Girl Scouts of the United States of America v. Boy Scouts of America

Plaintiff: Girl Scouts of the United States of America
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv10287
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Marie Kassabian on behalf of Boy Scouts of America. (Kassabian, Rachel)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #14 Motion for Rachel Marie Kassabian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/2/2019) (ne)
December 28, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Rachel Marie Kassabian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16113553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Rachel Marie Kassabian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16113553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Kassabian, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT TS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the Parties that the deadline for Defendant Boy Scouts of America to respond to the Complaint is extended from January 2, 2019 to and including January 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Boy Scouts of America answer due 1/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/27/2018) (ne)
December 27, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Rachel Marie Kassabian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16111846. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Rachel Marie Kassabian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16111846. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Kassabian, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Rachel) Modified on 12/27/2018 (wb).
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Boy Scouts of America served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. Service was accepted by Steven P. McGowan. Document filed by Girl Scouts of the United States of America. (Ewing, Bruce)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/13/2018) (ne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boy Scouts of America. (pne)
November 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fara S. Sunderji on behalf of Girl Scouts of the United States of America. (Sunderji, Fara)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Prentice, Amanda)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Mary Prentice on behalf of Girl Scouts of the United States of America. (Prentice, Amanda)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Boy Scouts of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Girl Scouts of the United States of America. (Ewing, Bruce)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Girl Scouts of the United States of America.(Ewing, Bruce)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ewing, Bruce)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boy Scouts of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15870914)Document filed by Girl Scouts of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Ewing, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Girl Scouts of the United States of America v. Boy Scouts of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girl Scouts of the United States of America
Represented By: Fara S. Sunderji
Represented By: Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
Represented By: Amanda Mary Prentice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Rachel Marie Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?