Grecia v. Sprint Communications Company, L.P.

Plaintiff: William Grecia
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10426
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for David E. Finkelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16110331. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for David E. Finkelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16110331. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sprint Communications Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Finkelson, David)
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sprint Communications Company, L.P. answer due 1/16/2019. (yv)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/18/18) (yv)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiff's complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rachelle H. Thompson dated December 17, 2018. Document filed by Sprint Communications Company, L.P..(Thompson, Rachelle)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachelle H. Thompson on behalf of Sprint Communications Company, L.P.. (Thompson, Rachelle)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip A. Goldstein on behalf of Sprint Communications Company, L.P.. (Goldstein, Philip)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for Rachelle H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/13/2018) (jwh)
December 13, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Rachelle H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
December 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so redesignated. (jc)
December 13, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl, Patent Judge. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 13, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:16-cv-09691-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Rachelle H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sprint Communications Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Rachelle)
December 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/11/2018. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/6/2018. Initial pretrial conference continued to December 17, 2018 at 11:00am. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Rachelle H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16003226. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California and North Carolina;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Rachelle H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16003226. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sprint Communications Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, Rachelle) Modified on 12/6/2018 (wb).
December 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2018. (Kotowski, Linda)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by William Grecia. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: Granting #4 Motion for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/15/2018) (ks)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sprint Communications Company, L.P.. (dnh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sprint Communications Company, L.P., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by William Grecia. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/19/2018) (jwh)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff, Patent Judge. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER IN RE IMPLEMENTATION OF PATENT PILOT PROGRAM IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 21, 2011). It appearing that the Court has elected to participate in the Pilot Project for Patent Cases established pursuant to Pub L. No. 111-349, 124 Stat. 3674. Therefore, effective November 21, 2011, the Court's participation in the Patent Pilot Project will commence and shall include pro se cases. The Pilot program will be subject to the following procedures: When a designated Pilot judge receives a patent case on initial assignment, no transfer will take place. The designated Pilot judge will notify, by memorandum, the Assignment Committee of the assignment with a copy to the Case Assignment Unit.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 03/29/2012) (bcu) (bcu).
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pne)
November 13, 2018 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pne)
November 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 9, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15891740. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15891740. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Wawrzyn, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sprint Communications Company, L.P.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15891491)Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecia v. Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Represented By: David Evan Finkelson
Represented By: Philip A. Goldstein
Represented By: Rachelle H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Represented By: Matthew M. Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?