United States of America v. Metropolitan Retina Associates, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Metropolitan Retina Associates, P.C., Kenneth Felder and Dr. Kenneth Felder
Case Number: 1:2018cv09146
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, upon the Parties' agreement IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Parties agree that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action and consent to this Court's exercise of personal jurisdiction over each of them. Defendants admit, acknowledge, and accept responsibility for the following conduct: Set forth in this Order. Defendants shall pay to the Government within fourteen (14) business days of the Effective Date (defined below in Paragraph 22) the sum of $2,064,559 (the "Settlement Amount"), of which $1,032,279.50 constitutes restitution to the United States, plus interest which shall be compounded annually at a rate of 2.125% accruing from the Effective Date to the date of the payment. Defendants shall be jointly and severally liable to the Government for the Settlement Amount. The Settlement Amount shall be paid by wire transfer in accordance with instructions to be provided by the Financial Litigation Unit of the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York. All other provisions as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/1/2018) (js)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/23/2018) (jca)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Felder, Metropolitan Retina Associates, P.C.. Document filed by United States of America.(Bergman, Jacob)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bergman, Jacob)
October 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob Max Bergman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 9, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 9, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jacob Max Bergman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bergman, Jacob)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Bergman, Jacob) Modified on 10/9/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Metropolitan Retina Associates, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Retina Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kenneth Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jacob Max Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?