Carlo et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Joseph Quinones, Dennis Dawid, Gary Luciani, Elayne Gross, Darryl Wynn, Peter Grzywacz, Wai Man Leung, Mary Muniz, Barry Kahn, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Robert Claude McPherson, Jonathan Rodriguez, Mary Ann Murphy, Enrique Lopez, Walter Norfleet, Alfonse Pagano, Shaik Hassan, Neil Gimpel, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Pat Miele, Owen B. Gray, Maria Palladino, Henry Clark, Jerrold Shien, David Gary Lipman, Bruce Moskowitz, Bernabe Reyes, Steve Danso, Richard Pinzon, James Lamendola, Frank Liverani, George Kambosoulis, Thomas Hayes, Alexander Krym, Paul Peragine, William Loschiavo, Antoaneta Nicolae, Wilbert Coleman, Colleen McGowan, Roy Larson, James Sperring, Victoria Luther, Joel Karp, Joseph McLaughlin, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Angela Sabatino, William Mlotok, Joseph Dibello, David Wonneman, Gladys Carlo, Raffaele Ruggiero, Richard Wilt, Philipp Von Preysing, Edwin Cruz, Viqui Maggio-White, Michael Weholt, John Walker, Joseph Doherty, Robert Goode, Christopher Kunz, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Kevin Anthony Hardy, Mayer Michael Wachs, Joseph Vivinetto, Naomi McCray, Robert Constantine, Stanley Johnson, Noel Plunkett, Kenneth Marasco, Andrew Picariello, Dennis Faicco, Rosalie Rossi, Raymond Doyle, Edmond Lem, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, Yefim Khitro, Giuseppe Pavia, Michael Fella, Robert Thacker, Rosalyn Davis, Kevin McCaffrey, Andrew Tessitore, Robert Heller, Erasmo Durso, Maxine Steinhaus, Juan Torres, John Duryea, Jay Fagan, Rosemin Gonzales, Joseph Oriente, John Reidy, Mark Monheit, Noel Marie Clink, Jane Joseph, Eugene Desantis, Valerie Ann Grosso, Patricia Sindoni, Ingrid Cheryl James, Paula Hilliard and John Reiff
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11144
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 7, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 6, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Gladys Carlo, Henry Clark, Noel Marie Clink, Wilbert Coleman, Robert Constantine, Edwin Cruz, Steve Danso, Rosalyn Davis, Dennis Dawid, Eugene Desantis, Joseph Dibello, Joseph Doherty, Raymond Doyle, Erasmo Durso, John Duryea, Jay Fagan, Dennis Faicco, Michael Fella, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, Neil Gimpel, Rosemin Gonzales, Robert Goode, Owen B. Gray, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Elayne Gross, Valerie Ann Grosso, Peter Grzywacz, Kevin Anthony Hardy, Shaik Hassan, Thomas Hayes, Robert Heller, Paula Hilliard, Ingrid Cheryl James, Stanley Johnson, Jane Joseph, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Barry Kahn, George Kambosoulis, Joel Karp, Yefim Khitro, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Alexander Krym, Christopher Kunz, James Lamendola, Roy Larson, Edmond Lem, Wai Man Leung, David Gary Lipman, Frank Liverani, Enrique Lopez, William Loschiavo, Gary Luciani, Victoria Luther, Viqui Maggio-White, Kenneth Marasco, Kevin McCaffrey, Naomi McCray, Colleen