Abbey et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Maureen Crowe-Freno, Denise A. Harris, Adria Heinrich, Kala Jones, Daniel Posner, Florence Meier, John Russo, Roseanne Seminara, Patricia Smith, Barbara Grace, Elizabeth Burke, Lois Forlenza, Thomas Estella, Elise Kurlowicz, Theresa O'Brien, Martin Weiss, Camille Reinhold, Joel Esposito, Angela Stancarone, Lisa Winckler, Maria Cheung, Rebecca Nunberg, Robert Roganti, Dmitry Berman, Anna Thomakas, Thomas Valentin, Bani Sardar, Leon Williams, Theodora Carreras, Patricia Mansfield, Diane Bernstein, Liz Schembeck, Carole Reichert, Vivian Joyner Gray, Susan Agostini, Laura Vislocky, Rebecca Mizrahi, Jonathan Barberi, Barbara DeSouza, Carmen Grau, Verna Ademu-John, Susan Nowick, Michele Belfiore, Svetlana Getselis, Mary Iadanza, Jody Coleman, John Cooke, Barbara Waldron, Druanne Dillon, Adele Cohen, Edgar Salazar, Arkady Getselis, Kevin Burns, Thomas Dowdle, Jr., Vincent Fratta, Dorrie Desanna, James Gerard Robilotti, III, Linda Bauer, Sergio Castanda, Miriam Sanon, Louisa Stuck, Sandra Nussenblatt, Kim Arnita White, Krystalenia DeMasi, Anita Cozza, Millicent Smith, Tina Young, Susan Racz, Jodie Picciano Swanson, Karen Palmer, Jeanne Lippolis, Donald W. Doucette, Tomas Quinones, Paula Cohen, Roberta McNeil, Maggie Morales, Roberto Garay, Stephanie Incontrera, Kerry Rivera, John Heuser, Patricia Maguire, Pilar Araujo, David Holm, Marc Hoffman, Barbara McFall, Annette Ehmer, Patricia Musicaro, Barry Gerenstein, Fran Judkin, Christine Muller, Joanna Blangiardo, Ansar Miah, Alissa Abbey, Fatima Robinson, Caroline Berrios, Michael Dawson, Connie Fensterstock, Elliot Posner, Robert Finch, Susan Cosenza, Linda Diane Bauer, Fran Judkins and Thomas Jr. Dowdle
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11382
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Rebecca Nunberg; David Holm; John Cooke; Laura Vislocky; Barbara Grace; Linda Diane Bauer; Krystalenia DeMasi; Thomas Estella; Leon Williams; Maggie Morales; Carmen Grau; Adele Cohen; Martin Weiss; Sergio Castanda; Svetlana Getselis; Carole Reichert; Kerry Rivera; Fatima Robinson; Patricia Maguire; Denise A. Harris; Kala Jones; Vincent Fratta; Jody Coleman; Florence Meier; Druanne Dillon; Fran Judkins; John Russo; Diane Bernstein; Adria Heinrich; Patricia Smith; Caroline Berrios; Louisa Stuck; Arkady Getselis; Robert Finch; Barbara DeSouza; Anna Thomakas; Roberta McNeil; Vivian Joyner Gray; Donald W. Doucette; Barbara McFall; Patricia Musicaro; Barry Gerenstein; Joanna Blangiardo; Theodora Carreras; Marc Hoffman; Thomas Jr. Dowdle; Lois Forlenza; Paula Cohen; Elise Kurlowicz; Sandra Nussenblatt; Susan Nowick; Lisa Winckler; Alissa Abbey; Maria Cheung; Robert Roganti; Liz Schembeck; Millicent Smith; Edgar Salazar; Roseanne Seminara; Michael Dawson; James Gerard Robilotti, III; Theresa O'Brien; Dorrie Desanna; Mary Iadanza; Barbara Waldron; Thomas Valentin; Elliot Posner; Kevin Burns; Kim Arnita White ; Roberto Garay; Stephanie Incontrera; Camille Reinhold; Miriam Sanon; Maureen Crowe-Freno; Bani Sardar; Rebecca Mizrahi; Christine Muller; Joel Esposito; Jeanne Lippolis; Daniel Posner; Susan Cosenza; Tina Young; Anita Cozza; Elizabeth Burke; Annette Ehmer; Jonathan Barberi; John