Chanel, Inc. v. The RealReal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: The RealReal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10626
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hyo Jin Paik on behalf of Chanel, Inc.. (Paik, Hyo)
April 19, 2019 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Karen L. Dunn dated April 19, 2019 re: oral argument request. Document filed by The RealReal, Inc..(Dunn, Karen)
April 17, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The RealReal, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen)
April 3, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Max, Theodore)
April 3, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Tyler E. Baker in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Baker, Tyler)
April 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tyler Enright Baker on behalf of Chanel, Inc.. (Baker, Tyler)
March 4, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The RealReal, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by The RealReal, Inc..(Dunn, Karen)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Defendant hereby acknowledges receipt of service of the First Amended Complaint, effective as of February 1, 2019; and it is further HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is hereby extended, with consent from Plaintiff, to March 4, 2019; and it is further HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that, in the event that Defendant files a motion to dismiss in response to the First Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's opposition papers shall be filed on or before April 3, 2019; and Defendant's reply papers shall be filed on or before April 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. (The RealReal, Inc. answer due 3/4/2019. Motions due by 3/4/2019., Responses due by 4/3/2019, Replies due by 4/17/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/7/2019) (rro)
February 6, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The RealReal, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against The RealReal, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Max, Theodore)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The schedule set forth in the November 29, 2018 stipulation and order, (Doc. 9), shall govern the briefing of Defendant's motion to dismiss, (Doc. 16). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/18/2019) (anc)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Lauren M. De Lilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Rollin A. Ramsom to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Pursuant to November 29, 2018 Stipulation and Order addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Theodore C. Max dated January 17, 2019. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Max, Theodore)
January 17, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Rollin A. Ramsom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16202869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #21 MOTION for Lauren M. De Lilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16202921. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Lauren M. De Lilly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16202921. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The RealReal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(De Lilly, Lauren)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Rollin A. Ramsom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16202869. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The RealReal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rollin A. Ransom, #2 Proposed Order, #3 California Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Illinois Certificate of Good Standing)(Ransom, Rollin)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Karen L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by February 1, 2019. It is unlikely that Plaintiff will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by Monday, February 11, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be served by February 25, 2019. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two courtesy copies of all motion papers pursuant to my Individual Rules by mailing or delivering them to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/11/2019) (rro)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by The RealReal, Inc.. (Nathanson, Leigh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by The RealReal, Inc..(Nathanson, Leigh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The RealReal, Inc..(Nathanson, Leigh)
January 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Karen L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16166156. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Karen L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16166156. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The RealReal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen L. Dunn, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunn, Karen)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas McKee Monahan on behalf of Chanel, Inc.. (Monahan, Thomas)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yotam Barkai on behalf of The RealReal, Inc.. (Barkai, Yotam)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Elizabeth Harris on behalf of The RealReal, Inc.. (Harris, Laura)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leigh Mager Nathanson on behalf of The RealReal, Inc.. (Nathanson, Leigh)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Defendant hereby acknowledges receipt of service of the summons, complaint and accompanying case commencement documents, effective as of November 20, 2018; and it is further HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended, on consent, to January 10, 2019; and it is further HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that in the event that Defendant files a motion to dismiss in response to the complaint, Plaintiff's opposition papers shall be filed on or before February 25, 2019; and Defendant's reply papers shall be filed on or before March 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. (The RealReal, Inc. answer due 1/10/2019.)( Motions due by 1/10/2019., Responses due by 2/25/2019, Replies due by 3/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/29/2018) (rro)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Max, Theodore)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The RealReal, Inc.. (pc)
November 15, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 15, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 15, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The RealReal, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Max, Theodore)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Max, Theodore)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Max, Theodore)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Arnam SARL for Chanel, Inc.. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Max, Theodore)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The RealReal, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15912851)Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Max, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. The RealReal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The RealReal, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh Mager Nathanson
Represented By: Karen L. Dunn
Represented By: Yotam Barkai
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Harris
Represented By: Lauren Marie De Lilly
Represented By: Rollin A. Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Conrad Max
Represented By: Thomas McKee Monahan
Represented By: Hyo Jin Paik
Represented By: Tyler Enright Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?