McGowan, Joseph McLaughlin, Robert Claude McPherson, Pat Miele, William Mlotok, Mark Monheit, Bruce Moskowitz, Mary Muniz, Mary Ann Murphy, Antoaneta Nicolae, Walter Norfleet, Joseph Oriente, Alfonse Pagano, Maria Palladino, Giuseppe Pavia, Paul Peragine, Andrew Picariello, Richard Pinzon, Noel Plunkett, Joseph Quinones, John Reidy, John Reiff, Bernabe Reyes, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Jonathan Rodriguez, Rosalie Rossi, Raffaele Ruggiero, Angela Sabatino, Jerrold Shien, Patricia Sindoni, James Sperring, Maxine Steinhaus, Andrew Tessitore, Robert Thacker, Juan Torres, Joseph Vivinetto, Philipp Von Preysing, Mayer Michael Wachs, John Walker, Michael Weholt, Richard Wilt, David Wonneman, Darryl Wynn.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Maloney, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #10 Statement of Relatedness) - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Gladys Carlo, Henry Clark, Noel Marie Clink, Wilbert Coleman, Robert Constantine, Edwin Cruz, Steve Danso, Rosalyn Davis, Dennis Dawid, Eugene Desantis, Joseph Dibello, Joseph Doherty, Raymond Doyle, Erasmo Durso, John Duryea, Jay Fagan, Dennis Faicco, Michael Fella, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, Neil Gimpel, Rosemin Gonzales, Robert Goode, Owen B. Gray, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Elayne Gross, Valerie Ann Grosso, Peter Grzywacz, Kevin Anthony Hardy, Shaik Hassan, Thomas Hayes, Robert Heller, Paula Hilliard, Ingrid Cheryl James, Stanley Johnson, Jane Joseph, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Barry Kahn, George Kambosoulis, Joel Karp, Yefim Khitro, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Alexander Krym, Christopher Kunz, James Lamendola, Roy Larson, Edmond Lem, Wai Man Leung, David Gary Lipman, Frank Liverani, Enrique Lopez, William Loschiavo, Gary Luciani, Victoria Luther, Viqui Maggio-White, Kenneth Marasco, Kevin McCaffrey, Naomi McCray, Colleen McGowan, Joseph McLaughlin, Robert Claude McPherson, Pat Miele, William Mlotok, Mark Monheit, Bruce Moskowitz, Mary Muniz, Mary Ann Murphy, Antoaneta Nicolae, Walter Norfleet, Joseph Oriente, Alfonse Pagano, Maria Palladino, Giuseppe Pavia, Paul Peragine, Andrew Picariello, Richard Pinzon, Noel Plunkett, Joseph Quinones, John Reidy, John Reiff, Bernabe Reyes, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Jonathan Rodriguez, Rosalie Rossi, Raffaele Ruggiero, Angela Sabatino, Jerrold Shien, Patricia Sindoni, James Sperring, Maxine Steinhaus, Andrew Tessitore, Robert Thacker, Juan Torres, Joseph Vivinetto, Philipp Von Preysing, Mayer Michael Wachs, John Walker, Michael Weholt, Richard Wilt, David Wonneman, Darryl Wynn.(Maloney, Andrew) Modified on 12/4/2018 (db).
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #9 Civil Cover Sheet) - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Maloney, Andrew) Modified on 12/4/2018 (db).
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #9 Civil Cover Sheet) - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Maloney, Andrew) Modified on 12/4/2018 (db).
