Car-Freshner Corporation et al v. Balenciaga America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Car-Freshner Coporation, Julius Samann Ltd. and Car-Freshner Corporation
Defendant: Balenciaga America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09629
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Car-Freshner Corporation, Julius Samann Ltd.. Document filed by Balenciaga America, Inc..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Balenciaga America, Inc..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: WHEREAS on December 14, 2018, the parties appeared for a conference with this Court; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this case is REFERRED FOR MEDIATION to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Civil Rule 83.9 will govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The parties are directed to notify the Court no later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation whether they were able to settle this case. The Court specifically requests that a mediator with expertise in trademark matters be assigned. SO ORDERED. This action is eligible for mediation subject to the limitations and restrictions as noted: ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/27/2018. Mediator Expertise Request due by 12/24/2018. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/17/2018) (ama) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Deposition due by 12/31/2019. Fact Discovery due by 8/30/2018. All Expert Discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, shall be completed no later than 12/31/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Immediate referral to the District's Mediation Program (Plaintiffs' Position). Referral to a Magistrate Judge if private settlement efforts are unsuccessful (Defendant's Position). This case is to be tried to jury. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/14/2018) (mro)
December 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/2018. (jp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jonathan Z. King and Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated 12/06/2018 re: Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Car-Freshner Corporation, Julius Samann Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling)(King, Jonathan)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Balenciaga America, Inc. answer due 12/17/2018. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/14/2018) (ama)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated November 14, 2018. Document filed by Balenciaga America, Inc..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on December 14, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse,40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/31/2018) (ama)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Balenciaga America, Inc. served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Car-Freshner Coporation; Julius Samann Ltd.. (Shimanoff, Eric)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Balenciaga America, Inc.. (dnh)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Balenciaga America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Car-Freshner Coporation, Julius Samann Ltd.. (Shimanoff, Eric)
October 22, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Zachary King. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Jefferson. (pne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pne)
October 22, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 22, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 22, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Joseph Shimanoff on behalf of Car-Freshner Coporation, Julius Samann Ltd.. (Shimanoff, Eric)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(King, Jonathan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Car-Freshner Coporation, Julius Samann Ltd..(King, Jonathan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shimanoff, Eric)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Balenciaga America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15780641)Document filed by Car-Freshner Coporation, Julius Samann Ltd..(King, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Car-Freshner Corporation et al v. Balenciaga America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Car-Freshner Coporation
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary King
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shimanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Samann Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary King
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shimanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Car-Freshner Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Zachary King
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shimanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balenciaga America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?