Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc. v. First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc.
Defendant: First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv09706
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. So Ordered. First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/31/2018. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/2018) (ne)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Thomas F. Giordano dated December 19, 2018. Document filed by First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc..(Giordano, Thomas)
November 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/19/2018. (ks)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/30/2018) (ks)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Thomas F. Giordano dated November 21, 2018. Document filed by First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc..(Giordano, Thomas)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/13/2018) (ne)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Thomas F. Giordano dated November 9, 2018. Document filed by First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc..(Giordano, Thomas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. Service was accepted by Robin Huett-Banks. Document filed by Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc.. (Gyves, William)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc.. (pne)
October 23, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 23, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc.. (Gyves, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc..(Gyves, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gyves, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15789311)Document filed by Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consulting Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Common Stock)(Gyves, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc. v. First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Francis Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Mgmt Grp, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Gyves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?