Heuser; Verna Ademu-John; Jodie Picciano Swanson; Dmitry Berman; Connie Fensterstock; Ansar Miah; Tomas Quinones; Michele Belfiore; Susan Agostini; Angela Stancarone; Karen Palmer; Susan Racz; Patricia Mansfield; Pilar Araujo. (Kreindler, James)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET - WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. Document filed by Rebecca Nunberg; David Holm; John Cooke; Laura Vislocky; Barbara Grace; Linda Diane Bauer; Krystalenia DeMasi; Thomas Estella; Leon Williams; Maggie Morales; Carmen Grau; Adele Cohen; Martin Weiss; Sergio Castanda; Svetlana Getselis; Carole Reichert; Kerry Rivera; Fatima Robinson; Patricia Maguire; Denise A. Harris; Kala Jones; Vincent Fratta; Jody Coleman; Florence Meier; Druanne Dillon; Fran Judkins; John Russo; Diane Bernstein; Adria Heinrich; Patricia Smith; Caroline Berrios; Louisa Stuck; Arkady Getselis; Robert Finch; Barbara DeSouza; Anna Thomakas; Roberta McNeil; Vivian Joyner Gray; Donald W. Doucette; Barbara McFall; Patricia Musicaro; Barry Gerenstein; Joanna Blangiardo; Theodora Carreras; Marc Hoffman; Thomas Jr. Dowdle; Lois Forlenza; Paula Cohen; Elise Kurlowicz; Sandra Nussenblatt; Susan Nowick; Lisa Winckler; Alissa Abbey; Maria Cheung; Robert Roganti; Liz Schembeck; Millicent Smith; Edgar Salazar; Roseanne Seminara; Michael Dawson; James Gerard Robilotti, III; Theresa O'Brien; Dorrie Desanna; Mary Iadanza; Barbara Waldron; Thomas Valentin; Elliot Posner; Kevin Burns; Kim Arnita White ; Roberto Garay; Stephanie Incontrera; Camille Reinhold; Miriam Sanon; Maureen Crowe-Freno; Bani Sardar; Rebecca Mizrahi; Christine Muller; Joel Esposito; Jeanne Lippolis; Daniel Posner; Susan Cosenza; Tina Young; Anita Cozza; Elizabeth Burke; Annette Ehmer; Jonathan Barberi; John Heuser; Verna Ademu-John; Jodie Picciano Swanson; Dmitry Berman; Connie Fensterstock; Ansar Miah; Tomas Quinones; Michele Belfiore; Susan Agostini; Angela Stancarone; Karen Palmer; Susan Racz; Patricia Mansfield; Pilar Araujo. (Kreindler, James) Modified on 1/31/2019 (db).
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Alissa Abbey, Verna Ademu-John, Susan Agostini, Pilar Araujo, Kim Arnita White, Jonathan Barberi, Linda Diane Bauer, Michele Belfiore, Dmitry Berman, Diane Bernstein, Caroline Berrios, Joanna Blangiardo, Elizabeth Burke, Kevin Burns, Theodora Carreras, Sergio Castanda, Maria Cheung, Adele Cohen, Paula Cohen, Jody Coleman, John Cooke, Susan Cosenza, Anita Cozza, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Michael Dawson, Krystalenia DeMasi, Barbara DeSouza, Dorrie Desanna, Druanne Dillon, Donald W. Doucette, Annette Ehmer, Joel Esposito, Thomas Estella, Connie Fensterstock, Robert Finch, Lois Forlenza, Vincent Fratta, Roberto Garay, Barry Gerenstein, Arkady Getselis, Svetlana Getselis, Barbara Grace, Carmen Grau, Denise A. Harris, Adria Heinrich, John Heuser, Marc Hoffman, David Holm, Mary Iadanza, Stephanie Incontrera, Kala Jones, Vivian Joyner Gray, Thomas Jr. Dowdle, Fran Judkins, Elise Kurlowicz, Jeanne Lippolis, Patricia Maguire, Patricia Mansfield, Barbara McFall, Roberta McNeil, Florence Meier, Ansar Miah, Rebecca Mizrahi, Maggie Morales, Christine Muller, Patricia Musicaro, Susan Nowick, Rebecca Nunberg, Sandra