Velasquez v. NICHL Due, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ricardo Velasquez
Defendant: NICHL Due, Inc. and 71st Realty Associates LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv10462
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/26/2018) (anc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NICHL Due, Inc.. (sj)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 71st Realty Associates LLC. (sj)
November 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 71ST REALTY ASSOCIATES LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NICHL DUE, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 71st Realty Associates LLC, NICHL Due, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15894643)Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. NICHL Due, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velasquez
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHL Due, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 71st Realty Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?