Banfield et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Walter Jensen, Jose M. Burgos, Robert Toscano, John Barrett, Richard Richard Bruno, Robert Reinhardt, Salvatore Pugliese, Robert Zerilli, Joseph Hunter, Jose Garcia, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Joseph Mazzei, Paul Picciano, Philip Scarfi, Luigi Scorcia, David Shapiro, Kenneth Olsen, Andrew Pecoraino, John Shurina, John Layton, Edwin Marshall, James Vernicek, Israel Morales, Craig Giuffre, Michael Serra, Lawrence Klingener, Joseph Lupo, Kenneth Baudanza, Frank Russo, Peter Esposito, Richard Taylor, Scott Heuer, Daniel Quirke, Hector Torres, Michael Duignan, Thomas Tillotson, Regina Graham, Eric Sacknoff, Gerard Quinn, Edward Trentacosta, Edward Opfer, Frank Perniciaro, John Dunn, Atef Moussa, Christopher Reinhard, Lester Squires, Jose Velasquez, Peter Harvey, Christopher Bedard, James Fearon, Gerard Pisano, Robert Stringer, Vincent Forras, Gary Theriault, Robert Sabatino, Richard Grande, Brandon Banfield, Orlando Vega, Michelle Pohl, Haydee Pabey, Herbert Hickey, Jarod Ottley, Peter Fronimakis, Gary Robbins, Daniel Noonan, Peter Romeo, Jr.,, Edward Wallace, Peter Woods, Karen Gordon, Gerard Davan, Charles Langone, Joseph Bellissimo, David Rowe, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Daniel Raleigh, Peter Panayiotou, Timothy Murphy, Alice Winkler, Patrick Byrnes, Sebastian Santoro, Salvatore Sferrazza, Victor Laguer, Thomas Lorello, Vincent Laterra, Harry Poole, Santo Barraco, Lori Mazzeo, Phillip Moore, William Peters, Robert Deforge, Fred Taylor, Mary McMillan, Victor Leeber, Dennis Quinn, Roger Owens, Vishnu Maharaj, James Tozzo, Joseph Thompson, Gilbert Ramirez and Christopher Bonin, Sr.
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Sr., Christopher Bonin
Case Number: 1:2018cv11346
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Kenneth Olsen; John Layton; Vincent Laterra; Karen Gordon; Joseph Bellissimo; Herbert Hickey; Hector Torres; Edward Trentacosta; Vishnu Maharaj; Peter Fronimakis; Peter Panayiotou; Edward Opfer; James Fearon; Joseph Hunter; Frank Perniciaro; Christopher Reinhard; Salvatore Sferrazza; Craig Giuffre; Luigi Scorcia; Gilbert Ramirez; Philip Scarfi; Alice Winkler; Robert Reinhardt; Dennis Quinn; Lester Squires; Patrick Byrnes; Charles Langone; Joseph Thompson; Thomas Lorello; Phillip Moore; Gerard Davan; Peter Woods; Edward Wallace; Edwin Marshall; Mary McMillan; Fred Taylor; Daniel Quirke; Sebastian Santoro; Gerard Pisano; Lawrence Klingener; Orlando Vega; Richard Richard Bruno; William Peters; Gary Robbins; Harry Poole; Atef Moussa; Robert Deforge; Roger Owens; Peter Esposito; Robert Zerilli; Timothy Murphy; Maria Ward-Bourdis; Richard Taylor; Jose Garcia; Frank Russo; John Shurina; David Rowe; Brandon Banfield; Vincent Forras; James Tozzo; Victor Laguer; Michael Serra; Scott Heuer; Walter Jensen; Jose Velasquez; David Shapiro; John Dunn; Jarod Ottley; Thomas Tillotson; Andrew Pecoraino; James Vernicek; Peter Harvey; Joseph Mazzei; Daniel Noonan; Salvatore Pugliese; Peter Romeo, Jr; Robert Toscano; Lori Mazzeo; Israel Morales; Regina Graham; Richard Grande; Michael Duignan; Michelle Pohl; Robert Sabatino; Christopher Bedard; Gerard Quinn; Santo Barraco; Joseph Lupo; Haydee Pabey; Paul Picciano; Lynne Sanderson-Burgess; Jose M. Burgos; Christopher Bonin, Sr.; John Barrett; Victor Leeber; Daniel Raleigh; Gary Theriault; Eric Sacknoff; Robert Stringer; Kenneth Baudanza. (Kreindler, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 19, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 19, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Brandon Banfield, Santo Barraco, John Barrett, Kenneth Baudanza, Christopher Bedard, Joseph Bellissimo, Christopher Bonin, Sr., Jose M. Burgos, Patrick Byrnes, Gerard Davan, Robert Deforge, Michael Duignan, John Dunn, Peter Esposito, James Fearon, Vincent Forras, Peter Fronimakis, Jose Garcia, Craig Giuffre, Karen Gordon, Regina Graham, Richard Grande, Peter Harvey, Scott Heuer, Herbert Hickey, Joseph Hunter, Walter Jensen, Lawrence Klingener, Victor Laguer, Charles Langone, Vincent Laterra, John Layton, Victor Leeber, Thomas Lorello, Joseph Lupo, Vishnu Maharaj, Edwin Marshall, Joseph Mazzei, Lori Mazzeo, Mary McMillan, Phillip Moore, Israel Morales, Atef Moussa, Timothy Murphy, Daniel Noonan, Kenneth Olsen, Edward Opfer, Jarod Ottley, Roger Owens, Haydee Pabey, Peter Panayiotou, Andrew Pecoraino, Frank Perniciaro, William Peters, Paul Picciano, Gerard Pisano, Michelle