Sullivan, Jr. v. Hyland Software, Inc.

Plaintiff: Phillip Sullivan, Jr.
Defendant: Hyland Software, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11450
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
0 Judge: James L Cott
1 Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above-captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended through and including February 8, 2019. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendant also agrees to (i) consent to the jurisdiction of the Court, (ii) waive all defenses to invalid service of process and (iii) accept service of the Complaint and all amendments thereon. SO ORDERED. (Hyland Software, Inc. answer due 2/8/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/11/2019) (jca)
January 11, 2019 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
January 11, 2019 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Douglas Witkin on behalf of Hyland Software, Inc.. (Witkin, Eric)
January 7, 2019 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hyland Software, Inc. served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty (Secretary of State). Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
December 18, 2018 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Seelig, Anne)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/17/2018) (jca)
December 10, 2018 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hyland Software, Inc.. (sj)
December 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 10, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 7, 2018 4 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.) Modified on 12/10/2018 (sj).
December 7, 2018 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hyland Software, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr.. (Lee, C.K.)
December 7, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Hyland Software, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16019319)Document filed by Phillip Sullivan, Jr..(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan, Jr. v. Hyland Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Sullivan, Jr.
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Represented By: Anne Melissa Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyland Software, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Douglas Witkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?