Nussenblatt, Theresa O'Brien, Karen Palmer, Jodie Picciano Swanson, Daniel Posner, Elliot Posner, Tomas Quinones, Susan Racz, Carole Reichert, Camille Reinhold, Kerry Rivera, James Gerard Robilotti, III, Fatima Robinson, Robert Roganti, John Russo, Edgar Salazar, Miriam Sanon, Bani Sardar, Liz Schembeck, Roseanne Seminara, Millicent Smith, Patricia Smith, Angela Stancarone, Louisa Stuck, Anna Thomakas, Thomas Valentin, Laura Vislocky, Barbara Waldron, Martin Weiss, Leon Williams, Lisa Winckler, Tina Young.(Green, Justin)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Rebecca Nunberg, David Holm, John Cooke, Laura Vislocky, Barbara Grace, Linda Diane Bauer, Krystalenia DeMasi, Thomas Estella, Leon Williams, Maggie Morales, Carmen Grau, Adele Cohen, Martin Weiss, Sergio Castanda, Svetlana Getselis, Carole Reichert, Kerry Rivera, Fatima Robinson, Patricia Maguire, Denise A. Harris, Kala Jones, Vincent Fratta, Jody Coleman, Florence Meier, Druanne Dillon, Fran Judkins, John Russo, Diane Bernstein, Adria Heinrich, Patricia Smith, Caroline Berrios, Louisa Stuck, Arkady Getselis, Robert Finch, Barbara DeSouza, Anna Thomakas, Roberta McNeil, Vivian Joyner Gray, Donald W. Doucette, Barbara McFall, Patricia Musicaro, Barry Gerenstein, Joanna Blangiardo, Theodora Carreras, Marc Hoffman, Thomas Jr. Dowdle, Lois Forlenza, Paula Cohen, Elise Kurlowicz, Sandra Nussenblatt, Susan Nowick, Lisa Winckler, Alissa Abbey, Maria Cheung, Robert Roganti, Liz Schembeck, Millicent Smith, Edgar Salazar, Roseanne Seminara, Michael Dawson, James Gerard Robilotti, III, Theresa O'Brien, Dorrie Desanna, Mary Iadanza, Barbara Waldron, Thomas Valentin, Elliot Posner, Kevin Burns, Kim Arnita White, Roberto Garay, Stephanie Incontrera, Camille Reinhold, Miriam Sanon, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Bani Sardar, Rebecca Mizrahi, Christine Muller, Joel Esposito, Jeanne Lippolis, Daniel Posner, Susan Cosenza, Tina Young, Anita Cozza, Elizabeth Burke, Annette Ehmer, Jonathan Barberi, John Heuser, Verna Ademu-John, Jodie Picciano Swanson, Dmitry Berman, Connie Fensterstock, Ansar Miah, Tomas Quinones, Michele Belfiore, Susan Agostini, Angela Stancarone, Karen Palmer, Susan Racz, Patricia Mansfield, Pilar Araujo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Green, Justin)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 10, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 10, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 7, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin Timothy Green. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Justin Timothy Green to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Justin Timothy Green to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Timothy Green. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Linda Diane Bauer; Thomas, Jr. Dowdle; Fran Judkins. