Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island v. Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation
Petitioner: Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island
Respondent: Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv10821
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that Respondent file any opposition by January 25, 2019. Respondent is on notice that failure to do so will result in the Court deeming the petition to be fully briefed. Petitioner shall serve a copy of this Order on Respondent on or before January 17, 2019, and docket a certificate of service. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/14/2019) (cf)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition, Summons, Rule 7.1 Statement, Court's Scheduling Order served on Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation on 12/14/2018. Service was accepted by Tammy Alexander, Authorized Agent, Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island. (Savci, Haluk)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Order at Dkt. No. 8 in this action is hereby vacated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/28/2018) (cf)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 1/2/2019, Doc. # 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/10/2018) (cf) Modified on 1/2/2019 (cf).
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation. (pc)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On November 19, 2018, Petitioner filed a petition to confirm an arbitral award. Petitioner has not yet docketed an affidavit of service. It is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner docket a certificate of service proving that Petitioner properly served defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent shall serve any opposition to the petition by three weeks after service is executed. Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be served by one week later. Within one week of Petitioner's reply deadline, Petitioner shall supply Chambers with one (1) courtesy copy of the parties' papers in tabbed binders. Petitioner may submit these binders to Chambers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Petitioner serve a copy of this Order on Respondent and inform Respondent of Rule 1.H. of this Court's Individual Practices, which requires all attorneys representing parties before this Court to register promptly as filing users on ECF. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/21/2018) (js)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island. (Savci, Haluk)
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Haluk Savci to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 20, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 20, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 20, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island. (Savci, Haluk) Modified on 11/20/2018 (pc).
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island.(Savci, Haluk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Savci, Haluk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15935770).Document filed by Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Collective Bargaining Agreement, #3 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Savci, Haluk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island v. Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York and Long Island
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Champion Electrical Mechanical Builder Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?