Feng v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Plaintiff: Yan Feng
Defendant: John F. Kelly, in his official capacity as Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security, James McCament, in his official capacity as Director of USCIS, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services "USCIS", U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, John F. Kelly and James McCament
Case Number: 1:2018cv11448
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/17/2019) (anc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James McCament, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (pc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John F. Kelly, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (pc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and James McCament, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Yan Feng. (Cho, Jae)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security and John F. Kelly, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Yan Feng. (Cho, Jae)
January 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jae Hyung Cho to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'C/o' Error; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and James McCament, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Yan Feng. (Cho, Jae) Modified on 1/7/2019 (dnh).
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security and John F. Kelly, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Yan Feng. (Cho, Jae) Modified on 1/7/2019 (dnh).
January 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jae Hyung Cho to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption title must match what is listed on the complaint. If you cannot fit all the party names, list "et al." after the first listed defendant;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and James McCament, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Yan Feng. (Cho, Jae) Modified on 1/4/2019 (pc).
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security and John F. Kelly, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Yan Feng. (Cho, Jae) Modified on 1/4/2019 (pc).
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cho, Jae)
December 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 10, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jae Hyung Cho. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:0706; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1361; the County code has been modified to Queens. (sj)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jae Hyung Cho to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jae Hyung Cho. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yan Feng; U.S. Department of Homeland Security; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; John F. Kelly; James McCament. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; party name was entered incorrectly. (sj)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yan Feng.(Cho, Jae)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cho, Jae) Modified on 12/10/2018 (sj).
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against John F. Kelly, in his official capacity as Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security, James McCament, in his official capacity as Director of USCIS, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services "USCIS", U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16018708).Document filed by Yan Feng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cho, Jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feng v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly, in his official capacity as Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McCament, in his official capacity as Director of USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services "USCIS"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McCament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Feng
Represented By: Jae Hyung Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?