State Of New York et al v. Skanska et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF NEW YORK, Brian Aryai and State Of New York
Defendant: J.F. Shea, Tishman/Washington Group, Schiavone Construction Co., Plaza Construction Corporation, Hunt-Bovis, Phoenix Constructors, New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Skanska, Turner Construction, S3 Tunnel Constructors, Tishman Construction Corporation, Slattery Skanska, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Slattery Skanska/Edwards & Kelsey Design-Build, Hunter Roberts Construction Group, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14 AFL, Granite Northeast, Local 79, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO, Tishman Speyer, Tishman/Harris, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14, Schiavone Construction and Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York
Case Number: 1:2018cv09367
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #77 MOTION for Christian D. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16029208. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 10, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Christian D. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16029208. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing (MA, DC Bar, Supreme Court of Pennsylvania), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheehan, Christian)
December 10, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #76 MOTION for Craig D. Margolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16029085. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 10, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for Craig D. Margolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16029085. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing (MA, DC Bar, Supreme Court of Pennyslvania), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Margolis, Craig)
December 6, 2018 Filing 75 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from the Parties dated December 6, 2018 re: pursuant to this Court's Order, dated October 25, 2018. Document filed by Hunter Roberts Construction Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Case Management Plan And Scheduling Order)(Kuck, Lea)
December 5, 2018 Filing 74 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Robert W. Sadowski dated 12/05/18 re: In response to Defendants' pre-motion letter. Document filed by Brian Aryai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sadowski, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Filing 73 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Counsel for Each of the Named Defendants dated November 21, 2018 re: Response to the Court's Order dated November 14, 2018. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Granite Northeast, Hunt-Bovis, Hunter Roberts Construction Group, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14, J.F. Shea, Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536, Phoenix Constructors, Plaza Construction Corporation, S3 Tunnel Constructors, Schiavone Construction, Skanska, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Slattery Skanska, Inc., Slattery Skanska/Edwards & Kelsey Design-Build, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Speyer, Tishman/Harris, Tishman/Washington Group, Turner Construction.(Steinberg, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 72 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Robert W. Sadowski dated 11/16/18 re: Status. Document filed by Brian Aryai.(Sadowski, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Filing 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Turner Corporation, Corporate Parent Hochtief USA, Corporate Parent Hochtief Americas GmbH, Corporate Parent Hochtief AG for Turner Construction. Document filed by Turner Construction.(Meller, Bruce)
November 15, 2018 Filing 70 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SKANSKA USA, INC.,, Corporate Parent Skanska AB for Skanska USA Civil Northeast. Document filed by Skanska USA Civil Northeast.(Meller, Bruce)
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENTS - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Bruce D. Meller to RE-FILE Documents #67 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #68 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file these documents and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Bruce D. Meller to RE-FILE Document #66 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by November 21, 2018, Defendants shall jointly file a single letter on ECF, not to exceed five pages, which includes each of the following (as further set forth in this Order.) It is further ORDERED that Relator shall file his response, not to exceed five pages, by December 5, 2018. Defendants' proposed motion(s) will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference, which is scheduled for December 13, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/14/2018) (cf)
November 14, 2018 Filing 68 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Skanska AB for Skanska USA Civil Northeast. Document filed by Skanska USA Civil Northeast.(Meller, Bruce) Modified on 11/14/2018 (lb).
November 14, 2018 Filing 67 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hochtief AG for Turner Construction. Document filed by Turner Construction.(Meller, Bruce) Modified on 11/14/2018 (lb).
November 14, 2018 Filing 66 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Skanska USA Civil Northeast.(Meller, Bruce) Modified on 11/14/2018 (lb).
