Deutsch v. JPMorgan Chase & Co et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Deutsch
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co and Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11655
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference is adjourned to March 14, 2019, at 11:45 a.m. all pre-conference materials identified in the December 21, 2018 order shall be due one week prior. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 11:45 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/6/2019) (kv)
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alan E. Schoenfeld dated February 5, 2019. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Scheduling Order)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alan E. Schoenfeld dated February 1, 2019. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Estefania Luna in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CMA70784, #2 Exhibit 2 - CFB00476)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/08/2019) (ama)
January 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: JPMorgan Chase & Co answer due 2/1/2019. (ama)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alan E. Schoenfeld dated January 7, 2019. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase & Co. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co.(Schoenfeld, Alan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/21/2018) (jwh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (dnh)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase & Co. (dnh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael J. Deutsch. (Eisemann, Alexander)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael J. Deutsch. (Eisemann, Alexander)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase & Co., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael J. Deutsch. (Eisemann, Alexander)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander Edward Eisemann. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JPMorgan Chase & Co. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Edward Eisemann. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1000000000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1000000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Edward Eisemann to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): attorney information was omitted on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael J. Deutsch. (Eisemann, Alexander) Modified on 12/14/2018 (jgo).
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael J. Deutsch. (Eisemann, Alexander) Modified on 12/14/2018 (jgo).
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase & Co., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael J. Deutsch. (Eisemann, Alexander) Modified on 12/14/2018 (jgo).
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eisemann, Alexander)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase & Co, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16050309)Document filed by Michael J. Deutsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chase letter holding plaintiff responsible for fraudulent charges)(Eisemann, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsch v. JPMorgan Chase & Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Deutsch
Represented By: Alexander Edward Eisemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?