Sun v. New York City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Yi Sun
Defendant: Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York, Scott Richman & Threadtex Inc, New York City Police Department and Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11002
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah Netburn
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Yi Sun, dated 1/22/19 re: REQUEST FOR A REISSUANCE OF ORIGINAL SUMMONS & ASK FOR A PROOF OF SERVICE BY THE COURT(THE ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS AS TO THE DEFENDANT "SCOTT REICHMAN & THREADTEX INC"). Document filed by Yi Sun.(sc)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/16/2019) (ama)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT(Motion)IN SUPPORT; re: for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 8(a)(2) and FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Yi Sun.(sc)
December 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/22/2019. Responses due by 3/18/2019 Replies due by 4/15/2019. (ama)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The foregoing requests and briefing schedule are Granted. Docket Entry No. 12 is resolved. SO ORDERED. Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York answer due 2/22/2019; New York City Police Department answer due 2/22/2019 (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/19/2018) (ama)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion and Notice of Appearance served on Yi Sun on 12/19/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York, New York City Police Department. (Ridgeway, Thais)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Thais R. Ridgeway dated December 19, 2018. Document filed by Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York, New York City Police Department.(Ridgeway, Thais)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thais R. Ridgeway on behalf of Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York, New York City Police Department. (Ridgeway, Thais)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Elizabeth L. Mo in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 8(a)(2) and FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mo, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 8(a)(2) and FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C.. (Mo, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Elizabeth Li Mo to RE-FILE Document #8 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): (1) Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (2) Correct Declaration to read "in support" of Motion. (db)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 8(a)(2) and FRCP 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth L. Mo)(Mo, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/3/2018 (db).
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous ., MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 8(a)(2) and FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C..(Mo, Elizabeth)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by Rebecca Wong. Document filed by Yi Sun. (sc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. New York City Police Department served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by P.O. Conwell. Document filed by Yi Sun. (sc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Service was accepted by S. Utler. Document filed by Yi Sun. (sc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Li Mo on behalf of Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C.. (Mo, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
November 26, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Police Department. (pc)
November 26, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York. (pc)
November 26, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C.. (pc)
November 26, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott Richman & Threadtex Inc. (pc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (pc).
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York, Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C., New York City Police Department, Scott Richman & Threadtex Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401223226)Document filed by Yi Sun.(pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Complaint Part 3, #3 Complaint Part 4, #4 Complaint Part 5) (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun v. New York City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children's Services of the City of New York
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Richman & Threadtex Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh H. Mo & The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo. P.C.
Represented By: Elizabeth Li Mo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?