Stroud v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Stroud
Defendant: Lorie Giammattei, HSBC USA, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ariola Turdiu and HSBC North America Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11113
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ariola Turdiu waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Rodney Stroud. (Cohen, Johnmack)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Rodney Stroud. (Cohen, Johnmack)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. Document filed by Rodney Stroud. (Cohen, Johnmack)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Ariola Turdiu with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Rodney Stroud. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cohen, Johnmack)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cohen, Johnmack)
November 29, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 29, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 29, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 29, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Johnmack Cohen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:2003. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331. (sj)
November 29, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Johnmack Cohen to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; filing the civil cover sheet is its own separate event. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lorie Giammattei, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc., Ariola Turdiu. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15974442)Document filed by Rodney Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Johnmack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroud v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Giammattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariola Turdiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Stroud
Represented By: Johnmack Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?