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENTS - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Bruce D. Meller to RE-FILE Document #61 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #60 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file these documents and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Chester R. Ostrowski dated November 13, 2018 re: Proposed Motion to Dismiss and Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Tishman Speyer.(Ostrowski, Chester)
November 13, 2018 Filing 64 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lea Haber Kuck; Hallie B. Levin; Shahzeb Lari; Patrick J. Greene, Jr. dated 11/13/2018 re: Pre-motion letter for proposed motion to dismiss with proposed briefing schedule.. Document filed by Hunter Roberts Construction Group, Plaza Construction Corporation, Skanska, Tishman Construction Corporation, Turner Construction.(Kuck, Lea)
November 13, 2018 Filing 63 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by J.F. Shea.(Meller, Bruce)
November 13, 2018 Filing 62 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Schiavone Construction.(Meller, Bruce)
November 13, 2018 Filing 61 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Skanska USA Civil Northeast.(Meller, Bruce) Modified on 11/14/2018 (lb).
November 13, 2018 Filing 60 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by J.F. Shea, Schiavone Construction, Skanska, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Slattery Skanska, Inc., Turner Construction.(Meller, Bruce) Modified on 11/14/2018 (lb).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #53 Letter filed by Hunt-Bovis, Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: It is ORDERED that by November 16, 2018, (a) Relator shall file a letter on ECF stating whether he wishes to proceed with his motion to remand and (b) if so, Relator shall propose a briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/13/2018) (jwh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Frank A. Hess dated November 13, 2018 re: Defendant's Responses. Document filed by J.F. Shea, Schiavone Construction, Skanska, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Slattery Skanska, Inc., Turner Construction.(Hess, Frank)
November 13, 2018 Filing 57 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Steven A. Reiss and David Spears (for Defendant Phoenix Constructors) dated November 13, 2018 re: Pre-motion letter for proposed motions to dismiss with proposed briefing schedule.. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Hunt-Bovis.(Reiss, Steven)
November 13, 2018 Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Manvin S. Mayell; Jason Brown; David Spears; Steven A. Reiss dated November 13, 2018 re: Pre-motion letter for proposed motions to dismiss with proposed briefing schedule. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Granite Northeast, Hunt-Bovis, Phoenix Constructors.(Mayell, Manvin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Lawrence Weiner on behalf of Brian Aryai. (Weiner, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from James M. Steinberg, Esq.; Joseph J. Vitale, Esq. & Gillian Costello, Esq. dated November 13, 2018 re: Pre-motion letter for proposed motion to dismiss with proposed briefing schedule. Document filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14, Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536.(Steinberg, James)
November 9, 2018 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Steven Reiss dated November 9, 2018 re: response to 11/1/18 letter regarding remand. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Hunt-Bovis.(Reiss, Steven)
November 8, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Wayne Sadowski on behalf of Brian Aryai. (Sadowski, Robert)
November 6, 2018 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AECOM, Other Affiliate Lendlease (US) Construction Lmb Inc., Other Affiliate Hunt Construction Group, Inc. for Hunt-Bovis; Corporate Parent Lendlease (US) Construction Lmb Inc. for Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc.. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Hunt-Bovis.(Reiss, Steven)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
November 5, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce D. Meller on behalf of J.F. Shea, Schiavone Construction, Skanska, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Slattery Skanska, Inc., Turner Construction. (Meller, Bruce)
November 5, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Anthony Hess on behalf of J.F. Shea, Schiavone Construction, Skanska, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Slattery Skanska, Inc., Turner Construction. (Hess, Frank)
November 5, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Greene, JR on behalf of J.F. Shea, Schiavone Construction, Skanska, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Slattery Skanska, Inc., Turner Construction. (Greene, Patrick)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED QUI TAM COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff/Relator Brian Aryai and for the Defendant named as New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536 that the time within which said Defendant may answer or otherwise respond with respect to the Amended Qui Tam Complaint shall be extended to November 13, 2018. (As further set forth in this Order.) New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536 answer due 11/13/2018., Motions terminated: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. filed by Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York, #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to the Amended Qui Tam Complaint. filed by New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/2/2018) (cf)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #43 Letter filed by Brian Aryai. ENDORSEMENT: It is ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response letter, not to exceed three pages, by November 9, 2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/2/2018) (mro)
November 2, 2018 Filing 45 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tishman Speyer.(Ostrowski, Chester)
November 1, 2018 Filing 44 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Inc., Corporate Parent Granite Construction Northeast, Inc., Corporate Parent Lendlease (US) Construction Lmb Inc., Corporate Parent Fluor Enterprises, Inc. for Phoenix Constructors. Document filed by Phoenix Constructors.(Pollina, Bradley)
November 1, 2018 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Robert W. Sadowski dated 11/01/18 re: Remand. Document filed by Brian Aryai.(Sadowski, Robert)
October 31, 2018 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to the Amended Qui Tam Complaint. Document filed by New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536.(Costello, Gillian) Modified on 12/6/2018 (db).
