Avilez v. Santiago et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Avilez
Defendant: CNM Edwin Santiago, CNM Kerry-Ann A. Dacosta, Urban Health Plan Inc. and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv09270
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on rban Health Plan Inc. on 10/23/2018. Service was accepted by Guenia Luciano, Business Associate. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on Edwin Santiago, CNM on 10/23/2018. Service was accepted by Guenia Luciano, Business Associate. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on Kerry-Ann Dacosta, CNM on 10/23/2018. Service was accepted by Guenia Luciano, Business Associate. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. United States of America served on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Clerk. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sj)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Urban Health Plan Inc.. (sj)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kerry-Ann A. Dacosta. (sj)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edwin Santiago. (sj)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Urban Health Plan, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kerry-Ann A. Dacosta CNM, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edwin Santiago CNM, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley)
October 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stanley A. Landers to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: text was entered in the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
October 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stanley A. Landers. The party information for the following party has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party has been modified for the following reason: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
October 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stanley A. Landers. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $7,000,000; County code Albany. The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to None - No Dollar Demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to Bronx. (pne)
October 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 11, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley) Modified on 10/11/2018 (pne).
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Urban Health Plan, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley) Modified on 10/11/2018 (pne).
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kerry-Ann A. Dacosta, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley) Modified on 10/11/2018 (pne).
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edwin Santiago CNM, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Melissa Avilez. (Landers, Stanley) Modified on 10/11/2018 (pne).
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Landers, Stanley)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kerry-Ann A. Dacosta, Edwin Santiago, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Urban Health Plan Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15716760)Document filed by Melissa Avilez.(Landers, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avilez v. Santiago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Avilez
Represented By: Stanley A. Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNM Edwin Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNM Kerry-Ann A. Dacosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Health Plan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?