Noah Bank v. First Ave Lee's Market, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Noah Bank
Defendant: Bum Tak Lee and First Ave Lee's Market, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09689
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. First Ave Lee's Market, Inc. served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by Noah Bank. (Basil, Robert)
October 24, 2018 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bum Tak Lee. (dnh)
October 24, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to First Ave Lee's Market, Inc.. (dnh)
October 23, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bum Tak Lee, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Noah Bank. (Basil, Robert)
October 23, 2018 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to First Ave Lee's Market Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Noah Bank. (Basil, Robert)
October 23, 2018 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Noah Bank.(Basil, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 23, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 22, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Basil, Robert)
October 22, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against First Ave Lee's Market, Inc., Bum Tak Lee. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15787349)Document filed by Noah Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - SBA Note, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - SBA Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - SBA Guarantee, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Commercial Term Note, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - CT Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - CT Guarantee)(Basil, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noah Bank v. First Ave Lee's Market, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bum Tak Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Ave Lee's Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Bank
Represented By: Robert James Basil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?