Abbate et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Richard Abbate, Maurice Allen, Robert Borukhov, Richard Cacace, Wayne D Bryan, Melvin Blyden, Nancy Calderazzo, Betty Aristud, Semen Burd, Christopher Burke, Lorenzo Balsamo, Luz Berisha, Joseph Blasi, Rocco Caponigro, Salvatore Baldi, Noelyn Beckles, Kathy Benedict, John Caldwell, James Braunreuther, William M Broderick, Clunis Calvert, Brian Brody, Joanne Butler, Abimael Alvarez, Doris Arce, Annette Breindel, Randy Burke, Cyril Beharry, Lori Campbell, Michael Alleva, John Barrington, Jeffrey Bratjan, Tom Brown, Damasa Bonilla, David Alexander Anderson, Allison Arce, Peter Behrens, Joseph Burruezo, Sheila Birner, Brian Barcheski, Vito Cangemi, Michael Bruestle, Richard Bruce, Louis Adam Belajack, Joseph Bockin, Paul Zane Brown, Lisa Best, William Bodnar, Jessie Barnes, Jr., Deborah Eileen Brown, Troy Anderson, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, James Becker, Robert Byrne, Chris Boffa, Christine Araman, William Barry, Simon Anderson, Stanley Caesar, Paul Arida, Joseph Balcuk, Anthony Barrella, Marie Benedetti, Antonio Brucculeri, David Bates, Carl Bender, Rena Alexander, Earl Campbell, William Berger, William Brady, Amy Baker, Janine M Butler, Edualdo Juan Blanco, Bruce Bell, Paul Abi-Daher, Maria Begeleus, James Buckley, Sydney Blair, Richard Bucchieri, Jonathan Baum, Ross Abramson, Lisa Amatura, Peter Burke, Staci Becerra, Anthony Afasano, Kim Almonte, Vincent Aiello, Toni Atherley, Maryann Buono, Edward Bernstein, Ilir Berisha, Rosa Bonanno, Jose Alvarez, Patricia Adams, Sarah A Butler, Juan Bastidas, William Buchanan, David Ales, Colleen Butler and Juan Barreto
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11051
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 7, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
December 6, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven R. Pounian on behalf of Richard Abbate, Paul Abi-Daher, Ross Abramson, Patricia Adams, Anthony Afasano, Vincent Aiello, David Ales, Rena Alexander, Maurice Allen, Michael Alleva, Kim Almonte, Abimael Alvarez, Jose Alvarez, Lisa Amatura, David Alexander Anderson, Simon Anderson, Troy Anderson, Christine Araman, Allison Arce, Doris Arce, Paul Arida, Betty Aristud, Toni Atherley, Amy Baker, Joseph Balcuk, Salvatore Baldi, Lorenzo Balsamo, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, Brian Barcheski, Jessie Barnes, Jr., Anthony Barrella, Juan Barreto, John Barrington, William Barry, Juan Bastidas, David Bates, Jonathan Baum, Staci Becerra, James Becker, Noelyn Beckles, Maria Begeleus, Cyril Beharry, Peter Behrens, Louis Adam Belajack, Bruce Bell, Carl Bender, Marie Benedetti, Kathy Benedict, William Berger, Ilir Berisha, Luz Berisha, Edward Bernstein, Lisa Best, Sheila Birner, Sydney Blair, Edualdo Juan Blanco, Joseph Blasi, Melvin Blyden, Joseph Bockin, William Bodnar, Chris Boffa, Rosa Bonanno, Damasa Bonilla, Robert Borukhov, William Brady, Jeffrey Bratjan, James Braunreuther, Annette Breindel, William M Broderick, Brian Brody, Deborah Eileen Brown, Paul Zane Brown, Tom Brown, Antonio Brucculeri, Richard Bruce, Michael Bruestle, Wayne D Bryan, Richard Bucchieri, William Buchanan, James Buckley, Maryann Buono, Semen Burd, Christopher Burke, Peter Burke, Randy Burke, Joseph Burruezo, Colleen Butler, Janine M Butler, Joanne Butler, Sarah A Butler, Robert Byrne, Richard Cacace, Stanley Caesar, Nancy Calderazzo, John Caldwell, Clunis Calvert, Earl Campbell, Lori Campbell, Vito