New York Civil Liberties Union v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Featured Case

Plaintiff New York Civil Liberties Union filed a complaint against Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) seeking records on how ICE conducts custody determinations for the people it detains and the outcome of those determinations. Plaintiff's request was in response to news reports that ICE had recently modified its computer-based risk classification assessment algorithm used by officers as part of the custody determination process, which allegedly resulted in a dramatic rise in the number of people currently in ICE detention.

Plaintiff: New York Civil Liberties Union
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2018cv11557
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial status conference on March 8, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. No later than March 1, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint pre-conference letter providing the information requested in the Order at docket entry 10. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/6/2019) (ne)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court's Order and Notice of Initial Conference served on Andrew Krause on January 30, 2019. Service was accepted by Andrew Krause, Assistant U.S. Attorney. Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Austin, Paige)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER M10-468: The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/18) (yv)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/20/2018) (rj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Krause on behalf of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Krause, Andrew)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. Service was accepted by Haojun Li, Civil Clerk. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit)(Austin, Paige)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher T Dunn on behalf of New York Civil Liberties Union. (Dunn, Christopher)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court when service has been executed on Defendant, after which the Court will promptly schedule an initial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/17/2018) (anc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dnh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Austin, Paige)
December 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
December 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paige Austin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union.(Austin, Paige)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Austin, Paige)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16035069)Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Austin, Paige)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16035069)Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Austin, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Civil Liberties Union v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Paige Austin
Represented By: Christopher T Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Andrew Edward Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?