Pohl, Harry Poole, Salvatore Pugliese, Dennis Quinn, Gerard Quinn, Daniel Quirke, Daniel Raleigh, Gilbert Ramirez, Christopher Reinhard, Robert Reinhardt, Richard Richard Bruno, Gary Robbins, Peter Romeo, Jr, David Rowe, Frank Russo, Robert Sabatino, Eric Sacknoff, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Sebastian Santoro, Philip Scarfi, Luigi Scorcia, Michael Serra, Salvatore Sferrazza, David Shapiro, John Shurina, Lester Squires, Robert Stringer, Fred Taylor, Richard Taylor, Gary Theriault, Joseph Thompson, Thomas Tillotson, Hector Torres, Robert Toscano, James Tozzo, Edward Trentacosta, Orlando Vega, Jose Velasquez, James Vernicek, Edward Wallace, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Alice Winkler, Peter Woods, Robert Zerilli.(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Kenneth Olsen, John Layton, Vincent Laterra, Karen Gordon, Joseph Bellissimo, Herbert Hickey, Hector Torres, Edward Trentacosta, Vishnu Maharaj, Peter Fronimakis, Peter Panayiotou, Edward Opfer, James Fearon, Joseph Hunter, Frank Perniciaro, Christopher Reinhard, Salvatore Sferrazza, Craig Giuffre, Luigi Scorcia, Gilbert Ramirez, Philip Scarfi, Alice Winkler, Robert Reinhardt, Dennis Quinn, Lester Squires, Patrick Byrnes, Charles Langone, Joseph Thompson, Thomas Lorello, Phillip Moore, Gerard Davan, Peter Woods, Edward Wallace, Edwin Marshall, Mary McMillan, Fred Taylor, Daniel Quirke, Sebastian Santoro, Gerard Pisano, Lawrence Klingener, Orlando Vega, Richard Richard Bruno, William Peters, Gary Robbins, Harry Poole, Atef Moussa, Robert Deforge, Roger Owens, Peter Esposito, Robert Zerilli, Timothy Murphy, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Richard Taylor, Jose Garcia, Frank Russo, John Shurina, David Rowe, Brandon Banfield, Vincent Forras, James Tozzo, Victor Laguer, Michael Serra, Scott Heuer, Walter Jensen, Jose Velasquez, David Shapiro, John Dunn, Jarod Ottley, Thomas Tillotson, Andrew Pecoraino, James Vernicek, Peter Harvey, Joseph Mazzei, Daniel Noonan, Salvatore Pugliese, Peter Romeo, Jr, Robert Toscano, Lori Mazzeo, Israel Morales, Regina Graham, Richard Grande, Michael Duignan, Michelle Pohl, Robert Sabatino, Christopher Bedard, Gerard Quinn, Santo Barraco, Joseph Lupo, Haydee Pabey, Paul Picciano, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Jose M. Burgos, Christopher Bonin, Sr., John Barrett, Victor Leeber, Daniel Raleigh, Gary Theriault, Eric Sacknoff, Robert Stringer, Kenneth Baudanza. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 7, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Kings;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christopher Bonin, Sr.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah H. Kushlefsky on behalf of Brandon Banfield, Santo Barraco, John Barrett, Kenneth Baudanza, Christopher Bedard, Joseph Bellissimo, Christopher Bonin, Jose M. Burgos, Patrick Byrnes, Gerard Davan, Robert Deforge, Michael Duignan, John Dunn, Peter Esposito, James Fearon, Vincent Forras, Peter Fronimakis, Jose Garcia, Craig Giuffre, Karen Gordon, Regina Graham, Richard Grande, Peter Harvey, Scott Heuer, Herbert Hickey, Joseph Hunter, Walter Jensen, Lawrence Klingener, Victor Laguer, Charles Langone, Vincent Laterra, John Layton, Victor Leeber, Thomas Lorello, Joseph Lupo, Vishnu Maharaj, Edwin Marshall, Joseph Mazzei, Lori Mazzeo, Mary McMillan, Phillip Moore, Israel Morales, Atef Moussa, Timothy Murphy, Daniel Noonan, Kenneth Olsen, Edward Opfer, Jarod Ottley, Roger Owens, Haydee Pabey, Peter Panayiotou, Andrew Pecoraino, Frank Perniciaro, William Peters, Paul Picciano, Gerard Pisano, Michelle Pohl, Harry Poole, Salvatore Pugliese, Dennis Quinn, Gerard Quinn, Daniel Quirke, Daniel Raleigh, Gilbert Ramirez, Christopher Reinhard, Robert Reinhardt, Richard Richard Bruno, Gary Robbins, Peter Romeo, Jr, David Rowe, Frank Russo, Robert Sabatino, Eric Sacknoff, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Sebastian Santoro, Philip Scarfi, Luigi Scorcia, Michael Serra, Salvatore Sferrazza, David Shapiro, John Shurina, Lester Squires, Robert Stringer, Fred Taylor, Richard Taylor, Gary Theriault, Joseph Thompson, Thomas Tillotson, Hector Torres, Robert Toscano, James Tozzo, Edward Trentacosta, Orlando Vega, Jose Velasquez, James Vernicek, Edward Wallace, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Alice Winkler, Peter Woods, Robert Zerilli. (Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Brandon Banfield, Santo Barraco, John Barrett, Kenneth Baudanza, Christopher