Grecia v. Verizon Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10429
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered. No further adjournments. So Ordered. Verizon Communications, Inc. answer due 2/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/2018) (js)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Matthew M. Wawrzyn dated 12/12/2018. Document filed by William Grecia.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Communications, Inc.. (dnh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Verizon Communications, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by William Grecia. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-10426 (AT). Document filed by William Grecia.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #4 Motion for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2018) (ne)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pne)
November 13, 2018 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pne)
November 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 9, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15891864. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15891864. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Wawrzyn, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15891825)Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecia v. Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Represented By: Matthew M. Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?