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Richard Wilt, Kenneth Marasco, Paula Hilliard, Robert Heller, Neil Gimpel, Joseph Quinones, Edwin Cruz, Elayne Gross, Viqui Maggio-White, Andrew Tessitore, Raffaele Ruggiero, Joseph McLaughlin, Dennis Faicco, Juan Torres, Pat Miele, John Duryea, Valerie Ann Grosso, Joseph Vivinetto, Jonathan Rodriguez, Michael Weholt, Robert Claude McPherson, Enrique Lopez, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, David Gary Lipman, Mary Ann Murphy, Alexander Krym, Paul Peragine, Dennis Dawid, Thomas Hayes, Colleen McGowan, John Reidy, Stanley Johnson, Eugene Desantis, William Mlotok, Frank Liverani, Mark Monheit, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Walter Norfleet, Naomi McCray, Kevin Anthony Hardy, William Loschiavo, George Kambosoulis, Joseph Dibello, Erasmo Durso, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Yefim Khitro, Joel Karp, Michael Fella, Giuseppe Pavia, Maxine Steinhaus, Christopher Kunz, Rosalie Rossi, Mary Muniz, Gladys Carlo, Jay Fagan, Robert Thacker, Jerrold Shien, Shaik Hassan, Roy Larson, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Peter Grzywacz, Andrew Picariello, Antoaneta Nicolae, Patricia Sindoni, Richard Pinzon, Maria Palladino, Noel Plunkett, Raymond Doyle, Gary Luciani, James Sperring, John Reiff, Owen B. Gray, David Wonneman, Victoria Luther, Joseph Oriente, Bruce Moskowitz, Philipp Von Preysing, Rosemin Gonzales, Mayer Michael Wachs, Robert Goode, Joseph Doherty, Kevin McCaffrey, Robert Constantine, Edmond Lem, Henry Clark, Jane Joseph, Darryl Wynn, John Walker, Rosalyn Davis, Wai Man Leung, Bernabe Reyes, Steve Danso, Barry Kahn, Noel Marie Clink, Ingrid Cheryl James, Alfonse Pagano, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Angela Sabatino, James Lamendola, Wilbert Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Maloney, Andrew)
November 30, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
November 30, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 30, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
November 30, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Charles Cook to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint,,,,,, #1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney who filed it. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Gladys Carlo, Henry Clark, Noel Marie Clink, Wilbert Coleman, Robert Constantine, Edwin Cruz, Steve Danso, Rosalyn Davis, Dennis Dawid, Eugene Desantis, Joseph Dibello, Joseph Doherty, Raymond Doyle, Erasmo Durso, John Duryea, Jay Fagan, Dennis Faicco, Michael Fella, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, Neil Gimpel, Rosemin Gonzales, Robert Goode, Owen B. Gray, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Elayne Gross, Valerie Ann Grosso, Peter Grzywacz, Kevin Anthony Hardy, Shaik Hassan, Thomas Hayes, Robert Heller, Paula Hilliard, Ingrid Cheryl James, Stanley Johnson, Jane Joseph, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Barry Kahn, George Kambosoulis, Joel Karp, Yefim Khitro, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Alexander Krym, Christopher Kunz, James Lamendola, Roy Larson, Edmond Lem, Wai Man Leung, David Gary Lipman, Frank Liverani, Enrique Lopez, William Loschiavo, Gary Luciani, Victoria Luther, Viqui Maggio-White, Kenneth Marasco, Kevin McCaffrey, Naomi McCray, Colleen McGowan, Joseph McLaughlin, Robert Claude McPherson, Pat Miele, William Mlotok, Mark Monheit, Bruce Moskowitz, Mary Muniz, Mary Ann Murphy, Antoaneta Nicolae, Walter Norfleet, Joseph Oriente, Alfonse Pagano, Maria Palladino, Giuseppe Pavia, Paul Peragine, Andrew Picariello, Richard Pinzon, Noel Plunkett, Joseph Quinones, John Reidy, John Reiff, Bernabe Reyes, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Jonathan Rodriguez, Rosalie Rossi, Raffaele Ruggiero, Angela Sabatino, Jerrold Shien, Patricia Sindoni, James Sperring, Maxine Steinhaus, Andrew Tessitore, Robert Thacker, Juan Torres, Joseph Vivinetto, Philipp Von Preysing, Mayer Michael Wachs, John Walker, Michael Weholt, Richard Wilt, David Wonneman, Darryl Wynn.(Cook, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cook, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Richard Wilt, Kenneth Marasco, Paula Hilliard, Robert Heller, Neil Gimpel, Joseph Quinones, Edwin Cruz, Elayne Gross, Viqui Maggio-White, Andrew Tessitore, Raffaele Ruggiero, Joseph McLaughlin, Dennis Faicco, Juan Torres, Pat Miele, John Duryea, Valerie Ann Grosso, Joseph Vivinetto, Jonathan Rodriguez, Michael Weholt, Robert Claude McPherson, Enrique Lopez, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, David Gary Lipman, Mary Ann Murphy, Alexander Krym, Paul Peragine, Dennis Dawid, Thomas Hayes, Colleen McGowan, John Reidy, Stanley Johnson, Eugene Desantis, William Mlotok, Frank Liverani, Mark