Cangemi, Rocco Caponigro. (Pounian, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Richard Abbate, Paul Abi-Daher, Ross Abramson, Patricia Adams, Anthony Afasano, Vincent Aiello, David Ales, Rena Alexander, Maurice Allen, Michael Alleva, Kim Almonte, Abimael Alvarez, Jose Alvarez, Lisa Amatura, David Alexander Anderson, Simon Anderson, Troy Anderson, Christine Araman, Allison Arce, Doris Arce, Paul Arida, Betty Aristud, Toni Atherley, Amy Baker, Joseph Balcuk, Salvatore Baldi, Lorenzo Balsamo, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, Brian Barcheski, Jessie Barnes, Jr., Anthony Barrella, Juan Barreto, John Barrington, William Barry, Juan Bastidas, David Bates, Jonathan Baum, Staci Becerra, James Becker, Noelyn Beckles, Maria Begeleus, Cyril Beharry, Peter Behrens, Louis Adam Belajack, Bruce Bell, Carl Bender, Marie Benedetti, Kathy Benedict, William Berger, Ilir Berisha, Luz Berisha, Edward Bernstein, Lisa Best, Sheila Birner, Sydney Blair, Edualdo Juan Blanco, Joseph Blasi, Melvin Blyden, Joseph Bockin, William Bodnar, Chris Boffa, Rosa Bonanno, Damasa Bonilla, Robert Borukhov, William Brady, Jeffrey Bratjan, James Braunreuther, Annette Breindel, William M Broderick, Brian Brody, Deborah Eileen Brown, Paul Zane Brown, Tom Brown, Antonio Brucculeri, Richard Bruce, Michael Bruestle, Wayne D Bryan, Richard Bucchieri, William Buchanan, James Buckley, Maryann Buono, Semen Burd, Christopher Burke, Peter Burke, Randy Burke, Joseph Burruezo, Colleen Butler, Janine M Butler, Joanne Butler, Sarah A Butler, Robert Byrne, Richard Cacace, Stanley Caesar, Nancy Calderazzo, John Caldwell, Clunis Calvert, Earl Campbell, Lori Campbell, Vito Cangemi, Rocco Caponigro.(Pounian, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pounian, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Antonio Brucculeri, Sheila Birner, Allison Arce, Anthony Barrella, Maurice Allen, Nancy Calderazzo, Marie Benedetti, Semen Burd, Cyril Beharry, David Alexander Anderson, William Buchanan, Kim Almonte, Louis Adam Belajack, John Barrington, Paul Abi-Daher, Juan Bastidas, Lisa Amatura, Brian Brody, Carl Bender, William Berger, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, James Becker, William Bodnar, Earl Campbell, Robert Borukhov, Edualdo Juan Blanco, Deborah Eileen Brown, Lori Campbell, Maria Begeleus, William Barry, Joseph Bockin, Ross Abramson, Maryann Buono, James Braunreuther, Sydney Blair, Joseph Burruezo, Melvin Blyden, Clunis Calvert, Jessie Barnes, Jr., David Ales, Damasa Bonilla, Janine M Butler, Simon Anderson, Vito Cangemi, Lisa Best, Troy Anderson, Doris Arce, Paul Arida, Rosa Bonanno, Patricia Adams, Betty Aristud, Jose Alvarez, David Bates, Jonathan Baum, Joseph Blasi, Abimael Alvarez, Luz Berisha, Wayne D Bryan, Richard Abbate, Richard Bruce, Lorenzo Balsamo, Edward Bernstein, Rena Alexander, Bruce Bell, Michael Alleva, Paul Zane Brown, Juan Barreto, James Buckley, Tom Brown, William Brady, Christine Araman, Sarah A Butler, Joanne Butler, Peter Burke, Peter Behrens, Christopher Burke, Anthony Afasano, Chris Boffa, Robert Byrne, Noelyn Beckles, Ilir Berisha, John Caldwell, Annette Breindel, Joseph Balcuk, Amy Baker, Michael Bruestle, Stanley Caesar, Toni Atherley, Staci Becerra, Salvatore Baldi, Rocco Caponigro, William M Broderick, Jeffrey Bratjan, Randy Burke, Brian Barcheski, Richard Cacace, Vincent Aiello, Richard Bucchieri, Kathy Benedict, Colleen Butler.(Pounian, Steven) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jgo).
