Doncouse v. B & R Wine And Spirits LLC et al

Plaintiff: Graciela Bretschneider Doncouse
Defendant: B & R Wine And Spirits LLC d/b/a Corks On Columbus, Hartford Realty Company, LLC and B & R Wine And Spirits LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv10458
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
0 Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
1 Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2018 12 Featured Case STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT HARTFORD REALTY COMPANY, LLC'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties in the above-captioned action, that Defendant Hartford Realty Company, LLC's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in the above-captioned action is hereby extended until January 21, 2019. The parties agree that facsimile signatures shall have the same force and effect as original signatures. SO ORDERED. (Hartford Realty Company, LLC answer due 1/21/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/21/2018) (rro)
December 21, 2018 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Michael S. Simon dated December 21, 2018. Document filed by Hartford Realty Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation Extending Tim to Answer)(Simon, Michael)
December 7, 2018 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME OF DEFENDANT B&R WINE AND SPIRITS LLC d/b/a CORKS ON COLUMBUS TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, through their undersigned counsel, that the time of Defendant B&R WINE AND SPIRITS LLC d/b/a CORKS ON COLUMBUS to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended up to and including January 21, 2019. (B & R Wine And Spirits LLC answer due 1/21/2019.) Motions terminated: #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Arthur M. Rosenberg, Esq. dated December 7, 2018. filed by B & R Wine And Spirits LLC. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/7/2018) (rro)
December 7, 2018 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Arthur M. Rosenberg, Esq. dated December 7, 2018. Document filed by B & R Wine And Spirits LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend Time)(Rosenberg, Arthur)
November 30, 2018 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hartford Realty Company, LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougerty, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Graciela Bretschneider Doncouse. (Marks, Bradly)
November 30, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. B & R Wine And Spirits LLC served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougerty, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Graciela Bretschneider Doncouse. (Marks, Bradly)
November 28, 2018 6 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Wednesday, February 13, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, and as further set forth in ths Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/28/2018) (rjm)
November 27, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/27/2018) (rj)
November 13, 2018 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to B & R Wine And Spirits LLC, Hartford Realty Company, LLC. (pc)
November 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 13, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bradly Gurion Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: B & R Wine And Spirits LLC d/b/a Corks On Columbus. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
November 9, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to B & R WINE AND SPIRITS LLC d/b/a CORKS ON COLUMBUS AND HARTFORD REALTY COMPANY, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Graciela Bretschneider Doncouse. (Marks, Bradly)
November 9, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Bradly)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against B & R Wine And Spirits LLC d/b/a Corks On Columbus, Hartford Realty Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15894260)Document filed by Graciela Bretschneider Doncouse.(Marks, Bradly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doncouse v. B & R Wine And Spirits LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & R Wine And Spirits LLC d/b/a Corks On Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Realty Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & R Wine And Spirits LLC
Represented By: Arthur Marc Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Bretschneider Doncouse
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?