October 31, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Fitzmaurice on behalf of Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Hunt-Bovis. (Fitzmaurice, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Alan Reiss on behalf of Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Hunt-Bovis. (Reiss, Steven)
October 29, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel James Horwitz on behalf of Tishman Speyer. (Horwitz, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chester R. Ostrowski on behalf of Tishman Speyer. (Ostrowski, Chester)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/25/2018) (cf)
October 23, 2018 Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent China State Construction Engineering Corp. for Plaza Construction Corporation. Document filed by Plaza Construction Corporation.(Lari, Shahzeb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AECOM Technical Services Inc, Other Affiliate URS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate AECOM, Other Affiliate The Earth Technology Corporation (USA), Other Affiliate AECOM Global II, LLC, Other Affiliate URS Global Holdings, Inc for Tishman Construction Corporation. Document filed by Tishman Construction Corporation.(Levin, Hallie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M Murphy on behalf of New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536. (Murphy, James)
October 22, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gillian Costello on behalf of New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536. (Costello, Gillian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent M/L Bovis Holding, Ltd, Corporate Parent Lendlease (US) Construction Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Lendlease Americas Inc., Corporate Parent Lendlease Americas Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Lendlease Corporation Ltd. for Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc.. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc..(Reiss, Steven)
October 22, 2018 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fluor Corporation for Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. Document filed by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Mayell, Manvin)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED QUI TAM COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint in the above-captioned action as to the signatory defendants and any related entity that has been served with a summons and complaint in this action is extended through and including November 13, 2018. So ordered. Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc. answer due 11/13/2018; Fluor Enterprises, Inc. answer due 11/13/2018; Granite Northeast answer due 11/13/2018; Hunter Roberts Construction Group answer due 11/13/2018; J.F. Shea answer due 11/13/2018; Phoenix Constructors answer due 11/13/2018; Plaza Construction Corporation answer due 11/13/2018; Schiavone Construction answer due 11/13/2018; Skanska answer due 11/13/2018; Skanska USA Civil Northeast answer due 11/13/2018; Slattery Skanska, Inc. answer due 11/13/2018; Slattery Skanska/Edwards & Kelsey Design-Build answer due 11/13/2018; Tishman Construction Corporation answer due 11/13/2018; Tishman Speyer answer due 11/13/2018; Turner Construction answer due 11/13/2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/19/2018) (ne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Granite Construction Incorporated for Granite Northeast. Document filed by Granite Northeast.(Brown, S. Jason)
October 19, 2018 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14.(Steinberg, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth M. Breen on behalf of Plaza Construction Corporation. (Breen, Kenneth)
October 18, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Harvey Green on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14. (Green, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hunter Roberts Construction Group.(Kuck, Lea)
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent to Removal. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Granite Northeast, Hunter Roberts Construction Group, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14, J.F. Shea, New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536, Phoenix Constructors, Plaza Construction Corporation, Schiavone Construction, Skanska, Skanska USA Civil Northeast, Tishman Construction Corporation, Tishman Speyer, Turner Construction. (Kuck, Lea)
October 18, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Raymond Kalantirsky on behalf of Hunter Roberts Construction Group. (Kalantirsky, Amanda)
October 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lea Haber Kuck on behalf of Hunter Roberts Construction Group. (Kuck, Lea)
October 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shahzeb Lari on behalf of Plaza Construction Corporation. (Lari, Shahzeb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hallie Beth Levin on behalf of Tishman Construction Corporation. (Levin, Hallie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason S Brown on behalf of Granite Northeast. (Brown, Jason)
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Manvin Singh Mayell on behalf of Fluor Enterprises, Inc.. (Mayell, Manvin)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Philip Pollina on behalf of Phoenix Constructors. (Pollina, Bradley)
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Spears on behalf of Phoenix Constructors. (Spears, David)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel P. T. Read on behalf of Granite Northeast. (Read, Nathaniel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Joinder to Notice of Removal. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons And Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Prior SDNY Stipulation and Order)(Reiss, Steven)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Amended Qui Tam Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Steven A. Reiss dated October 16, 2018. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and proposed Order)(Reiss, Steven)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Fitzmaurice on behalf of Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc.. (Fitzmaurice, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Alan Reiss on behalf of Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc.. (Reiss, Steven)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT LOCAL 14'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for Plaintiff and Defendant INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 14 in the above-captioned matter, that the time for said Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended up to and including November 13, 2018. Said Defendant waives any defense based upon the lack of personal jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14 answer due 11/13/2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/16/2018) (ne)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from James M. Steinberg, Esq. dated October 16, 2018. Document filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Local 14's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint)(Steinberg, James)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York.(Vitale, Joseph) Modified on 11/14/2018 (ldi).
