Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd. v. Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd.
Defendant: Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11688
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:294
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defense counsel shall appear for the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 14, 2019, by calling Chambers at (212) 805-0288 from a landline. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/5/2019) (jca)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Hillel I. Parness dated February 4, 2019 re: Scheduling Request or Permission to Participate by Telephone. Document filed by Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Parness, Hillel)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Response to Motion, filed by Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference is adjourned from February 7, 2019, to February 14, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. (Initial Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/4/2019) (cf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Hillel I. Parness dated February 1, 2019 re: #9 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Thomas J. Fleming dated January 28, 2019. Also includes rescheduling request on consent.. Document filed by Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Parness, Hillel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Thomas J. Fleming dated January 31, 2019 re: 12/21/2018 Court Order Dkt # 6 - Case Management Plan. Document filed by Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Fleming, Thomas)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Conference. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall file a response to this letter by February 1, 2019. Plaintiff's pre-motion letter and Defendant's letter in response will be discussed at the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 7, 2019. The parties are reminded to file their joint letter and proposed case management plan by January 31, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/29/2019) (ks)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Thomas J. Fleming dated January 28, 2019. Document filed by Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd..(Fleming, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Parness, Hillel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Parness, Hillel)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/21/2018) (jca)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (pne)
December 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IMMUNE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd.. (Fleming, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd..(Fleming, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16053037)Document filed by Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Convertible Note)(Fleming, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd. v. Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immune Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Hillel Ira Parness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?