Ray v. Balestriere Fariello LLP et al
Plaintiff: Ames Ray
Defendant: John Does 1-5, John G. Balestriere and Balestriere Fariello LLP
Case Number: 1:2018cv11211
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 m
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/4/2019) (rro)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned Parties that 1. Defendants time to file their answer or Motion to Dismiss is extended from December 31, 2018 to March 1, 2019; 2. Plaintiffs time to file his opposition to any Motion to Dismiss is extended to May 1, 2019; and 3. Defendants time to reply in further support of their Motion to Dismiss is extended to June 3, 2019. (John G. Balestriere answer due 3/1/2019; Balestriere Fariello LLP answer due 3/1/2019. Motions due by 3/1/2019. Responses due by 5/1/2019. Replies due by 6/3/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/20/2018) (jwh)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by John G. Balestriere, Balestriere Fariello LLP. (McNeil, Jillian)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jillian Lee McNeil on behalf of John G. Balestriere, Balestriere Fariello LLP. (McNeil, Jillian)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. John G. Balestriere served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018; Balestriere Fariello LLP served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018; John Does 1-5 served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. Service was accepted by Karen Bubelnik. Document filed by Ames Ray. (Anziska, David)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John G. Balestriere, Balestriere Fariello LLP, John Does 1-5. (pc)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Balestriere Fariello LLP, John G. Balestriere and John Does 1-5, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Ames Ray. (Anziska, David)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against John G. Balestriere, Balestriere Fariello LLP, John Does 1-5. Document filed by Ames Ray.(Anziska, David)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David B. Anziska. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $2000000000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2000000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David B. Anziska to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David B. Anziska. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ames Ray. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David B. Anziska to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Balestriere Fariello LLP, John G. Balestriere and John Does 1-5, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ames Ray. (Anziska, David) Modified on 12/4/2018 (jgo).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Anziska, David)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15992875)Document filed by Ames Ray.(Anziska, David) Modified on 12/4/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Balestriere Fariello LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Balestriere
Represented By: Jillian Lee McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balestriere Fariello LLP
Represented By: Jillian Lee McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ames Ray
Represented By: David B. Anziska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?