Gonzalez et al v. Tompkins Square Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen, Milagros Gonzalez and Colleen Roche
Defendant: Tompkins Square Partners, LLC and Davenport, Turnblad & Fishpaw LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv09915
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Tompkins Square Partners, LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Milagros Gonzalez ; Colleen Roche; Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Saul Hanski on behalf of Milagros Gonzalez, Steven Nachshen, Colleen Roche. (Hanski, Adam)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Monday, January 15, 2019, in Courtroom 14A, at 4:30pm, before the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107. (Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (jca)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tompkins Square Partners, LLC. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Davenport, Turnblad & Fishpaw LLC. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 29, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 29, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tompkins Square Partners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Milagros Gonzalez, Steven Nachshen, Colleen Roche. (Parker, Glen)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Davenport, Turnblad & Fishpaw LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Milagros Gonzalez, Steven Nachshen, Colleen Roche. (Parker, Glen)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Davenport, Turnblad & Fishpaw LLC, Tompkins Square Partners, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15817055)Document filed by Milagros Gonzalez, Colleen Roche, Steven Nachshen.(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Tompkins Square Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Gonzalez
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Roche
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Represented By: Adam Saul Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tompkins Square Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davenport, Turnblad & Fishpaw LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?