Vazquez et al v. CookUnity, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carmello Ramirez Martinez, Juan Palacios, Mario Campos, Ricardo Trujillo Gomez, Luis Miguel Barrera Perez, Marcos Alcantara Hernandez, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro, Abraham Gutierrez Olivares, Juan Olivares de la Torre, William Paladines, Daniel Torres Ramos, Pedro Lazaro Fortis, Ramiro Vazquez and Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez
Defendant: Lucia Cisilotto, Matias Serebrinsky, Mateo Marietti and CookUnity, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv09301
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 31 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended to January 7, 2019; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants waive any defense based on improper service of process. Lucia Cisilotto answer due 1/7/2019; CookUnity, LLC answer due 1/7/2019; Mateo Marietti answer due 1/7/2019; Matias Serebrinsky answer due 1/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/9/2018) (mro)
November 5, 2018 Filing 30 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Lucia Cisilotto, CookUnity, LLC, Mateo Marietti, Matias Serebrinsky. (Gallaway, Brett)
October 30, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Reed Gallaway on behalf of Lucia Cisilotto, CookUnity, LLC, Mateo Marietti, Matias Serebrinsky. (Gallaway, Brett)
October 18, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. CookUnity, LLC served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Juan Palacios(Individually); Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually); Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually); Ramiro Vazquez(individually); Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated); Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually); Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually); Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated); William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated); Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated); Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually); Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually); Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually); Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually); Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated); Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually); Mario Campos(Individually); Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated); Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually); Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated); Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated); William Paladines(Individually); Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually). (Faillace, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, February 15th, 2019 at 3:45 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 3:45 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/18/2018) (js)
October 16, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Haleigh Amant on behalf of Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually), Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Campos(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually), Juan Palacios(Individually), Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually), Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(individually). (Amant, Haleigh)
October 15, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kj)
October 12, 2018 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lucia Cisilotto. (pc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matias Serebrinsky. (pc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mateo Marietti. (pc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CookUnity, LLC. (pc)
October 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 11, 2018 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Campos(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Juan Palacios(Individually), Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually), Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matias Serebrinsky, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually), Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Campos(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually), Juan Palacios(Individually), Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually), Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mateo Marietti, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually), Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Campos(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually), Juan Palacios(Individually), Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually), Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lucia Cisilotto, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually), Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Campos(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually), Juan Palacios(Individually), Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually), Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CookUnity LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually), Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Campos(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually), Juan Palacios(Individually), Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually), Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lucia Cisilotto, CookUnity, LLC, Mateo Marietti, Matias Serebrinsky. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15727516)Document filed by Juan Palacios(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(Individually), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramiro Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(Individually), Ramiro Vazquez(individually), Pedro Lazaro Fortis(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(Individually), Carmello Ramirez Martinez(Individually), Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Mario Campos(on behalf of others similarly situated), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(Individually), Juan Palacios(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ricardo Trujillo Gomez(Individually), Marcos Alcantara Hernandez(Individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(Individually), Juan Olivares de la Torre(on behalf of others similarly situated), Daniel Torres Ramos(Individually), Mario Campos(Individually), Abraham Gutierrez Olivares(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Miguel Barrera Perez(Individually), Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Daniel Torres Ramos(on behalf of others similarly situated), William Paladines(Individually), Juan Olivares de la Torre(Individually).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez et al v. CookUnity, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmello Ramirez Martinez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Palacios
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Campos
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Trujillo Gomez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Miguel Barrera Perez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Alcantara Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Atlatenco Amaro
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Gutierrez Olivares
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Olivares de la Torre
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Paladines
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Torres Ramos
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Lazaro Fortis
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Vazquez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ivan Islas Ramirez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Haleigh Amant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucia Cisilotto
Represented By: Brett Reed Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matias Serebrinsky
Represented By: Brett Reed Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mateo Marietti
Represented By: Brett Reed Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CookUnity, LLC
Represented By: Brett Reed Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?