National Corporate Housing, Inc. v. Master Key Alliance, Inc.

Plaintiff: National Corporate Housing, Inc.
Defendant: Master Key Alliance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10267
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/17/2018) (rro)
December 17, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Master Key Alliance, Inc. on 12/17/18. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Corporate Housing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference)(Niehaus, Paul)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/17/2018) (anc)
December 14, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Master Key Alliance, Inc..(Small, Eric)
December 14, 2018 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Master Key Alliance, Inc..(Small, Eric)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 STIPULATION REGARDING TIME TO ANSWER: My Key hereby accepts service of the Summons and Complaint in this matter, acknowledges that jurisdiction in this Court is proper, and waives any argument under the United States Code or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure related to service of process, personal jurisdiction, or venue. MyKey's time to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter, currently November 30, 2018, shall be extended to December 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Master Key Alliance, Inc. answer due 12/14/2018.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/3/2018) (anc)
November 30, 2018 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Michael James Maloney dated November 30, 2018. Document filed by Master Key Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation to Extend)(Maloney, Michael)
November 28, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Master Key Alliance, Inc. served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Receptionist for Master Key Alliance, Inc.. Document filed by National Corporate Housing, Inc.. (Niehaus, Paul)
November 7, 2018 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Master Key Alliance, Inc.. (dnh)
November 6, 2018 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Master Key Alliance, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by National Corporate Housing, Inc.. (Niehaus, Paul)
November 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Robert Niehaus. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
November 6, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 6, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 5, 2018 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Corporate Housing, Inc..(Niehaus, Paul)
November 5, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Niehaus, Paul)
November 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Master Key Alliance, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15867422)Document filed by National Corporate Housing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Legal Agreement, #2 Exhibit Amendment to SLA)(Niehaus, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Corporate Housing, Inc. v. Master Key Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Key Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Maloney
Represented By: Eric Steven Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Corporate Housing, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Robert Niehaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?