Workforce Resource, LLC v. 1/0 Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Workforce Resource, LLC
Defendant: TheNumber, LLC, 1/0 Capital, LLC, Viral Shah, Ziggy Jonsson, Better Mortgage Corporation and Phoenix ABS
Case Number: 1:2018cv09976
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #32 LETTER. ENDORSEMENT: ECF Order No. 31 is vacated except the pre-motion conference is cancelled. The parties should submit a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice by January 18, 2019. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/14/2018) (jwh) Modified on 12/17/2018 (jwh).
December 14, 2018 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Bennet J. Moskowitz dated December 14, 2018 re: Request for an Amendment of the Court's December 13, 2018 Dismissal Order. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC.(Moskowitz, Bennet)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 12/17/2018, Doc. #33 ORDER... It is, on this 13th day of December, 2018, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within thirty days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. All pending motions are dismissed as moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/13/18) (yv) Modified on 12/17/2018 (jwh).
December 13, 2018 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Bennet J. Moskowitz dated December 13, 2018 re: Arbitration and Unopposed Request to Cancel the December 14, 2018 Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC.(Moskowitz, Bennet)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on Friday, December 14, 2018, at 2:30pm. Time to respond to the complaint is stayed pending the conference, and any briefing schedule regarding any motion will be discussed at the December 14, 2018 conference. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/6/18) (yv)
December 5, 2018 Filing 28 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Benoit Quarmby dated December 5, 2018. Document filed by 1/0 Capital, LLC, Better Mortgage Corporation, Ziggy Jonsson, Phoenix ABS, Viral Shah, TheNumber, LLC.(Quarmby, Benoit)
December 5, 2018 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Respond addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Benoit Quarmby dated December 5, 2018., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel Arbitration addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Benoit Quarmby dated December 5, 2018. Document filed by 1/0 Capital, LLC, Better Mortgage Corporation, Ziggy Jonsson, Phoenix ABS, Viral Shah, TheNumber, LLC.(Quarmby, Benoit)
December 5, 2018 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent 1/0 Capital, LLC for Better Mortgage Corporation, Phoenix ABS, TheNumber, LLC. Document filed by 1/0 Capital, LLC, Better Mortgage Corporation, Ziggy Jonsson, Phoenix ABS, Viral Shah, TheNumber, LLC.(Quarmby, Benoit)
December 5, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benoit Quarmby on behalf of 1/0 Capital, LLC, Better Mortgage Corporation, Ziggy Jonsson, Phoenix ABS, Viral Shah, TheNumber, LLC. (Quarmby, Benoit)
November 19, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Viral Shah served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Ziggy Jonsson served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
November 19, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Phoenix ABS served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. TheNumber, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Better Mortgage Corporation served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
November 19, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. 1/0 Capital, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Monday, January 15, 2019, in Courtroom 14A, at 4:30pm, before the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court.For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107. (Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl.)(jca)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ziggy Jonsson. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Viral Shah. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TheNumber, LLC. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phoenix ABS. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Better Mortgage Corporation. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1/0 Capital, LLC. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 30, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bennet Jerome Moskowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Workforce Resource, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bennet Jerome Moskowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
October 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Bennet Jerome Moskowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VIRAL SHAH, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ZIGGY JONSSON, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHOENIX ABS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THENUMBER, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BETTER MORTGAGE CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1/0 CAPITAL, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC.(Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Moskowitz, Bennet)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Moskowitz, Bennet) Modified on 10/30/2018 (jgo).
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1/0 Capital, LLC, Better Mortgage Corporation, Ziggy Jonsson, Phoenix ABS, Viral Shah, TheNumber, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15827376)Document filed by Workforce Resource, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DPRs Terms and Conditions of Use, #2 Exhibit B - DPR's Privacy Policy, Disclaimer, and Terms of Use Acknowldgement, #3 Exhibit C - 1/0 Capital Team)(Moskowitz, Bennet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workforce Resource, LLC v. 1/0 Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TheNumber, LLC
Represented By: Benoit Quarmby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1/0 Capital, LLC
Represented By: Benoit Quarmby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viral Shah
Represented By: Benoit Quarmby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ziggy Jonsson
Represented By: Benoit Quarmby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Benoit Quarmby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix ABS
Represented By: Benoit Quarmby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workforce Resource, LLC
Represented By: Bennet Jerome Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?