Dass v. The City University of New York et al
Plaintiff: Krishna Dass
Defendant: The City University of New York, Johanna Gomez, Joshua Rivera, Eugene Sohn, Nathaniel Cruz, David Gomez and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv11325
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Complaint. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than March 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Nathaniel Cruz answer due 3/25/2019; David Gomez answer due 3/25/2019; Johanna Gomez answer due 3/25/2019; Joshua Rivera answer due 3/25/2019; Eugene Sohn answer due 3/25/2019; The City University of New York answer due 3/25/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/22/2019) (rro)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Gary Moy dated 1/18/2019. Document filed by The City University of New York.(Moy, Gary)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nathaniel Cruz. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua Rivera. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johanna Gomez. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eugene Sohn. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Gomez. (dnh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City University of New York. (dnh)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nathaniel Cruz, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Krishna Dass. (Krouner, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joshua Rivera, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Krishna Dass. (Krouner, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Johanna Gomez, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Krishna Dass. (Krouner, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eugene Sohn, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Krishna Dass. (Krouner, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Gomez, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Krishna Dass. (Krouner, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City University of New York, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Krishna Dass. (Krouner, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nathaniel Cruz, Does 1-10, David Gomez, Johanna Gomez, Joshua Rivera, Eugene Sohn, The City University of New York. Document filed by Krishna Dass.(Krouner, Todd)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Todd Jay Krouner to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; each request is its own separate event. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Todd Jay Krouner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Todd Jay Krouner to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECFm (Does 1-10); the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Nathaniel Cruz, David Gomez, Johanna Gomez, Joshua Rivera, Eugene Sohn, The City University of New York, Does 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Krishna Dass. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Krouner, Todd)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City University of New York; David Gomez; Joshua Rivera; Nathaniel Cruz; Eugene Sohn; Johanna Gomez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Krishna Dass. (Krouner, Todd) Modified on 12/6/2018 (sj).
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Krouner, Todd)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Nathaniel Cruz, David Gomez, Johanna Gomez, Joshua Rivera, Eugene Sohn, The City University of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16005813)Document filed by Krishna Dass.(Krouner, Todd) Modified on 12/6/2018 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dass v. The City University of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Dass
Represented By: Todd Jay Krouner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City University of New York
Represented By: Gary Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanna Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?