Nachshen v. BPP ST Owner LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Defendant: BPP ST Owner LLC and Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv10994
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/2/2019) (ne)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citibank, N.A.. (pc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BPP ST Owner LLC. (jgo)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citibank N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
November 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BPP ST Owner LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Nachshen. (Parker, Glen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parker, Glen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BPP ST Owner LLC, Citibank, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15957017)Document filed by Steven Nachshen.(Parker, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachshen v. BPP ST Owner LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPP ST Owner LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nachshen
Represented By: Glen Howard Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?