Newkirk v. Newburgh Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Tyler Newkirk
Defendant: Orange County Jail, District Attorneys Office and Newburgh Police Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv10277
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Mailed a copy of #6 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening),to Tyler Newkirk DIN No. 18-A-4049 Downstate Correctional Facility Red Schoolhouse Road P.O. Box F Fishkill, NY 12524. (vba)
November 30, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (mro)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 18-CV-10277 (LLS). An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/30/2018) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 21, 2018 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Tyler Newkirk DIN No. 18-A-4049 Downstate Correctional Facility Red Schoolhouse Road P.O. Box F Fishkill, NY 12524; The Superintendent Downstate Correctional Facility Red Schoolhouse Road P.O. Box F Fishkill, NY 12524. (vba)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/21/2018) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 19, 2018 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Tyler Newkirk.(sc)
November 19, 2018 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Tyler Newkirk.(sc)
November 7, 2018 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Tyler Newkirk DIN No. 18-A-4049 Downstate Correctional Facility Red Schoolhouse Road P.O. Box F Fishkill, NY 12524 with Return Receipt Requested. (vba)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/7/2018. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/7/2018. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 12/7/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/7/2018) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp, #2 Supplement plra)(bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 5, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
November 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against District Attorneys Office, Newburgh Police Department, Orange County Jail. Document filed by Tyler Newkirk. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newkirk v. Newburgh Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newburgh Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?