Monheit, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Walter Norfleet, Naomi McCray, Kevin Anthony Hardy, William Loschiavo, George Kambosoulis, Joseph Dibello, Erasmo Durso, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Yefim Khitro, Joel Karp, Michael Fella, Giuseppe Pavia, Maxine Steinhaus, Christopher Kunz, Rosalie Rossi, Mary Muniz, Gladys Carlo, Jay Fagan, Robert Thacker, Jerrold Shien, Shaik Hassan, Roy Larson, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Peter Grzywacz, Andrew Picariello, Antoaneta Nicolae, Patricia Sindoni, Richard Pinzon, Maria Palladino, Noel Plunkett, Raymond Doyle, Gary Luciani, James Sperring, John Reiff, Owen B. Gray, David Wonneman, Victoria Luther, Joseph Oriente, Bruce Moskowitz, Philipp Von Preysing, Rosemin Gonzales, Mayer Michael Wachs, Robert Goode, Joseph Doherty, Kevin McCaffrey, Robert Constantine, Edmond Lem, Henry Clark, Jane Joseph, Darryl Wynn, John Walker, Rosalyn Davis, Wai Man Leung, Bernabe Reyes, Steve Danso, Barry Kahn, Noel Marie Clink, Ingrid Cheryl James, Alfonse Pagano, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Angela Sabatino, James Lamendola, Wilbert Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Cook, David) Modified on 11/30/2018 (pc).
November 29, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Kenneth Marasco, Paula Hilliard, Robert Heller, Neil Gimpel, Edwin Cruz, Elayne Gross, Viqui Maggio-White, Joseph McLaughlin, Dennis Faicco, Pat Miele, John Duryea, Valerie Ann Grosso, Robert Claude McPherson, Enrique Lopez, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, David Gary Lipman, Mary Ann Murphy, Alexander Krym, Dennis Dawid, Thomas Hayes, Colleen McGowan, Stanley Johnson, Eugene Desantis, William Mlotok, Frank Liverani, Mark Monheit, Walter Norfleet, Naomi McCray, Kevin Anthony Hardy, William Loschiavo, George Kambosoulis, Joseph Dibello, Erasmo Durso, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Yefim Khitro, Joel Karp, Michael Fella, Christopher Kunz, Mary Muniz, Gladys Carlo, Jay Fagan, Shaik Hassan, Roy Larson, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Peter Grzywacz, Antoaneta Nicolae, Raymond Doyle, Gary Luciani, Owen B. Gray, Victoria Luther, Joseph Oriente, Bruce Moskowitz, Rosemin Gonzales, Robert Goode, Joseph Doherty, Kevin McCaffrey, Robert Constantine, Edmond Lem, Henry Clark, Jane Joseph, Rosalyn Davis, Wai Man Leung, Steve Danso, Barry Kahn, Noel Marie Clink, Ingrid Cheryl James, Jaclyn Kaczynski, James Lamendola, Wilbert Coleman, John Walker, Paul Peragine, David Wonneman, John Reidy, Mayer Michael Wachs, Andrew Picariello, Philipp Von Preysing, Darryl Wynn, Juan Torres, Alfonse Pagano, Robert Thacker, Maria Palladino, Richard Wilt, James Sperring, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Bernabe Reyes, John Reiff, Andrew Tessitore, Jonathan Rodriguez, Noel Plunkett, Jerrold Shien, Rosalie Rossi, Joseph Vivinetto, Patricia Sindoni, Michael Weholt, Angela Sabatino, Maxine Steinhaus, Raffaele Ruggiero, Richard Pinzon, Giuseppe Pavia, Joseph Quinones added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Kenneth Marasco, Paula Hilliard, Robert Heller, Neil Gimpel, Edwin Cruz, Elayne Gross, Viqui Maggio-White, Joseph McLaughlin, Dennis Faicco, Pat Miele, John Duryea, Valerie Ann Grosso, Robert Claude McPherson, Enrique Lopez, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, David Gary Lipman, Mary Ann Murphy, Alexander Krym, Dennis Dawid, Thomas Hayes, Colleen McGowan, Stanley Johnson, Eugene Desantis, William Mlotok, Frank Liverani, Mark Monheit, Walter Norfleet, Naomi McCray, Kevin Anthony Hardy, William Loschiavo, George Kambosoulis, Joseph Dibello, Erasmo Durso, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Yefim Khitro, Joel Karp, Michael Fella, Christopher Kunz, Mary Muniz, Gladys Carlo, Jay Fagan, Shaik Hassan, Roy Larson, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Peter Grzywacz, Antoaneta Nicolae, Raymond Doyle, Gary Luciani, Owen B. Gray, Victoria Luther, Joseph Oriente, Bruce Moskowitz, Rosemin Gonzales, Robert Goode, Joseph Doherty, Kevin McCaffrey, Robert Constantine, Edmond Lem, Henry Clark, Jane Joseph, Rosalyn Davis, Wai Man Leung, Steve Danso, Barry Kahn, Noel Marie Clink, Ingrid Cheryl James, Jaclyn Kaczynski, James Lamendola, Wilbert Coleman, John Walker, Paul Peragine, David Wonneman, John Reidy, Mayer Michael Wachs, Andrew Picariello, Philipp Von Preysing, Darryl Wynn, Juan Torres, Alfonse Pagano, Robert Thacker, Maria Palladino, Richard Wilt, James Sperring, Pietro Ernesto Riva, Bernabe Reyes, John Reiff, Andrew Tessitore, Jonathan Rodriguez, Noel Plunkett, Jerrold Shien, Rosalie Rossi, Joseph Vivinetto, Patricia Sindoni, Michael Weholt, Angela Sabatino, Maxine Steinhaus, Raffaele Ruggiero, Richard Pinzon, Giuseppe Pavia, Joseph Quinones. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Cook, David)