Bedard, Joseph Bellissimo, Christopher Bonin, Jose M. Burgos, Patrick Byrnes, Gerard Davan, Robert Deforge, Michael Duignan, John Dunn, Peter Esposito, James Fearon, Vincent Forras, Peter Fronimakis, Jose Garcia, Craig Giuffre, Karen Gordon, Regina Graham, Richard Grande, Peter Harvey, Scott Heuer, Herbert Hickey, Joseph Hunter, Walter Jensen, Lawrence Klingener, Victor Laguer, Charles Langone, Vincent Laterra, John Layton, Victor Leeber, Thomas Lorello, Joseph Lupo, Vishnu Maharaj, Edwin Marshall, Joseph Mazzei, Lori Mazzeo, Mary McMillan, Phillip Moore, Israel Morales, Atef Moussa, Timothy Murphy, Daniel Noonan, Kenneth Olsen, Edward Opfer, Jarod Ottley, Roger Owens, Haydee Pabey, Peter Panayiotou, Andrew Pecoraino, Frank Perniciaro, William Peters, Paul Picciano, Gerard Pisano, Michelle Pohl, Harry Poole, Salvatore Pugliese, Dennis Quinn, Gerard Quinn, Daniel Quirke, Daniel Raleigh, Gilbert Ramirez, Christopher Reinhard, Robert Reinhardt, Richard Richard Bruno, Gary Robbins, Peter Romeo, Jr, David Rowe, Frank Russo, Robert Sabatino, Eric Sacknoff, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Sebastian Santoro, Philip Scarfi, Luigi Scorcia, Michael Serra, Salvatore Sferrazza, David Shapiro, John Shurina, Lester Squires, Robert Stringer, Fred Taylor, Richard Taylor, Gary Theriault, Joseph Thompson, Thomas Tillotson, Hector Torres, Robert Toscano, James Tozzo, Edward Trentacosta, Orlando Vega, Jose Velasquez, James Vernicek, Edward Wallace, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Alice Winkler, Peter Woods, Robert Zerilli.(Kushlefsky, Noah) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Kenneth Olsen, John Layton, Vincent Laterra, Karen Gordon, Joseph Bellissimo, Herbert Hickey, Hector Torres, Edward Trentacosta, Vishnu Maharaj, Peter Fronimakis, Peter Panayiotou, Edward Opfer, James Fearon, Joseph Hunter, Frank Perniciaro, Christopher Reinhard, Salvatore Sferrazza, Craig Giuffre, Luigi Scorcia, Gilbert Ramirez, Philip Scarfi, Alice Winkler, Robert Reinhardt, Dennis Quinn, Lester Squires, Patrick Byrnes, Charles Langone, Joseph Thompson, Thomas Lorello, Phillip Moore, Gerard Davan, Peter Woods, Edward Wallace, Edwin Marshall, Mary McMillan, Fred Taylor, Daniel Quirke, Sebastian Santoro, Gerard Pisano, Lawrence Klingener, Orlando Vega, Richard Richard Bruno, William Peters, Gary Robbins, Harry Poole, Atef Moussa, Robert Deforge, Roger Owens, Peter Esposito, Robert Zerilli, Timothy Murphy, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Richard Taylor, Jose Garcia, Frank Russo, John Shurina, David Rowe, Brandon Banfield, Vincent Forras, James Tozzo, Victor Laguer, Michael Serra, Scott Heuer, Walter Jensen, Jose Velasquez, David Shapiro, John Dunn, Jarod Ottley, Thomas Tillotson, Andrew Pecoraino, James Vernicek, Peter Harvey, Joseph Mazzei, Daniel Noonan, Salvatore Pugliese, Peter Romeo, Jr, Robert Toscano, Lori Mazzeo, Israel Morales, Regina Graham, Richard Grande, Michael Duignan, Michelle Pohl, Robert Sabatino, Christopher Bedard, Gerard Quinn, Santo Barraco, Joseph Lupo, Haydee Pabey, Paul Picciano, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Jose M. Burgos, Christopher Bonin, John Barrett, Victor Leeber, Daniel Raleigh, Gary Theriault, Eric Sacknoff, Robert Stringer, Kenneth Baudanza. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kushlefsky, Noah) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 5, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John Layton, Vincent Laterra, Karen Gordon, Joseph Bellissimo, Herbert Hickey, Peter Fronimakis, James Fearon, Joseph Hunter, Craig Giuffre, Patrick Byrnes, Charles Langone, Thomas Lorello, Gerard Davan, Lawrence Klingener, Robert Deforge, Peter Esposito, Jose Garcia, Brandon Banfield, Vincent Forras, Victor Laguer, Scott Heuer, Walter Jensen, John Dunn, Peter Harvey, Regina Graham, Richard Grande, Michael Duignan, Christopher Bedard, Santo Barraco, Joseph Lupo, Jose M. Burgos, Christopher Bonin, John Barrett, Victor Leeber, Kenneth Baudanza, Jose Velasquez, Daniel Quirke, Lori Mazzeo, Timothy Murphy, David Shapiro, Gerard Quinn, Mary McMillan, Dennis Quinn, Peter Woods, Fred Taylor, Christopher Reinhard, Harry Poole, Vishnu Maharaj, Richard Taylor, Philip Scarfi, Michelle Pohl, Edwin Marshall, Gilbert Ramirez, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Joseph Thompson, Salvatore Sferrazza, Gary Theriault, Edward Trentacosta, Robert Toscano, William Peters, Edward Opfer, Kenneth Olsen, David Rowe, Daniel Noonan, Gerard Pisano, Jarod Ottley, Robert