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 09-cv-5456. Document filed by Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York.(Vitale, Joseph)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph John Vitale on behalf of Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York. (Vitale, Joseph)
October 15, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Arnaud, Hiram)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 108471/2009..Document filed by Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York. (Attachments: #1 Errata A: Summons and Complaint)(Arnaud, Hiram)
October 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Hiram M Arnaud. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 31:3730; Nature of Suit code 376 (Other Statutes: Qui Tam); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 720 (Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court);. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hiram M Arnaud to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney; pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits to pleading must be labeled. Other court information must be on docket entry text. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hiram M Arnaud. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York; Schiavone Construction; International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14; Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on All Parties on 10/12/18. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Local 79, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO. (Arnaud, Hiram)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Arnaud, Hiram) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jgo).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15741257).Document filed by Local 79, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO.(Arnaud, Hiram) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Of New York et al v. Skanska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Aryai
Represented By: Robert Wayne Sadowski
Represented By: Joshua Lawrence Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.F. Shea
Represented By: Patrick J. Greene, JR.
Represented By: Bruce D. Meller
Represented By: Frank Anthony Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman/Washington Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiavone Construction Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Construction Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth M. Breen
Represented By: Shahzeb Lari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt-Bovis
Represented By: David Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Steven Alan Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Constructors
Represented By: Bradley Philip Pollina
Represented By: David Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City District Council of Carpenters Local 1536
Represented By: James M Murphy
Represented By: Gillian Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska USA Civil Northeast
Represented By: Patrick J. Greene, JR.
Represented By: Bruce D. Meller
Represented By: Frank Anthony Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bovis Lend Lease, LMB, Inc.
Represented By: David Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Steven Alan Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska
Represented By: Patrick J. Greene, JR.
Represented By: Bruce D. Meller
Represented By: Frank Anthony Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Construction
Represented By: Patrick J. Greene, JR.
Represented By: Bruce D. Meller
Represented By: Frank Anthony Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S3 Tunnel Constructors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Construction Corporation
Represented By: Hallie Beth Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slattery Skanska, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Greene, JR.
Represented By: Bruce D. Meller
Represented By: Frank Anthony Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Sheehan
Represented By: Craig D. Margolis
Represented By: Manvin Singh Mayell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slattery Skanska/Edwards & Kelsey Design-Build
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Roberts Construction Group
Represented By: Lea Haber Kuck
Represented By: Amanda Raymond Kalantirsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14 AFL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Northeast
Represented By: Jason S Brown
Represented By: Nathaniel P. T. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 79, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Hiram M Arnaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman Speyer
Represented By: Daniel James Horwitz
Represented By: Chester R. Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishman/Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 14
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Represented By: Joseph Harvey Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiavone Construction
Represented By: Patrick J. Greene, JR.
Represented By: Bruce D. Meller
Represented By: Frank Anthony Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 79 Mason Tenders' District Council of Greater New York
Represented By: Hiram M Arnaud
Represented By: Joseph John Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?