Marquette Commercial Finance v. Soleil Chartered Bank

Plaintiff: Marquette Commercial Finance, A Division of Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC and Marquette Commercial Finance
Defendant: Soleil Chartered Bank
Case Number: 1:2018cv09879
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #28 CROSS LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter Response addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Whitney D. Seltzer dated December 6, 2018. filed by Marquette Commercial Finance. ENDORSEMENT: The issues raised in this letter and Defendant's pre-motion letter at Dkt. 16 will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference on January 10, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. The parties shall not file any further papers in connection with the motion before the conference. The parties are reminded to submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan as previously ordered at least 7 days before the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/17/2018) (cf)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Lisa Marie Lamm Bachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #27 Motion for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
December 14, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance. (Seltzer, Whitney)
December 11, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 FIRST MOTION for Lisa Marie Lamm Bachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16031554. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 29 FIRST MOTION for Lisa Marie Lamm Bachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16031554. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Applicant L. M. L. Bachman, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (NE), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (MN), #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Whitney)
December 6, 2018 Filing 28 CROSS LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Letter Response addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Whitney D. Seltzer dated December 6, 2018. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance.(Seltzer, Whitney)
December 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 AMENDED MOTION for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 27 AMENDED MOTION for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Applicant C.A. Lallier, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Seltzer, Whitney)
December 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #26 AMENDED MOTION for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Motion for Pro Hac Vice;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 5, 2018 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Seltzer, Whitney) Modified on 12/6/2018 (wb).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned from December 20, 2018, to January 10, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. The parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan by January 3, 2019. (Initial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/4/2018) (jwh)
December 4, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #22 FIRST MOTION for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15995493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE AFFIDAVIT IS MISSING THE REQUIRED LANGUAGE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.3. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
December 3, 2018 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Van Leeuwen dated 12/3/2018. Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank.(Van Leeuwen, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Cert of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Whitney) Modified on 12/4/2018 (ma).
December 3, 2018 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Cameron Alexander Lallier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15995493. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance.(Seltzer, Whitney) Modified on 12/4/2018 (ma).
November 29, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Van Leeuwen in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Incorporation)(Van Leeuwen, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Kaur in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. (Van Leeuwen, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. (Van Leeuwen, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. Responses due by 12/14/2018 Return Date set for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM.(Van Leeuwen, David)
November 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/14/2018 Replies due by 1/10/2019. (jwh)
November 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/6/2018 (jwh)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's premotion letter as provided in Individual Rule 3(c)(2) by December 6, 2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/29/2018) (jwh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Van Leeuwen dated 11/28/2018. Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank.(Van Leeuwen, David)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying without prejudice #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is DENIED without prejudice. Defendant shall file a letter requesting a premotion conference and Plaintiffs shall respond. The letters shall comply with Individual Rule III.A. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 10. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/27/2018) (ne)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Soleil Chartered Bank served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Service was accepted by Leka. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance. (Seltzer, Whitney)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Van Leeuwen in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Incorporation)(Van Leeuwen, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Kaur in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. (Van Leeuwen, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. (Van Leeuwen, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. Return Date set for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM.(Van Leeuwen, David)
November 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David Charlton Van Leeuwen to RE-FILE Document #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db)
November 25, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank.(Van Leeuwen, David)
November 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charlton Van Leeuwen on behalf of Soleil Chartered Bank. (Van Leeuwen, David)
November 25, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Soleil Chartered Bank. Return Date set for 1/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation)(Van Leeuwen, David) Modified on 11/26/2018 (db).
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UMB Bank, N.A., Corporate Parent UMB Financial Corporation for Marquette Commercial Finance. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance.(Seltzer, Whitney)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/2/2018) (jca)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Seltzer, Whitney)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Soleil Chartered Bank. (jgo)
October 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Whitney Daye Seltzer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marquette Commercial Finance. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
October 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Whitney Daye Seltzer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
October 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Whitney Daye Seltzer. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Soleil Chartered Bank, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance, A Division of Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC. (Seltzer, Whitney)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Soleil Chartered Bank. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15811183)Document filed by Marquette Commercial Finance, A Division of Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Credit, #2 Exhibit Marquette's September 4, 2018 Draw Request, #3 Exhibit Defendant's September 6, 2018 Response to Draw Request, #4 Exhibit Marquette's September 12, 2018 Renewed Draw Request)(Seltzer, Whitney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquette Commercial Finance v. Soleil Chartered Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soleil Chartered Bank
Represented By: David Charlton Van Leeuwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquette Commercial Finance, A Division of Marquette Transportation Finance, LLC
Represented By: Whitney Daye Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquette Commercial Finance
Represented By: Whitney Daye Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?