December 3, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Steven R. Pounian to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the related case statement was not signed by the filing attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven R. Pounian to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the filing attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven R. Pounian. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due); Fee Date 11/27/2018;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid); the Fee Date has been modified to 11/28/2018;. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Richard Abbate, Paul Abi-Daher, Ross Abramson, Patricia Adams, Anthony Afasano, Vincent Aiello, David Ales, Rena Alexander, Maurice Allen, Michael Alleva, Kim Almonte, Abimael Alvarez, Jose Alvarez, Lisa Amatura, David Alexander Anderson, Simon Anderson, Troy Anderson, Christine Araman, Allison Arce, Doris Arce, Paul Arida, Betty Aristud, Toni Atherley, Amy Baker, Joseph Balcuk, Salvatore Baldi, Lorenzo Balsamo, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, Brian Barcheski, Jessie Barnes, Jr., Anthony Barrella, Juan Barreto, John Barrington, William Barry, Juan Bastidas, David Bates, Jonathan Baum, Staci Becerra, James Becker, Noelyn Beckles, Maria Begeleus, Cyril Beharry, Peter Behrens, Louis Adam Belajack, Bruce Bell, Carl Bender, Marie Benedetti, Kathy Benedict, William Berger, Ilir Berisha, Luz Berisha, Edward Bernstein, Lisa Best, Sheila Birner, Sydney Blair, Edualdo Juan Blanco, Joseph Blasi, Melvin Blyden, Joseph Bockin, William Bodnar, Chris Boffa, Rosa Bonanno, Damasa Bonilla, Robert Borukhov, William Brady, Jeffrey Bratjan, James Braunreuther, Annette Breindel, William M Broderick, Brian Brody, Deborah Eileen Brown, Paul Zane Brown, Tom Brown, Antonio Brucculeri, Richard Bruce, Michael Bruestle, Wayne D Bryan, Richard Bucchieri, William Buchanan, James Buckley, Maryann Buono, Semen Burd, Christopher Burke, Peter Burke, Randy Burke, Joseph Burruezo, Colleen Butler, Janine M Butler, Joanne Butler, Sarah A Butler, Robert Byrne, Richard Cacace, Stanley Caesar, Nancy Calderazzo, John Caldwell, Clunis Calvert, Earl Campbell, Lori Campbell, Vito Cangemi, Rocco Caponigro.(Pounian, Steven) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jgo).
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pounian, Steven) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jgo).
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Antonio Brucculeri, Sheila Birner, Allison Arce, Anthony Barrella, Maurice Allen, Nancy Calderazzo, Marie Benedetti, Semen Burd, Cyril Beharry, David Alexander Anderson, William Buchanan, Kim Almonte, Louis Adam Belajack, John Barrington, Paul Abi-Daher, Juan Bastidas, Lisa Amatura, Brian Brody, Carl Bender, William Berger, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, James Becker, William Bodnar, Earl Campbell, Robert Borukhov, Edualdo Juan Blanco, Deborah Eileen Brown, Lori Campbell, Maria Begeleus, William Barry, Joseph Bockin, Ross Abramson, Maryann Buono, James Braunreuther, Sydney Blair, Joseph Burruezo, Melvin Blyden, Clunis Calvert, Jessie Barnes, Jr., David Ales, Damasa Bonilla, Janine M Butler, Simon Anderson, Vito Cangemi, Lisa Best, Troy Anderson, Doris Arce, Paul Arida, Rosa Bonanno, Patricia Adams, Betty Aristud, Jose Alvarez, David Bates, Jonathan Baum, Joseph Blasi, Abimael Alvarez, Luz Berisha, Wayne D Bryan, Richard Abbate, Richard Bruce, Lorenzo Balsamo, Edward Bernstein, Rena Alexander, Bruce Bell, Michael Alleva, Paul Zane Brown, Juan Barreto, James Buckley, Tom Brown, William Brady, Christine Araman, Sarah A Butler, Joanne Butler, Peter Burke, Peter Behrens, Christopher Burke, Anthony Afasano, Chris Boffa, Robert Byrne, Noelyn Beckles, Ilir Berisha, John Caldwell, Annette Breindel, Joseph Balcuk, Amy Baker, Michael Bruestle, Stanley Caesar, Toni Atherley, Staci Becerra, Salvatore Baldi, Rocco Caponigro, William M Broderick, Jeffrey Bratjan, Randy Burke, Brian Barcheski, Richard Cacace, Vincent Aiello, Richard Bucchieri, Kathy Benedict, Colleen Butler. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Pounian, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15974501)Document filed by Richard Abbate. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Pounian, Steven) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jgo).
