C.. (pne)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Ray Perkins. (pne)
October 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
October 4, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 4, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 4, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Ray Perkins, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyesha Washington. (Blau, Steven)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sergey Voskin, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyesha Washington. (Blau, Steven)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Medical Practice, P.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyesha Washington. (Blau, Steven)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Blau, Steven)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NYC Medical Practice, P.C., Anthony Ray Perkins, Sergey Voskin. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15652694)Document filed by Tyesha Washington.(Blau, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. NYC Medical Practice, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyesha Washington
Represented By: Steven Bennett Blau
Represented By: Shelly A. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Anthony Ray Perkins
Represented By: Patrick Philippe Mevs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Sergey Voskin
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Lurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Medical Practice, P.C.
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Lurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?