Arias et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Camille Nicole Martin, Karen Zaccaria, Sean P. O'Brien, Maureen F. Bosco, Mary Dwyer, Thomas S. Arias, Barbara A. Laurencin, Samantha Fishman, Silveria Segura, Francisco Stewart, Thomas V. Arias, Margaret Quinn Metz, Ariana Vigiano, Eugene R. Springer, Richard K. Ketler, Francine Michelle Roman, Jeanene McGregor, John David Ketler, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, Jason Springer, Nicolette Vigiano, Jacqueline Yvonne Steed, Maria Vigiano-Trapp, Francine M. Roman, Camille N. Martin, Eugene Springer, John D. Ketler and Jacqueline Y. Steed
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11582
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 12/14/2018, answer due 3/14/2019. Document filed by Richard K. Ketler(individually); Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler); Jeanene McGregor; Eugene Springer; Barbara A. Laurencin(individually); Nicolette Vigiano; Thomas V. Arias; Mary Dwyer; Thomas S. Arias; Sean P. O'Brien; Ariana Vigiano; Francine M. Roman; Maria Vigiano-Trapp; Samantha Fishman; Maureen F. Bosco; Jacqueline Y. Steed; John D. Ketler; Maria Vigiano- Trapp; Margaret Quinn Metz; Silveria Segura(individually); Silveria Segura(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan G. Salas, Deceased); Camille N. Martin; Eugene R. Springer; Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased); Karen Zaccaria; Francisco Stewart; Jason Springer. (Haefele, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Eubanks on behalf of Robert Abraham, Wayne Abrahams, James Abreu, John Actisdano, Cynthia Adam, Thomas Adams, Karl Aepelbacher, Joseph Agri, Vicki Anderson, Eric Ando, Thomas Arias, Claudio Barrera, Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Odland, Elizabeth Parks, Gerard Prior. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Eubanks, John)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting (854) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; granting (4354) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (630) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; granting (160) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; granting (15) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; granting (14) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; granting (13) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; granting (12) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN; granting (5) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN; granting (11) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN; granting (7) Motion for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
January 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (14 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 160 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 14 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 7 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 854 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 4354 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN, 12 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 11 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 5 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 15 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN) MOTION for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16194547. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for John Michael Eubanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16194547. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Abraham, Wayne Abrahams, James Abreu, John Actisdano, Cynthia Adam, Thomas Adams, Karl Aepelbacher, Joseph Agri, Vicki Anderson, Eric Ando, Thomas Arias, Claudio Barrera, Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Odland, Elizabeth Parks, Gerard Prior. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Michael Eubanks, #2 Proposed Order for Admission pro hac vice of John Michael Eubanks)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 13, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 13, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 13, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Richard K. Ketler(individually), Richard K. Ketler(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ruth Ellen Ketler), Jeanene McGregor, Eugene Springer, Barbara A. Laurencin(individually), Nicolette Vigiano, Thomas V. Arias, Mary Dwyer, Thomas S. Arias, Sean P. O'Brien, Ariana Vigiano, Francine M. Roman, Maria Vigiano-Trapp, Samantha Fishman, Maureen F. Bosco, Jacqueline Y. Steed, John D. Ketler, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, Margaret Quinn Metz, Silveria Segura(individually), Silveria Segura(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Juan G. Salas, Deceased), Camille N. Martin, Eugene R. Springer, Barbara A. Laurencin(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Augustus Laurencin, Deceased), Karen Zaccaria, Francisco Stewart, Jason Springer.(Haefele, Robert)
December 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Richard K. Ketler, Jeanene McGregor, Barbara A. Laurencin, Nicolette Vigiano, Thomas V. Arias, Mary Dwyer, Thomas S. Arias, Sean P. O'Brien, Ariana Vigiano, Francine M. Roman, Samantha Fishman, Maureen F. Bosco, Jacqueline Y. Steed, John D. Ketler, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, Margaret Quinn Metz, Silveria Segura, Camille N. Martin, Eugene R. Springer, Karen Zaccaria, Francisco Stewart, Jason Springer, Maria Vigiano-Trapp, Richard K. Ketler, Silveria Segura, Eugene Springer, Barbara A. Laurencin added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Richard K. Ketler, Jeanene McGregor, Barbara A. Laurencin, Nicolette Vigiano, Thomas V. Arias, Mary Dwyer, Thomas S. Arias, Sean P. O'Brien, Ariana Vigiano, Francine M. Roman, Samantha Fishman, Maureen F. Bosco, Jacqueline Y. Steed, John D. Ketler, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, Margaret Quinn Metz, Silveria Segura, Camille N. Martin, Eugene R. Springer, Karen Zaccaria, Francisco Stewart, Jason Springer, Maria Vigiano-Trapp, Richard K. Ketler, Silveria Segura, Eugene Springer, Barbara A. Laurencin. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Haefele, Robert)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Eugene R. Springer, Barbara A. Laurencin, Silveria Segura, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, and Richard K. Ketler must be added to CM ECF a second time, with party text "as personal representative of the estate of..."; all filers were not selected/entered for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Turner Haefele. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Richard K. Ketler, Jeanene McGregor, Barbara A. Laurencin, Nicolette Vigiano, Thomas V. Arias, Mary Dwyer, Thomas S. Arias, Sean P. O'Brien, Ariana Vigiano, Francine Michelle Roman, Samantha Fishman, Maureen F. Bosco, Jacqueline Yvonne Steed, John David Ketler, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, Margaret Quinn Metz, Silveria Segura, Camille Nicole Martin, Eugene R. Springer, Karen Zaccaria, Francisco Stewart, Jason Springer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
December 12, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MD-1570. (pne)
December 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Thomas V. Arias, Thomas S. Arias, Maureen F. Bosco, Mary Dwyer, Samantha Fishman, John David Ketler, Richard K. Ketler, Barbara A. Laurencin, Camille Nicole Martin, Jeanene McGregor, Margaret Quinn Metz, Sean P. O'Brien, Francine Michelle Roman, Silveria Segura, Eugene R. Springer, Jason Springer, Jacqueline Yvonne Steed, Francisco Stewart, Ariana Vigiano, Nicolette Vigiano, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, Karen Zaccaria.(Haefele, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Haefele, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16039249)Document filed by Richard K. Ketler, Jeanene McGregor, Barbara A. Laurencin, Nicolette Vigiano, Thomas V. Arias, Mary Dwyer, Thomas S. Arias, Sean P. O'Brien, Ariana Vigiano, Francine Michelle Roman, Samantha Fishman, Maureen F. Bosco, Jacqueline Yvonne Steed, John David Ketler, Maria Vigiano- Trapp, Margaret Quinn Metz, Silveria Segura, Camille Nicole Martin, Eugene R. Springer, Karen Zaccaria, Francisco Stewart, Jason Springer.(Haefele, Robert) Modified on 12/12/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arias et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Nicole Martin
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Zaccaria
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean P. O'Brien
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen F. Bosco
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Dwyer
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Arias
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Laurencin
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Fishman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silveria Segura
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Stewart
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas V. Arias
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Quinn Metz
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Vigiano
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene R. Springer
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K. Ketler
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Michelle Roman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanene McGregor
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Ketler
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Vigiano- Trapp
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Springer
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolette Vigiano
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Yvonne Steed
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Vigiano-Trapp
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine M. Roman
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille N. Martin
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Springer
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Ketler
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Y. Steed
Represented By: Robert Turner Haefele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?