Heggs v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Milan Heggs
Defendant: Dr. Franklin Mejia, ASSISTANT DEPUTY WAR LILLIAN BENBOW, Corizon Health Clinical Solutions, LLC, C.O. DOES 1 7, Dr. Raul Ramos, MEDICAL DOES 1 7, Warden Carolyn Saunders, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, The City Of New York,, Dr. Homer Venters, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, Inc., Dr. Ross McDonald, Roderick Williams, Correctional Medical Associates of New York, P.C., Dr. KATZ, Dr. Jay Cowan, Nina Edwards, Assistant Deputy Warden Lillian Benbow, City of New York, Medical Does 1 - 7 and C.O. Does 1 - 7
Case Number: 1:2018cv09709
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 55 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jay Cowan served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service was accepted by Dr. Jay Cowan. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 54 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Correctional Medical Associates of New York, P.C. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 53 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Corizon Health Clinical Solutions, LLC served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 52 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Corizon Health, Inc. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 51 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Corizon, Inc. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 50 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Raul Ramos served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by MORELA LOWE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Roderick Williams served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by MORELA LOWE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ross McDonald served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by MORELA LOWE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Franklin Mejia served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by MORELA LOWE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Katz served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by MORELA LOWE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Nina Edwards served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by MORELA LOWE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Assistant Deputy Warden Lillian Benbow served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service was accepted by "JOHN" MORGAN. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
December 3, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Carolyn Saunders served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service was accepted by "JOHN" MORGAN. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
November 29, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by Natasha Frazer. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
November 29, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 26, 2018 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Assistant Deputy Warden Lillian Benbow. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Assistant Deputy Warden Lillian Benbow, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga to RE-FILE Document No. #27 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; defendant name must directly correspond to the pleading. Do not use abbreviations. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carolyn Saunders. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nina Edwards. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Katz. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Franklin Mejia. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ross McDonald. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay Cowan. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Homer Venters. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roderick Williams. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raul Ramos. (dnh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corizon Health Clinical Solutions, LLC. (dnh)
October 24, 2018 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Warden Carolyn Saunders, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Assistant Dept. Warden Lillian Benbow, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian) Modified on 10/25/2018 (dnh).
October 24, 2018 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nina Edwards, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Katz, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Franklin Mejia, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Ross McDonald, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Jay Cowan, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Homer Venters, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roderick Williams, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dr. Raul Ramos, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Corizon Health Clinical Solutions, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,, #16 Complaint,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 COMPLAINT against Assistant Deputy Warden Lillian Benbow, City of New York, Corizon Health Clinical Solutions, LLC, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, Inc., Correctional Medical Associates of New York, P.C., Jay Cowan, Does 1 - 7, Nina Edwards, Katz, Ross McDonald, Franklin Mejia, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, Raul Ramos, Carolyn Saunders, Homer Venters, Roderick Williams. Document filed by Milan Heggs.(Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank; second party name must include 'care of c/o';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correctional Medical Associates of New York, P.C.. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corizon, Inc.. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corizon Health, Inc.. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:12101;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331;. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption; Nature of Suit Code - multiple selections;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York; Dr. Katz; Assistant Deputy Warden Lillian Benbow; Medical Does 1 - 7; C.O. Does 1 - 7. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. HOMER VENTERS, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian) Modified on 10/23/2018 (jgo).
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. JAY COWAN, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian) Modified on 10/23/2018 (jgo).
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF NEW YORK, P.C., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CORIZON HEALTH CLINICAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian) Modified on 10/23/2018 (jgo).
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CORIZON HEALTH, INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CORIZON, INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Milan Heggs. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cassell-Stiga, Gillian) Modified on 10/23/2018 (jgo).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against LILLIAN BENBOW, C.O. DOES 1 7, Corizon Health Clinical Solutions, LLC, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, Inc., Correctional Medical Associates of New York, P.C., Jay Cowan, Nina Edwards, KATZ, MEDICAL DOES 1 7, Ross McDonald, Franklin Mejia, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, Raul Ramos, Carolyn Saunders, The City Of New York,, Homer Venters, Roderick Williams. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15790075)Document filed by Milan Heggs.(Cassell-Stiga, Gillian) Modified on 10/23/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heggs v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Franklin Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSISTANT DEPUTY WAR LILLIAN BENBOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Clinical Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. DOES 1 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Raul Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL DOES 1 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Carolyn Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Homer Venters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ross McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Associates of New York, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. KATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jay Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Deputy Warden Lillian Benbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Does 1 - 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Does 1 - 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan Heggs
Represented By: Gillian Robin Cassell-Stiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?