November 29, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Paula Hilliard, Robert Heller, Neil Gimpel, Edwin Cruz, Elayne Gross, Dennis Faicco, John Duryea, Valerie Ann Grosso, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, Dennis Dawid, Thomas Hayes, Stanley Johnson, Eugene Desantis, Kevin Anthony Hardy, Joseph Dibello, Erasmo Durso, Michael Fella, Gladys Carlo, Jay Fagan, Shaik Hassan, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Peter Grzywacz, Raymond Doyle, Owen B. Gray, Rosemin Gonzales, Robert Goode, Joseph Doherty, Robert Constantine, Henry Clark, Jane Joseph, Rosalyn Davis, Steve Danso, Barry Kahn, Noel Marie Clink, Ingrid Cheryl James, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Wilbert Coleman, Bruce Moskowitz, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Antoaneta Nicolae, Edmond Lem, Mark Monheit, Alexander Krym, William Mlotok, Walter Norfleet, Robert Claude McPherson, George Kambosoulis, Joseph McLaughlin, Joel Karp, Mary Ann Murphy, Kevin McCaffrey, Frank Liverani, David Gary Lipman, Wai Man Leung, Colleen McGowan, Enrique Lopez, James Lamendola, Viqui Maggio-White, Joseph Oriente, William Loschiavo, Pat Miele, Kenneth Marasco, Mary Muniz, Victoria Luther, Naomi McCray, Gary Luciani, Yefim Khitro, Christopher Kunz, Roy Larson added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Paula Hilliard, Robert Heller, Neil Gimpel, Edwin Cruz, Elayne Gross, Dennis Faicco, John Duryea, Valerie Ann Grosso, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, Dennis Dawid, Thomas Hayes, Stanley Johnson, Eugene Desantis, Kevin Anthony Hardy, Joseph Dibello, Erasmo Durso, Michael Fella, Gladys Carlo, Jay Fagan, Shaik Hassan, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Peter Grzywacz, Raymond Doyle, Owen B. Gray, Rosemin Gonzales, Robert Goode, Joseph Doherty, Robert Constantine, Henry Clark, Jane Joseph, Rosalyn Davis, Steve Danso, Barry Kahn, Noel Marie Clink, Ingrid Cheryl James, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Wilbert Coleman, Bruce Moskowitz, Sheri Kirshenbaum, Antoaneta Nicolae, Edmond Lem, Mark Monheit, Alexander Krym, William Mlotok, Walter Norfleet, Robert Claude McPherson, George Kambosoulis, Joseph McLaughlin, Joel Karp, Mary Ann Murphy, Kevin McCaffrey, Frank Liverani, David Gary Lipman, Wai Man Leung, Colleen McGowan, Enrique Lopez, James Lamendola, Viqui Maggio-White, Joseph Oriente, William Loschiavo, Pat Miele, Kenneth Marasco, Mary Muniz, Victoria Luther, Naomi McCray, Gary Luciani, Yefim Khitro, Christopher Kunz, Roy Larson. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Cook, David)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15980662)Document filed by Paula Hilliard, Robert Heller, Neil Gimpel, Edwin Cruz, Elayne Gross, Jay Fagan, Gladys Carlo, Dennis Faicco, Shaik Hassan, John Duryea, Valerie Ann Grosso, Bruce C. Grilikhes, Peter Grzywacz, Elisa Paula Gerontianos, Raymond Doyle, Owen B. Gray, Dennis Dawid, Thomas Hayes, Stanley Johnson, Eugene Desantis, Rosemin Gonzales, Joseph Doherty, Robert Goode, Kevin Anthony Hardy, Robert Constantine, Jane Joseph, Henry Clark, Rosalyn Davis, Joseph Dibello, Erasmo Durso, Barry Kahn, Steve Danso, Noel Marie Clink, Ingrid Cheryl James, Jaclyn Kaczynski, Michael Fella, Wilbert Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Cook, David) Modified on 11/30/2018 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlo et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Quinones
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Dawid
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Luciani
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elayne Gross
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Wynn
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Grzywacz
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wai Man Leung
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Muniz
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Kahn
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Kaczynski
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Claude McPherson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Rodriguez
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Murphy
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Lopez
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Norfleet
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonse Pagano
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaik Hassan
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Gimpel
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Kirshenbaum
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Miele
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen B. Gray
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Palladino
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Clark
