Mioduszewski v. Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Andrzej Mioduszewski
Defendant: CEO Bogdan Chmielewski, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Director Malgorzata Czajkowska, Director Malgorzata Wadolowski, Director Elzbieta Baumgartner, Director Marzena Wierzbowska, Director Malgorzata Gradzki, Director Krzysztof Matyszczyk, National Credit Union Administration, Director Lech Wojtkowski, Director Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Director Ryszard Bak, Director Iwona Podolak and Director Edward Pierwola
Case Number: 1:2018cv09346
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:18-cv-06081, filed on 10/31/2018. (sjo)
October 23, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (jwh)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Accordingly, venue lies in the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, to note service on the docket, to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, and to close this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/23/2018) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
October 23, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to Andrzej Mioduszewski 148 Driggs Avenue APT 1R Brooklyn, NY 11222. (aea)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryszard Bak, Elzbieta Baumgartner, Bogdan Chmielewski, Malgorzata Czajkowska, Malgorzata Gradzki, Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz, Krzysztof Matyszczyk, National Credit Union Administration, Edward Pierwola, Iwona Podolak, Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union, Malgorzata Wadolowski, Marzena Wierzbowska, Lech Wojtkowski. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401220292)Document filed by Andrzej Mioduszewski.(pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iwona Podolak. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marzena Wierzbowska. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward Pierwola. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lech Wojtkowski. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Wadolowski. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krzysztof Matyszczyk. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryszard Bak. (pne)
October 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elzbieta Baumgartner. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bogdan Chmielewski. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Gradzki. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Czajkowska. (pne)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Credit Union Administration. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mioduszewski v. Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Bogdan Chmielewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polish & Slavic Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Czajkowska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Wadolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Elzbieta Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Marzena Wierzbowska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Malgorzata Gradzki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Krzysztof Matyszczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Union Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Lech Wojtkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Bozena Krajewska-Pielarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ryszard Bak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Iwona Podolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Edward Pierwola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrzej Mioduszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?