In Re: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Appellant: Arlington Capital mortgage Corporation, First National Bank of Omaha, Loan Simple, Inc., MC Advantage, LLC, Guild Mortgage Company, Republic State Mortgage Co., loanDeport.com, LLC, Ross Mortgage Corporation, Sun American Mortgage Company, Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc., WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP, Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc., CMG Mortgage, Inc., SecurityNational Mortgage Company, Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P., BWC Mortgage Services, PMAC Lending Services, Inc., Bondcorp Realty Services Inc., MegaStar Financial Corp., New Fed Mortgage Corp., Approved Funding Corp., Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Oaktree Funding Corp., Residential Home Funding Corp., Response Mortgage Services, Inc., Broadview Mortgage Corporation, PMC Bancorp, Congressional Bancshares, Inc., imortgage.com, Inc., Suburban Mortgage, Inc., First Mortgage Corporation, Mega Capital Funding, Inc., Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation and Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc.
Appellee: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09176
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/26/2018. Motions due by 10/16/2018. Responses due by 10/22/2018 Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-08986-VEC, 1:18-cv-09006-VEC, 1:18-cv-09176-VEC(ama)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: granting in part (4) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting in part (5) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases. WHEREAS LHBI has moved to consolidate all of the above-referenced cases; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. LHBI's motion for consolidation is granted in part. Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18- CV-9006, and 18-CV-9176 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes onto the docket of Case No. 18-CV-8986. No later than October 16, 2018, the Appellants in Case Nos. 18-CV- 9006 and 18-CV-9176 must resubmit their notices of appeal and motions for leave to appeal on the docket of Case No. 18-CV-8986. By the same date, all parties in Case Nos. 18-CV-9006 and 18-CV-9176 must file notices of appearance in Case No. 18-CV-8986. All parties in Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18-CV-9006, and 18-CV-9176 must file all future submissions on the docket of Case No. 18-CV-8986. 2. The Court will not, however, consolidate the above referenced cases with Case No. 18-MC-392; to the extent that LHBI moves to consolidate Case No. 18-MC-392 with the other cases, that motion is denied. 3. No later than October 22, 2018, LHBI must file a single, omnibus brief in response to the motions for leave to appeal that have been filed in Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18- CV-9006, and 18-CV-9176. No later than November 26, 2018, the Appellants in these cases must file a single, joint reply brief in support of their motions. 4. All parties are directed to review the undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Caproni. 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to DOCKET this order in Case Nos. 18-CV-8986, 18-CV-9006, 18-CV-9176, and 18-MC-392. The Clerk is further directed to CLOSE Case Nos. 18-CV-9006 and 18-CV-9176, and to terminate all open motions therein. 6. LHBI is responsible for distributing copies of this order to all parties in the above-referenced cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/11/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-08986-VEC, 1:18-cv-09006-VEC, 1:18-cv-09176-VEC (ama)
October 11, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:18-cv-08986-VEC.. (ama)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSED granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. (Responses due by 10/22/2018.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/10/2018) (sac)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mara Rose Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appeal addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James N. Lawlor dated October 10, 2018. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Lawlor, James)
October 10, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-mc-00392-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 9, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
October 9, 2018 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 18-mc-0392. (bkar)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Appellants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(bkar)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-mc-0392. Document filed by Appellants.(bkar)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated August 13, 2018. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 16-1019A, 08-B-13555 (SCC). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Approved Funding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Arlington Capital mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Loan Simple, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MC Advantage, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Guild Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Republic State Mortgage Co.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: loanDeport.com, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ross Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sun American Mortgage Company
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hartland Mortgage Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WR Starkey Mortgage, LLP
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sterling National Mortgage Company, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CMG Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SecurityNational Mortgage Company
Represented By: Gifford W. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gateway Funding Diversified Mortgage Services, L.P.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BWC Mortgage Services
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PMAC Lending Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amjad M. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bondcorp Realty Services Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MegaStar Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: New Fed Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Approved Funding Corp.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Christopher James Houpt
Represented By: Thomas V Panoff
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Christopher Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oaktree Funding Corp.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Residential Home Funding Corp.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Response Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Larry Tillem
Represented By: Allison Michelle Holubis
Represented By: Peter Alexander Meisels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Broadview Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PMC Bancorp
Represented By: Amjad M. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Congressional Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: imortgage.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Suburban Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Lani A. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: First Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mega Capital Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Windsor Capital Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Lee Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sierra Pacific Mortgage Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Represented By: James N Lawlor
Represented By: Adam Michael Bialek
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?