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrold Shien
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gary Lipman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Moskowitz
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernabe Reyes
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Danso
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Pinzon
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lamendola
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Liverani
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kambosoulis
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hayes
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Krym
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Peragine
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Loschiavo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoaneta Nicolae
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Coleman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen McGowan
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Larson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sperring
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Luther
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Karp
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McLaughlin
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce C. Grilikhes
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Sabatino
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mlotok
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dibello
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wonneman
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Carlo
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffaele Ruggiero
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wilt
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philipp Von Preysing
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Cruz
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viqui Maggio-White
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Weholt
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walker
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Doherty
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Goode
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kunz
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro Ernesto Riva
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Anthony Hardy
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayer Michael Wachs
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Vivinetto
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi McCray
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Constantine
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Johnson
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Plunkett
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Marasco
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Picariello
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Faicco
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Rossi
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Doyle
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond Lem
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Paula Gerontianos
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yefim Khitro
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppe Pavia
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fella
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Thacker
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Davis
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McCaffrey
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Tessitore
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Heller
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erasmo Durso
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Steinhaus
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Torres
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Duryea
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Fagan
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemin Gonzales
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Oriente
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Reidy
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Monheit
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Marie Clink
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Joseph
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Desantis
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Ann Grosso
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Sindoni
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Cheryl James
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Hilliard
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Reiff
Represented By: David Charles Cook
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?