Shaw v. Empire Stock Transfer, Inc.

Plaintiff: Seth Shaw
Defendant: Empire Stock Transfer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10349
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff Seth Shaw and undersigned counsel for Defendant Empire Stock Transfer Inc. ("Empire") as follows: 1. The Law Office of David DeStefano, PLLC is not currently retained to appear on behalf Empire Stock Transfer Inc. in the above-captioned case. Empire has retained The Law Office of David Destefano, PLLC for the limited purpose of assisting in obtaining an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the 11/7/2018 Complaint, while it seeks litigation counsel; 2. The time for Empire to answer or otherwise respond is hereby extended from 12/11/2018 to 1/25/2019; and 3. This Stipulation may be signed in counterparts, and facsimile or copy signatures shall be deemed originals. SO ORDERED. Empire Stock Transfer, Inc. answer due 1/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/4/2018) (ne)
December 4, 2018 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Seth Shaw. (Hurteau, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Empire Stock Transfer, Inc. served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service was accepted by Perry Langis, Manager. Document filed by Seth Shaw. (Hurteau, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hurteau, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Empire Stock Transfer, Inc.. (pne)
November 8, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 8, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 8, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Joseph Hurteau to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MULTIPLE NATURE OF SUIT SELECTIONS MADE; REMOVE SELECTIONS OF 380, AND 850 FROM THE CIVIL COVER SHEET; MULTIPLE CITIZENSHIP SELECTIONS MADE FOR DEFENDANT; PLEASE SELECT ONLY ONE. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
November 7, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Empire Stock Transfer Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Seth Shaw. (Hurteau, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hurteau, Daniel) Modified on 11/8/2018 (pne).
November 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Empire Stock Transfer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15879100)Document filed by Seth Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Hurteau, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Empire Stock Transfer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Shaw
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Hurteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Stock Transfer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?