Vazquez Perez v. Decker et al
Petitioner: Uriel Vazquez Perez
Respondent: Director James McHenry, Acting AG Matthew Whitaker, Ronald D. Vitiello, Kirstjen Nielsen in her official capacity as Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Justice, Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Homeland Secuirty, Sheriff Carl E. DuBois, Executive Office For Immigration Review, United States Department of Homeland Security, James McHenry, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Thomas Decker, Matthew G. Whitaker, Kirstjen Nielsen and Carl E. DuBois
Case Number: 1:2018cv10683
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #61 FIRST MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings . . Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dembele v. Decker Order)(Nash, Lindsay)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brandon M. Waterman dated January 10, 2019 re: The government's opposition to the petitioner's letter motion to lift the stay (Dkt. No. 61). Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl E. DuBois, Executive Office For Immigration Review, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker.(Waterman, Brandon)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FIRST MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings . Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DOJ FY 2019 Contingency Plan, #2 Exhibit Martinez-Sanchez v. Nielsen Order, #3 Exhibit Reyes v. Bonnar Order, #4 Exhibit Garcia Ramirez v. U.S. Immigration and Custom Enforcement Order, #5 Exhibit Da Silva v. Nielsen Order, #6 Exhibit Lucas R. v. Azar Order, #7 Exhibit DHS Procedures Relating to a Lapse in Appropriations)(Nash, Lindsay)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STANDING ORDER M10-468: The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/2018) (rjm)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Alberto A. Casadevall (CORRECTED) in Support re: #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Saenz Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Redman Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Burr Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Vera Eval., #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Michel Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Busse Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Hausman Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Alzate Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. I-Nembhard Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. J-Quarey Decl. (CORRECTED), #11 Exhibit Ex. K-IJ Benchbook, #12 Exhibit Ex. L-Form I-200, #13 Exhibit Ex. M-NTA, #14 Exhibit Ex. N-Form I-286, #15 Exhibit Ex. O-Rosenberg Article, #16 Exhibit Ex. P-Vazquez Perez Decl., #17 Exhibit Ex. Q-Navarro Decl., #18 Exhibit Ex. R-Imm. Ct. Prac. Manual, #19 Exhibit Ex. S-DHS ICE FY 2018 Budget Overview)(Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summonses, #2 Exhibit Class Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Class Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #3 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Rules and Instructions, #4 Exhibit Individual Rules of the Honorable Alison J. Nathan)(Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Cotten Nash on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Nash, Lindsay)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/5/2018) (cf)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 1/15/2019. (cf)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Carl E. DuBois served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #59 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Alberto A. Casadevall in Support re: #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Saenz Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Redman Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Burr Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Vera Eval., #5 Exhibit Ex. E-Michel Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. F-Busse Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. G-Hausman Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. H-Alzate Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. I-Nembhard Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. J-Quarey Decl., #11 Exhibit Ex. K-IJ Benchbook, #12 Exhibit Ex. L-Form I-200, #13 Exhibit Ex. M-NTA, #14 Exhibit Ex. N-Form I-286, #15 Exhibit Ex. O-Rosenberg Article, #16 Exhibit Ex. P-Vazquez Perez Decl., #17 Exhibit Ex. Q-Navarro Decl., #18 Exhibit Ex. R-Imm. Ct. Prac. Manual, #19 Exhibit Ex. S-DHS ICE FY 2018 Budget Overview)(Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 12/21/2018 (db).
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Johanna Beth Steinberg on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Steinberg, Johanna)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez.(Markowitz, Peter)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #36 Motion. ENDORSEMENT: I authorize this student: (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/3/2018) (cf)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. Matthew G. Whitaker served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. Ronald D. Vitiello served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. Kirstjen Nielsen served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. James McHenry served on 11/23/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. Thomas Decker served on 11/23/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. Executive Office For Immigration Review served on 11/23/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served. United States Department of Justice served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Niji Jain on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Jain, Niji)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Peter L. Markowitz dated December 3, 2018. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez.(Markowitz, Peter)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of Thomas Decker, Carl E. DuBois, Executive Office For Immigration Review, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Waterman, Brandon)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Rolnick Borchetta on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Borchetta, Jennifer)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FIRST MOTION Leave to Appear as Law Students . Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Alberto Casadevall, #2 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Daynelis Vargas, #3 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Jessica Kulig, #4 Exhibit Law Student Intern Appearance Form for Kathleen Wahl)(Pearce, Jacqueline)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Andrew Hodgson on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Hodgson, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kirstjen Nielsen. (dnh)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dnh)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. (dnh)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (dnh)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Decker. (dnh)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher T Dunn on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Dunn, Christopher)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kirstjen Nielsen, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Decker, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Executive Office For Immigration Review. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronald D. Vitiello. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl E. DuBois. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew G. Whitaker. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James McHenry. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Pearce on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Pearce, Jacqueline)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter L. Markowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name on summons does not exactly match what is listed on the petition caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paige Austin on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Austin, Paige)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter L. Markowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Thomas Decker, Department of Homeland Secuirty, Department of Justice, Carl E. DuBois, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Kirstjen Nielsen, Uriel Vazquez Perez, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter L. Markowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Orange; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matthew G. WHITAKER, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ronald D. VITIELLO, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kirstjen NIELSEN, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 11/19/2018 (pc).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James McHENRY, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 11/19/2018 (pc).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carl E. DUBOIS, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 11/19/2018 (pc).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 11/19/2018 (pc).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Decker, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 11/19/2018 (pc).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter L. Markowitz on behalf of Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Robert Hodgson in Support re: #3 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A- Hausman Decl., #2 Exhibit Exh. B- Saenz Decl., #3 Exhibit Exh. C- EOIR IJ Bench Book, #4 Exhibit Exh. D- New Yorker Article, #5 Exhibit Exh. E- Vera NYIFUP Evaluation, #6 Exhibit Exh. F- DHS OIG Press Release, #7 Exhibit Exh. G- NorthJersey.com Article, #8 Exhibit Exh. H- Vazquez Perez Decl., #9 Exhibit Exh. I- Dunn Decl.)(Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez.(Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Markowitz, Peter)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15921286)Document filed by Uriel Vazquez Perez.(Markowitz, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez Perez v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting AG Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen in her official capacity as Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Secuirty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Carl E. DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Office For Immigration Review
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James McHenry
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carl E. DuBois
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Uriel Vazquez Perez
Represented By: Peter L. Markowitz
Represented By: Johanna Beth Steinberg
Represented By: Christopher T Dunn
Represented By: Lindsay Cotten Nash
Represented By: Paige Austin
Represented By: Jennifer Rolnick Borchetta
Represented By: Robert Andrew Hodgson
Represented By: Jacqueline Pearce
Represented By: Niji Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?