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MDL-1570 (GBD) (SN). Document filed by Alissa Abbey, Verna Ademu-John, Susan Agostini, Pilar Araujo, Kim Arnita White, Jonathan Barberi, Linda Bauer, Michele Belfiore, Dmitry Berman, Diane Bernstein, Caroline Berrios, Joanna Blangiardo, Elizabeth Burke, Kevin Burns, Theodora Carreras, Sergio Castanda, Maria Cheung, Adele Cohen, Paula Cohen, Jody Coleman, John Cooke, Susan Cosenza, Anita Cozza, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Michael Dawson, Krystalenia DeMasi, Barbara DeSouza, Dorrie Desanna, Druanne Dillon, Donald W. Doucette, Thomas Dowdle, Jr., Annette Ehmer, Joel Esposito, Thomas Estella, Connie Fensterstock, Robert Finch, Lois Forlenza, Vincent Fratta, Roberto Garay, Barry Gerenstein, Arkady Getselis, Svetlana Getselis, Barbara Grace, Carmen Grau, Denise A. Harris, Adria Heinrich, John Heuser, Marc Hoffman, David Holm, Mary Iadanza, Stephanie Incontrera, Kala Jones, Vivian Joyner Gray, Fran Judkin, Elise Kurlowicz, Jeanne Lippolis, Patricia Maguire, Patricia Mansfield, Barbara McFall, Roberta McNeil, Florence Meier, Ansar Miah, Rebecca Mizrahi, Maggie Morales, Christine Muller, Patricia Musicaro, Susan Nowick, Rebecca Nunberg, Sandra Nussenblatt, Theresa O'Brien, Karen Palmer, Jodie Picciano Swanson, Daniel Posner, Elliot Posner, Tomas Quinones, Susan Racz, Carole Reichert, Camille Reinhold, Kerry Rivera, James Gerard Robilotti, III, Fatima Robinson, Robert Roganti, John Russo, Edgar Salazar, Miriam Sanon, Bani Sardar, Liz Schembeck, Roseanne Seminara, Millicent Smith, Patricia Smith, Angela Stancarone, Louisa Stuck, Anna Thomakas, Thomas Valentin, Laura Vislocky, Barbara Waldron, Martin Weiss, Leon Williams, Lisa Winckler, Tina Young.(Green, Justin) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Green, Justin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Rebecca Nunberg, David Holm, John Cooke, Laura Vislocky, Barbara Grace, Linda Bauer, Krystalenia DeMasi, Thomas Estella, Leon Williams, Maggie Morales, Carmen Grau, Adele Cohen, Martin Weiss, Sergio Castanda, Svetlana Getselis, Carole Reichert, Kerry Rivera, Fatima Robinson, Patricia Maguire, Denise A. Harris, Kala Jones, Vincent Fratta, Jody Coleman, Florence Meier, Druanne Dillon, Fran Judkin, John Russo, Diane Bernstein, Adria Heinrich, Patricia Smith, Caroline Berrios, Louisa Stuck, Arkady Getselis, Robert Finch, Barbara DeSouza, Anna Thomakas, Roberta McNeil, Vivian Joyner Gray, Donald W. Doucette, Barbara McFall, Patricia Musicaro, Barry Gerenstein, Joanna Blangiardo, Theodora Carreras, Marc Hoffman, Lois Forlenza, Thomas Dowdle, Jr., Paula Cohen, Elise Kurlowicz, Sandra Nussenblatt, Susan Nowick, Lisa Winckler, Alissa Abbey, Maria Cheung, Robert Roganti, Liz Schembeck, Millicent Smith, Edgar Salazar, Roseanne Seminara, Michael Dawson, James Gerard Robilotti, III, Theresa O'Brien, Dorrie Desanna, Mary Iadanza, Barbara Waldron, Thomas Valentin, Elliot Posner, Kevin Burns, Kim Arnita White, Roberto Garay, Stephanie Incontrera, Camille Reinhold, Miriam Sanon, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Bani Sardar, Rebecca Mizrahi, Christine Muller, Joel Esposito, Jeanne Lippolis, Daniel Posner, Susan Cosenza, Tina Young, Anita Cozza, Elizabeth Burke, Annette Ehmer, Jonathan Barberi, John Heuser, Verna Ademu-John, Jodie Picciano Swanson, Dmitry Berman, Connie Fensterstock, Ansar Miah, Tomas Quinones, Michele Belfiore, Susan Agostini, Angela Stancarone, Karen Palmer, Susan Racz, Patricia Mansfield, Pilar Araujo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Green, Justin) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).
