Dominici et al v. Rising Sun Construction LLC et al

Plaintiff: Moises Dominici, Manuel Arriola Alvarez, Angel Alvarado, Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols, Juan Marquez, Eddy Garcia, Ismael Hernandez Milian and Renny Rivera Ramirez
Defendant: Brett Steinberg and Rising Sun Construction LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11383
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/21/2019.(mf)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/28/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/3/2016) (mf)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Robert Finkelstein on behalf of Rising Sun Construction LLC. (Finkelstein, Jason)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian L. Gardner on behalf of Brett Steinberg. (Gardner, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian L. Gardner on behalf of Rising Sun Construction LLC. (Gardner, Brian)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Rising Sun Construction LLC served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty Clerk at Secretary of State. Document filed by Ismael Hernandez Milian(on behalf of himself); Eddy Garcia(on behalf of himself); Moises Dominici(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Moises Dominici(on behalf of himself); Juan Marquez(on behalf of himself); Angel Alvarado(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Renny Rivera Ramirez(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols(on behalf of himeself); Manuel Arriola Alvarez(on behalf of himself); Ismael Hernandez Milian(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Angel Alvarado(on behalf of himself); Juan Marquez(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Eddy Garcia(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Manuel Arriola Alvarez(on behalf of similarly situated individuals); Renny Rivera Ramirez(on behalf of himself). (Spasojevich, Lawrence)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rising Sun Construction LLC, Brett Steinberg. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Francis Sullivan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Moises Dominici; Moises Dominici; Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols; Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols; Renny Rivera Ramirez; Renny Rivera Ramirez; Eddy Garcia; Eddy Garcia; Manuel Arriola Alvarez; Manuel Arriola Alvarez; Ismael Hernandez Milian; Ismael Hernandez Milian; Juan Marquez; Juan Marquez; Angel Alvarado; Angel Alvarado. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party text contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rising Sun Construction LLC and Brett Steinberg, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Angel Alvarado(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Angel Alvarado, Manuel Arriola Alvarez, Manuel Arriola Alvarez(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Moises Dominici(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Moises Dominici, Eddy Garcia, Eddy Garcia(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Ismael Hernandez Milian, Ismael Hernandez Milian(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Juan Marquez, Juan Marquez(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols, Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Renny Rivera Ramirez(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Renny Rivera Ramirez. (Sullivan, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sullivan, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rising Sun Construction LLC, Brett Steinberg. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16009590)Document filed by Ismael Hernandez Milian, Eddy Garcia, Moises Dominici(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Moises Dominici, Juan Marquez, Angel Alvarado(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Renny Rivera Ramirez(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols, Manuel Arriola Alvarez, Ismael Hernandez Milian(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Angel Alvarado, Juan Marquez(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Eddy Garcia(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Manuel Arriola Alvarez(on behalf of themselves and similarly situated individuals), Renny Rivera Ramirez.(Sullivan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominici et al v. Rising Sun Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Steinberg
Represented By: Brian L. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rising Sun Construction LLC
Represented By: Jason Robert Finkelstein
Represented By: Brian L. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Dominici
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Arriola Alvarez
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Alvarado
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Polanco Pujols
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Marquez
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Garcia
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Hernandez Milian
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renny Rivera Ramirez
Represented By: James Francis Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?