November 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney James P. Kreindler. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Christine Araman, John Barrington, David Alexander Anderson, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, Joseph Balcuk, Anthony Afasano, Anthony Barrella, Michael Alleva, Lorenzo Balsamo, Allison Arce, Vincent Aiello, Salvatore Baldi, Brian Barcheski, Juan Barreto, Amy Baker, Paul Abi-Daher, Toni Atherley, Ross Abramson, Jessie Barnes, Jr., Troy Anderson, David Bates, Paul Arida, Simon Anderson, Doris Arce, Jose Alvarez, David Ales, Patricia Adams, Abimael Alvarez, Jonathan Baum, Kim Almonte, Lisa Amatura, Betty Aristud, William Barry, Maurice Allen, Rena Alexander, Juan Bastidas added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Christine Araman, John Barrington, David Alexander Anderson, Karrie Shanstrom Bandel, Joseph Balcuk, Anthony Afasano, Anthony Barrella, Michael Alleva, Lorenzo Balsamo, Allison Arce, Vincent Aiello, Salvatore Baldi, Brian Barcheski, Juan Barreto, Amy Baker, Paul Abi-Daher, Toni Atherley, Ross Abramson, Jessie Barnes, Jr., Troy Anderson, David Bates, Paul Arida, Simon Anderson, Doris Arce, Jose Alvarez, David Ales, Patricia Adams, Abimael Alvarez, Jonathan Baum, Kim Almonte, Lisa Amatura, Betty Aristud, William Barry, Maurice Allen, Rena Alexander, Juan Bastidas. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Deborah Eileen Brown, Michael Bruestle, Paul Zane Brown, Annette Breindel, William M Broderick, William Buchanan, Richard Bucchieri, Wayne D Bryan, James Buckley, Antonio Brucculeri, Peter Burke, Maryann Buono, Randy Burke, Christopher Burke, Semen Burd, Brian Brody, Tom Brown, Richard Bruce added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Deborah Eileen Brown, Michael Bruestle, Paul Zane Brown, Annette Breindel, William M Broderick, William Buchanan, Richard Bucchieri, Wayne D Bryan, James Buckley, Antonio Brucculeri, Peter Burke, Maryann Buono, Randy Burke, Christopher Burke, Semen Burd, Brian Brody, Tom Brown, Richard Bruce. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Sarah A Butler, Nancy Calderazzo, Colleen Butler, Joseph Burruezo, Janine M Butler, Earl Campbell, Clunis Calvert, John Caldwell, Lori Campbell, Richard Cacace, Vito Cangemi, Rocco Caponigro, Joanne Butler, Robert Byrne, Stanley Caesar added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Sarah A Butler, Nancy Calderazzo, Colleen Butler, Joseph Burruezo, Janine M Butler, Earl Campbell, Clunis Calvert, John Caldwell, Lori Campbell, Richard Cacace, Vito Cangemi, Rocco Caponigro, Joanne Butler, Robert Byrne, Stanley Caesar. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)
November 28, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James P. Kreindler to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 12/3/2018. (jgo)
November 28, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Robert Borukhov, Maria Begeleus, James Braunreuther, Carl Bender, Damasa Bonilla, Cyril Beharry, Rosa Bonanno, William Bodnar, Staci Becerra, Joseph Bockin, James Becker, Jeffrey Bratjan, Edualdo Juan Blanco, William Berger, Kathy Benedict, Marie Benedetti, Ilir Berisha, Melvin Blyden, Louis Adam Belajack, Sheila Birner, Luz Berisha, Chris Boffa, Sydney Blair, William Brady, Lisa Best, Joseph Blasi, Edward Bernstein, Noelyn Beckles, Peter Behrens, Bruce Bell added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Robert Borukhov, Maria Begeleus, James Braunreuther, Carl Bender, Damasa Bonilla, Cyril Beharry, Rosa Bonanno, William Bodnar, Staci Becerra, Joseph Bockin, James Becker, Jeffrey Bratjan, Edualdo Juan Blanco, William Berger, Kathy Benedict, Marie Benedetti, Ilir Berisha, Melvin Blyden, Louis Adam Belajack, Sheila Birner, Luz Berisha, Chris Boffa, Sydney Blair, William Brady, Lisa Best, Joseph Blasi, Edward Bernstein, Noelyn Beckles, Peter Behrens, Bruce Bell. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Pounian, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbate et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Abbate
Represented By: James P. Kreindler
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Allen
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Borukhov
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cacace
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne D Bryan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Blyden
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Calderazzo
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Aristud
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semen Burd
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Burke
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Balsamo
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Berisha
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Blasi
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocco Caponigro
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Baldi
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelyn Beckles
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Benedict
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caldwell
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Braunreuther
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M Broderick
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clunis Calvert
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Brody
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Butler
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abimael Alvarez
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Arce
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Breindel
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Burke
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyril Beharry
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Campbell
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alleva
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barrington
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bratjan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Brown
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damasa Bonilla
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alexander Anderson
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Arce
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Behrens
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Burruezo
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Birner
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Barcheski
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito Cangemi
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bruestle
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bruce
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Adam Belajack
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bockin
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Zane Brown
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Best
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bodnar
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Eileen Brown
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Anderson
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karrie Shanstrom Bandel
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Becker
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Byrne
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Boffa
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Araman
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Barry
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Anderson
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Caesar
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Arida
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Balcuk
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Barrella
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Benedetti
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Brucculeri
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bates
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Bender
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rena Alexander
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Campbell
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Berger
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brady
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Baker
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine M Butler
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edualdo Juan Blanco
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Bell
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Abi-Daher
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Begeleus
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Buckley
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Blair
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bucchieri
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Baum
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Abramson
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Amatura
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Burke
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Becerra
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Afasano
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Almonte
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Aiello
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Atherley
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Buono
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Bernstein
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilir Berisha
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Bonanno
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alvarez
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Adams
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah A Butler
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Bastidas
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Buchanan
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ales
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Butler
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Barreto
Represented By: Steven R. Pounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?