Zerilli, John Shurina, James Tozzo, Israel Morales, Andrew Pecoraino, Michael Serra, Orlando Vega, Robert Reinhardt, Roger Owens, Salvatore Pugliese, Sebastian Santoro, Robert Sabatino, Frank Perniciaro, Luigi Scorcia, Frank Russo, Edward Wallace, Daniel Raleigh, Eric Sacknoff, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Lester Squires, James Vernicek, Peter Panayiotou, Peter Romeo, Jr, Paul Picciano, Haydee Pabey, Joseph Mazzei, Phillip Moore, Thomas Tillotson, Hector Torres, Robert Stringer, Richard Richard Bruno, Atef Moussa, Alice Winkler, Gary Robbins added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by John Layton, Vincent Laterra, Karen Gordon, Joseph Bellissimo, Herbert Hickey, Peter Fronimakis, James Fearon, Joseph Hunter, Craig Giuffre, Patrick Byrnes, Charles Langone, Thomas Lorello, Gerard Davan, Lawrence Klingener, Robert Deforge, Peter Esposito, Jose Garcia, Brandon Banfield, Vincent Forras, Victor Laguer, Scott Heuer, Walter Jensen, John Dunn, Peter Harvey, Regina Graham, Richard Grande, Michael Duignan, Christopher Bedard, Santo Barraco, Joseph Lupo, Jose M. Burgos, Christopher Bonin, John Barrett, Victor Leeber, Kenneth Baudanza, Jose Velasquez, Daniel Quirke, Lori Mazzeo, Timothy Murphy, David Shapiro, Gerard Quinn, Mary McMillan, Dennis Quinn, Peter Woods, Fred Taylor, Christopher Reinhard, Harry Poole, Vishnu Maharaj, Richard Taylor, Philip Scarfi, Michelle Pohl, Edwin Marshall, Gilbert Ramirez, Lynne Sanderson-Burgess, Joseph Thompson, Salvatore Sferrazza, Gary Theriault, Edward Trentacosta, Robert Toscano, William Peters, Edward Opfer, Kenneth Olsen, David Rowe, Daniel Noonan, Gerard Pisano, Jarod Ottley, Robert Zerilli, John Shurina, James Tozzo, Israel Morales, Andrew Pecoraino, Michael Serra, Orlando Vega, Robert Reinhardt, Roger Owens, Salvatore Pugliese, Sebastian Santoro, Robert Sabatino, Frank Perniciaro, Luigi Scorcia, Frank Russo, Edward Wallace, Daniel Raleigh, Eric Sacknoff, Maria Ward-Bourdis, Lester Squires, James Vernicek, Peter Panayiotou, Peter Romeo, Jr, Paul Picciano, Haydee Pabey, Joseph Mazzei, Phillip Moore, Thomas Tillotson, Hector Torres, Robert Stringer, Richard Richard Bruno, Atef Moussa, Alice Winkler, Gary Robbins. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16006526)Document filed by John Layton, Vincent Laterra, Karen Gordon, Joseph Bellissimo, Herbert Hickey, Vincent Forras, Brandon Banfield, Peter Fronimakis, Victor Laguer, James Fearon, Joseph Hunter, Scott Heuer, Walter Jensen, Craig Giuffre, John Dunn, Peter Harvey, Patrick Byrnes, Charles Langone, Thomas Lorello, Gerard Davan, Regina Graham, Michael Duignan, Richard Grande, Lawrence Klingener, Christopher Bedard, Joseph Lupo, Santo Barraco, Jose M. Burgos, Robert Deforge, Peter Esposito, Christopher Bonin, John Barrett, Victor Leeber, Jose Garcia, Kenneth Baudanza. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kushlefsky, Noah) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banfield et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Jensen
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Burgos
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Toscano
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barrett
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Richard Bruno
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reinhardt
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Pugliese
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zerilli
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hunter
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Sanderson-Burgess
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mazzei
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Picciano
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Scarfi
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Scorcia
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shapiro
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Olsen
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pecoraino
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shurina
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Layton
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Marshall
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Vernicek
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Morales
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Giuffre
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Serra
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Klingener
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lupo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Baudanza
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Russo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Esposito
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Heuer
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Quirke
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Torres
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Duignan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tillotson
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Graham
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Sacknoff
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Quinn
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Trentacosta
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Opfer
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Perniciaro
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dunn
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atef Moussa
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Reinhard
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Squires
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Velasquez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Harvey
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bedard
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fearon
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Pisano
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stringer
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Forras
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Theriault
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sabatino
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Grande
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Banfield
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Vega
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Pohl
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haydee Pabey
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Hickey
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarod Ottley
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Fronimakis
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Robbins
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Noonan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Romeo, Jr.,
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Wallace
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Woods
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gordon
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Davan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Langone
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bellissimo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rowe
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ward-Bourdis
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Raleigh
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Panayiotou
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Murphy
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Winkler
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Byrnes
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Santoro
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Sferrazza
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Laguer
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lorello
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Laterra
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Poole
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santo Barraco
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Mazzeo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Moore
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Peters
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Deforge
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Taylor
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McMillan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Leeber
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Quinn
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Owens
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vishnu Maharaj
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tozzo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Ramirez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bonin, Sr.
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Sr., Christopher Bonin
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?