December 6, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners David Holm, John Cooke, Barbara Grace, Linda Bauer, Krystalenia DeMasi, Thomas Estella, Carmen Grau, Adele Cohen, Sergio Castanda, Svetlana Getselis, Patricia Maguire, Denise A. Harris, Kala Jones, Vincent Fratta, Jody Coleman, Florence Meier, Druanne Dillon, Fran Judkin, Diane Bernstein, Adria Heinrich, Caroline Berrios, Arkady Getselis, Robert Finch, Barbara DeSouza, Roberta McNeil, Vivian Joyner Gray, Donald W. Doucette, Barbara McFall, Barry Gerenstein, Joanna Blangiardo, Theodora Carreras, Marc Hoffman, Lois Forlenza, Thomas Dowdle, Jr., Paula Cohen, Elise Kurlowicz, Alissa Abbey, Maria Cheung, Michael Dawson, Dorrie Desanna, Mary Iadanza, Kevin Burns, Roberto Garay, Stephanie Incontrera, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Joel Esposito, Jeanne Lippolis, Susan Cosenza, Anita Cozza, Elizabeth Burke, Annette Ehmer, Jonathan Barberi, John Heuser, Verna Ademu-John, Dmitry Berman, Connie Fensterstock, Michele Belfiore, Susan Agostini, Patricia Mansfield, Pilar Araujo, Roseanne Seminara, Christine Muller, Angela Stancarone, Theresa O'Brien, Liz Schembeck, Patricia Musicaro, Bani Sardar, Louisa Stuck, Edgar Salazar, Ansar Miah, John Russo, Rebecca Mizrahi, Patricia Smith, Tina Young, James Gerard Robilotti, III, Daniel Posner, Jodie Picciano Swanson, Martin Weiss, Karen Palmer, Robert Roganti, Elliot Posner, Rebecca Nunberg, Camille Reinhold, Anna Thomakas, Tomas Quinones, Miriam Sanon, Leon Williams, Kerry Rivera, Kim Arnita White, Millicent Smith, Lisa Winckler, Carole Reichert, Barbara Waldron, Fatima Robinson, Susan Racz, Susan Nowick, Maggie Morales, Thomas Valentin, Sandra Nussenblatt, Laura Vislocky added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by David Holm, John Cooke, Barbara Grace, Linda Bauer, Krystalenia DeMasi, Thomas Estella, Carmen Grau, Adele Cohen, Sergio Castanda, Svetlana Getselis, Patricia Maguire, Denise A. Harris, Kala Jones, Vincent Fratta, Jody Coleman, Florence Meier, Druanne Dillon, Fran Judkin, Diane Bernstein, Adria Heinrich, Caroline Berrios, Arkady Getselis, Robert Finch, Barbara DeSouza, Roberta McNeil, Vivian Joyner Gray, Donald W. Doucette, Barbara McFall, Barry Gerenstein, Joanna Blangiardo, Theodora Carreras, Marc Hoffman, Lois Forlenza, Thomas Dowdle, Jr., Paula Cohen, Elise Kurlowicz, Alissa Abbey, Maria Cheung, Michael Dawson, Dorrie Desanna, Mary Iadanza, Kevin Burns, Roberto Garay, Stephanie Incontrera, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Joel Esposito, Jeanne Lippolis, Susan Cosenza, Anita Cozza, Elizabeth Burke, Annette Ehmer, Jonathan Barberi, John Heuser, Verna Ademu-John, Dmitry Berman, Connie Fensterstock, Michele Belfiore, Susan Agostini, Patricia Mansfield, Pilar Araujo, Roseanne Seminara, Christine Muller, Angela Stancarone, Theresa O'Brien, Liz Schembeck, Patricia Musicaro, Bani Sardar, Louisa Stuck, Edgar Salazar, Ansar Miah, John Russo, Rebecca Mizrahi, Patricia Smith, Tina Young, James Gerard Robilotti, III, Daniel Posner, Jodie Picciano Swanson, Martin Weiss, Karen Palmer, Robert Roganti, Elliot Posner, Rebecca Nunberg, Camille Reinhold, Anna Thomakas, Tomas Quinones, Miriam Sanon, Leon Williams, Kerry Rivera, Kim Arnita White, Millicent Smith, Lisa Winckler, Carole Reichert, Barbara Waldron, Fatima Robinson, Susan Racz, Susan Nowick, Maggie Morales, Thomas Valentin, Sandra Nussenblatt, Laura Vislocky. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Green, Justin)
December 6, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners John Cooke, Linda Bauer, Krystalenia DeMasi, Maria Cheung, Alissa Abbey, Adele Cohen, Sergio Castanda, Michael Dawson, Jody Coleman, Kevin Burns, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Diane Bernstein, Caroline Berrios, Susan Cosenza, Elizabeth Burke, Anita Cozza, Jonathan Barberi, Verna Ademu-John, Dmitry Berman, Joanna Blangiardo, Theodora Carreras, Michele Belfiore, Susan Agostini, Paula Cohen, Pilar Araujo, Svetlana Getselis, Patricia Maguire, Roberto Garay, Kala Jones, David Holm, Donald W. Doucette, Elise Kurlowicz, Stephanie Incontrera, Barbara Grace, Thomas Dowdle, Jr., Mary Iadanza, Vivian Joyner Gray, Jeanne Lippolis, Marc Hoffman, Dorrie Desanna, John Heuser, Barbara DeSouza, Fran Judkin, Arkady Getselis, Roberta McNeil, Denise A. Harris, Barry Gerenstein, Carmen Grau, Lois Forlenza, Druanne Dillon, Annette Ehmer, Robert Finch, Florence Meier, Connie Fensterstock, Adria Heinrich, Vincent Fratta, Patricia Mansfield, Thomas Estella, Joel Esposito, Barbara McFall added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by John Cooke, Linda Bauer, Krystalenia DeMasi, Maria Cheung, Alissa Abbey, Adele Cohen, Sergio Castanda, Michael Dawson, Jody Coleman, Kevin Burns, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Diane Bernstein, Caroline Berrios, Susan Cosenza, Elizabeth Burke, Anita Cozza, Jonathan Barberi, Verna Ademu-John, Dmitry Berman, Joanna Blangiardo, Theodora Carreras, Michele Belfiore, Susan Agostini, Paula Cohen, Pilar Araujo, Svetlana Getselis, Patricia Maguire, Roberto Garay, Kala Jones, David Holm, Donald W. Doucette, Elise Kurlowicz, Stephanie Incontrera, Barbara Grace, Thomas Dowdle, Jr., Mary Iadanza, Vivian Joyner Gray, Jeanne Lippolis, Marc Hoffman, Dorrie Desanna, John Heuser, Barbara DeSouza, Fran Judkin, Arkady Getselis, Roberta McNeil, Denise A. Harris, Barry Gerenstein, Carmen Grau, Lois Forlenza, Druanne Dillon, Annette Ehmer, Robert Finch, Florence Meier, Connie Fensterstock, Adria Heinrich, Vincent Fratta, Patricia Mansfield, Thomas Estella, Joel Esposito, Barbara McFall. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Green, Justin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16008807)Document filed by Caroline Berrios, John Cooke, Linda Bauer, Krystalenia DeMasi, Maria Cheung, Alissa Abbey, Susan Cosenza, Adele Cohen, Anita Cozza, Sergio Castanda, Elizabeth Burke, Michael Dawson, Jonathan Barberi, Verna Ademu-John, Dmitry Berman, Joanna Blangiardo, Jody Coleman, Kevin Burns, Theodora Carreras, Michele Belfiore, Susan Agostini, Maureen Crowe-Freno, Paula Cohen, Diane Bernstein, Pilar Araujo. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Green, Justin) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbey et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Crowe-Freno
