Simon v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Simon
Defendant: FCA US LLC, John Doe 1-10, ABC Corp 123 and FCA Group
Case Number: 1:2018cv11690
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION TO AMEND CAPTION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the above caption is amended to delete FCA Group, as Defendant. The parties have stipulated to withdraw all allegations in the Complaint referring to Defendant FCA Group as named Defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to modify the caption of this case to confirm with the modified caption that the parties provide in the stipulation. SO ORDERED. (FCA Group terminated.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/4/2019) (anc)
January 31, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jessica L. Gross dated 01/31/19 re: Stipulation to Amend Caption. Document filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Amend Caption)(Gross, Jessica)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Except for amendments permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) and this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases ("Individual Rules"), amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the dare of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Depositions due by 4/18/2019. Expert Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Motions due by 9/16/2019. The joint pretrial order shall be due 30 days from the close of discovery, or if any dispositive motion is filed, 21 days from the Court's decision on such motion. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 1 1/2 weeks. Status Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/30/2019) (anc)
January 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/30/2019. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) (Daniels, Anthony)
January 24, 2019 Received Return Receipt of #17 Order, as to Matthew Simon, which was served by Certified Mail # 70172680000010259941, on 1/19/2019. (vn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jessica L. Gross dated 1/23/19 re: Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Woods' Individual Rules. Document filed by FCA US LLC.(Gross, Jessica)
January 18, 2019 Received Return Receipt of #14 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #15 Order, Set Deadlines, as to Matthew Simon, which was served by Certified Mail # 70172680000010259880, on 1/15/2019. (vn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Matthew C. Simon, Esq. dated 1/10/2019 re: This letter confirms that Plaintiff will not be making a motion to remand this case. Document filed by Matthew Simon.(anc)
January 16, 2019 Mailed a copy of #17 Order, to Matthew Simon 19 Carteret Street Montclair, Nj 07043 by Certified Mail #: 7017 2680 0000 1025 9941. (aea) Modified on 1/16/2019 (aea).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On January 7, 2019, the Court granted Plaintiff leave to file a motion to remand. Dkt. No. 15. The Court ordered Plaintiff to submit his motion by January 14, 2019. Id. That date has passed and Plaintiff has not submitted his motion. Accordingly, the Court understands that Plaintiff will not file such a motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff by certified mail. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/15/2019) (js) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 7, 2019 Received Return Receipt of Mail Order by Certified Mail as to Matthew Simon 19 Carteret Street Montclair, Nj 07043, which was served by Certified Mail # 7017 2680 0000 1025 9835, on 1/2/2019. (aea)
January 7, 2019 Mailed a copy of #14 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #15 Order, Set Deadlines, to Matthew Simon 19 Carteret Street Montclair, Nj 07043 by Certified Mail # 7017 2680 0000 1025 9880 with Return Receipt Requested. (aea)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the teleconference held on January 4, 2019, Plaintiff is granted leave to file a motion to remand. Plaintiff's motion is due no later than January 14, 2019. Defendants' opposition is due no later than January 23, 2019. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due no later than January 29, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff by certified mail. ( Motions due by 1/14/2019., Responses due by 1/23/2019, Replies due by 1/29/2019.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/4/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 1/4/2019. (Daniels, Anthony)
January 4, 2019 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #14 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (anc)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff by certified mail. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/4/2019) (anc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Matthew C. Simon, Esq. dated 12/27/2018 re: I am in receipt of Your Honor's Court Order, dated 12/19/2018. Please be advised that Plaintiff requests a trial by jury. Document filed by Matthew Simon.(anc)
December 28, 2018 Mailed a copy of #12 Memo Endorsement, Set Hearings, to Matthew Simon 19 Carteret Street Montclair, Nj 07043 by certified mail # 7017 2680 0000 1025 9835 with Return Receipt Requested. (aea) Modified on 12/28/2018 (aea).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER M10-468: The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/2018) (mro)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's letter. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Plaintiff's letter motion on January 4, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. To the extent that this letter is presented as Plaintiff's motion to remand this case, Plaintiff is directed to comply in the future with the Court's Individual Rules, in particular Rule 2(C), which requires parties to file pre-motion submissions. Plaintiff is also directed to review comply with the Local Rules of this Court, including Local Rule 7.1. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff by certified mail. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/26/2018) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maureen Doerner Fogel on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Fogel, Maureen)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Maureen Doerner Fogel dated 12/21/18 re: Response to Mr. Simon's letter dated 12-17-18. Document filed by FCA US LLC.(Fogel, Maureen)
December 20, 2018 Mailed a copy of #8 Order, to Matthew Simon 19 Carteret Street Montclair, Nj 07043. (aea)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Matthew C. Simon dated 12/17/2018 re: Please accept this letter as Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Removal to Federal Court. (cf)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than December 31, 2018. Plaintiff is directed to consult Rule 2.2(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York for instructions on how to apply to become an ECF filer (http:/nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php). Defendants are directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff and to retain proof of service. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff by certified mail. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/19/2018) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 14, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents FCA Group added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal.Document filed by FCA Group. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal.(Gross, Jessica)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Chrysler Group LLC, Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US LLC. Document filed by FCA US LLC.(Gross, Jessica)
December 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jessica Leigh Gross re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; FCA Group must be added to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (pne)
December 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jessica Leigh Gross to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 81. Document filed by FCA US LLC.(Gross, Jessica)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FCA US LLC.(Gross, Jessica) Modified on 12/14/2018 (lb).
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by FCA US LLC(Gross, Jessica)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gross, Jessica)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 158430/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16053325).Document filed by FCA US LLC.(Gross, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Gross
Represented By: Maureen Doerner Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp 123
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA Group
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?