Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd. v. Super Crypto Mining, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd.
Defendant: DPW Holdings, Inc. and Super Crypto Mining, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11099
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Johnnie Babnick, Jr on behalf of DPW Holdings, Inc., Super Crypto Mining, Inc.. (Babnick, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DPW Holdings, Inc. for Super Crypto Mining, Inc.. Document filed by Super Crypto Mining, Inc..(Volynsky, Robert)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Avalanche International Corp., Other Affiliate Alzamend Neuro, Inc., Other Affiliate Microphase Corp. for DPW Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by DPW Holdings, Inc..(Volynsky, Robert)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Brian Volynsky on behalf of DPW Holdings, Inc., Super Crypto Mining, Inc.. (Volynsky, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd.. (Meister, Ronald)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Super Crypto Mining, Inc.. (pne)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DPW Holdings, Inc.. (pne)
November 29, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ronald William Meister. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:203; Dollar Demand $1,388,495,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,388,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (pne)
November 29, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 29, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 29, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DPW Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd.. (Meister, Ronald)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Super Crypto Mining, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd.. (Meister, Ronald)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd..(Meister, Ronald)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Meister, Ronald)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DPW Holdings, Inc., Super Crypto Mining, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15972488)Document filed by Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd..(Meister, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd. v. Super Crypto Mining, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPW Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Brian Volynsky
Represented By: Richard Johnnie Babnick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Crypto Mining, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Brian Volynsky
Represented By: Richard Johnnie Babnick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blockchain Mining Supply and Services Ltd.
Represented By: Ronald William Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?