Giurca v. Montefiore Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Dan Giurca
Defendant: Montefiore Health System, Inc., Dr. GARY ISHKANIAN, CLAUS VON SCHORN, M.D. Jeffrey Weiss, M.D. Claus Von Schorn and M.D. Gary Ishkanian
Case Number: 1:2018cv11505
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Montefiore Health System, Inc. answer due 3/15/2019; Claus Von Schorn answer due 3/15/2019; Jeffrey Weiss answer due 3/15/2019.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 1/25/2019) (rro)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Montefiore Medicine Academic Health System, Inc. for Montefiore Health System, Inc.. Document filed by Montefiore Health System, Inc..(Sokoly, Benjamin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Benjamin Sokoly dated January 24, 2019. Document filed by Gary Ishkanian, Montefiore Health System, Inc., Claus Von Schorn, Jeffrey Weiss.(Sokoly, Benjamin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Claus Von Schorn. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Weiss. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Montefiore Health System, Inc.. (pc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gary Ishkanian. (pc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GARY ISHKANIAN, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CLAUS VON SCHORN, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JEFFREY WEISS, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Sadowski, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sadowski, Robert)
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Wayne Sadowski to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed separately; summons requests can not be filed as attachments. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Wayne Sadowski to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): INCORRECT BASIS OF JURISDICTION SELECTED. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
December 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Wayne Sadowski. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Claus Von Schorn, Gary Ishkanian. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 11, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sadowski, Robert) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MONTEFIORE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., JEFFREY WEISS, M.D., CLAUS VON SCHORN, M.D., and GARY ISHKANIAN, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dan Giurca. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Summons, #2 Supplement Request for Summons, #3 Supplement Request for Summons)(Sadowski, Robert) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne).
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GARY ISHKANIAN, Montefiore Health System, Inc., CLAUS VON SCHORN, Jeffrey Weiss. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16029825)Document filed by Dan Giurca.(Sadowski, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giurca v. Montefiore Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Sokoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. GARY ISHKANIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUS VON SCHORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Jeffrey Weiss
Represented By: Benjamin Sokoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Claus Von Schorn
Represented By: Benjamin Sokoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Gary Ishkanian
Represented By: Benjamin Sokoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Dan Giurca
Represented By: Robert Wayne Sadowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?