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise A. Harris
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adria Heinrich
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kala Jones
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Posner
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Meier
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Russo
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne Seminara
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Smith
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Grace
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Burke
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Forlenza
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Estella
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Kurlowicz
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa O'Brien
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Weiss
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Reinhold
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Esposito
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Stancarone
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Winckler
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cheung
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Nunberg
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Roganti
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitry Berman
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Thomakas
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Valentin
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bani Sardar
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Williams
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodora Carreras
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mansfield
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Bernstein
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Schembeck
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Reichert
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Joyner Gray
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Agostini
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Vislocky
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Mizrahi
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Barberi
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara DeSouza
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Grau
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Ademu-John
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Nowick
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Belfiore
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Getselis
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Iadanza
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Coleman
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cooke
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Waldron
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Druanne Dillon
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adele Cohen
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Salazar
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkady Getselis
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Burns
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dowdle, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Fratta
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorrie Desanna
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gerard Robilotti, III
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bauer
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Castanda
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Sanon
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisa Stuck
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Nussenblatt
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Arnita White
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystalenia DeMasi
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Cozza
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millicent Smith
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Young
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Racz
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Picciano Swanson
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Palmer
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Lippolis
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W. Doucette
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Quinones
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Cohen
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta McNeil
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Morales
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Garay
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Incontrera
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Rivera
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Heuser
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Maguire
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilar Araujo
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Holm
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Hoffman
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara McFall
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Ehmer
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Musicaro
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Gerenstein
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Judkin
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Muller
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Blangiardo
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ansar Miah
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alissa Abbey
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Robinson
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Berrios
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dawson
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Fensterstock
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Posner
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Finch
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cosenza
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Diane Bauer
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Judkins
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jr. Dowdle
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?