Elleby v. The City Of New York , et al
Plaintiff: Taye Lamonte Elleby
Defendant: Doctor Jane and John Does, New York Prison Health Services, Jane and John Does, The City Of New York,, Corizon Health Services, Correctional Health Services, Nurse Jane and John Does and Nurses Jane and John Does
Case Number: 1:2018cv10502
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Mailed a copy of #2 Order, to Taye Lamonte Elleby ID No. 14A1409 Greene Correctional Facility 165 Plank Road P.O. Box 8 Coxsackie, NY 12051-0975. (aea)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. A thorough review of the Court's records, however, reveals that on November 6, 2017, Plaintiff filed a complaint in the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, see Elleby v. Doe, No. 9:17-CV-1216 (N.D.N.Y. Feb. 13, 2018), and by order dated February 13, 2018, the Northern District of New York severed Plaintiff's claims against the Rikers Island Defendants and transferred those claims to this Court. See Elleby v. Doe, No. 18-CV-1577 (AT) (SDA) (filed Feb. 21, 2018). After reviewing this recent submission, the Court concludes that Plaintiff intended to file this amended pleading in Elleby v. Doe, No. 18-CV-1577 (AT) (SDA). The Clerk of Court is therefore directed to docket the complaint in this action (ECF No. 1) as an amended complaint in Elleby v. Doe, No. 18-CV-1577 (AT) (SDA). The Clerk of Court is further directed to administratively close this action, No. 18-CV-10502. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/14/2018) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/14/2018) (rjm).
November 14, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
November 8, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (ks)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corizon Health Services, Correctional Health Services, Jane and John Does(Rikers Island, Sued Individually), Jane and John Does(Shawangunk Corr. Fac., Sued Individually), Jane and John Does(Coxasckie Corr. Fac., Sued Individually), Jane and John Does(Manhattan Det. Center, Sued Individually), Jane and John Does(Rikers Island, Sued Individually ), New York Prison Health Services, The City Of New York,. Document filed by Taye Lamonte Elleby. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elleby v. The City Of New York , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taye Lamonte Elleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Prison Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurses Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?