Aucoin et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: John Simadis, Evelyn Torres, Edward Springer, George Gagnon, Nora Rosa, Francisco Navarro, Miriam Smith, Manuel Rivera, Thomas Bartkowski, Rosalind Henry, Benito Guerrero, Roy Edmonds, Richard Saccomagno, Blaise DelBianco, Larry Delgrosso, Brian Tuthill, Jon Basirico, Khalil Rahawi, Colin Gillis, Juan Cubero, Gloria Ramirez, Joseph Curcio, Filomena Martin, John Channell, Thomas Dunne, Dennis Maher, Bartholomew Daddato, Felix Torres, Daniel Loeb, John Nunez, Mitchel Weitz, Eddie Reyes, Vincent Masci, Steven Ross, Mark Lanigan, James Willsen, Kevin Costigan, Daniel Sarrubbo, Christopher Meehan, Mary Ryan, Denis O'Connor, Charles Hardy, Mei Qin Zheng, David Hamilton, Robert Aucoin, Timothy Post, Ford Weiner, Robert Singer, Rinella Binns-Harty, Joseph Roman, Thomas Caldwell, Mark Boyd, Vincent Slavik, Gerard Smith, Richard Oury, Christopher Outhouse, Steven Treco, Chris Clark, Michael Myles, Veronica Robertson, William Perry, Jr., James Rohan, Ferro Paul, Barbara Lopez, Burgos M. Jose, William Hammond, Herns Mitton, Vibert Ridley, Francis Fagan, Albert Greene, Joseph O'Donnell, John Xenakis, William Hale, Samuel Moreno, John McLean, Flor Sanchez, Willie Quattlebaum, Dymphna Farrell, Gloria Tatum, Fanny Diaz, Frank D'Amato, Carole Fuoco-Pokonski, Robert Birmingham, Drew Palmer, Kim Waters, John Butcher, Patrick Whalen, Thomas Hoy, Tiara Jackson, Christopher McCormack, Fabrizio Bivona, Robert Hellmers, Robert Berkowitz, Mark Doran, Joseph Haviland, Sandra Draves, Philip Gambino, Annette Roman, Peter Defeo, Donald Hoffman and Jose M. Burgos
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11803
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Miriam Smith; Philip Gambino; George Gagnon; Blaise DelBianco; Robert Birmingham; Thomas Dunne; Mitchel Weitz; Thomas Hoy; Khalil Rahawi; Bartholomew Daddato; Evelyn Torres; Ford Weiner; Juan Cubero; Roy Edmonds; Samuel Moreno; Vincent Masci; Robert Singer; Peter Defeo; Timothy Post; William Perry, Jr; Willie Quattlebaum; Filomena Martin; John Xenakis; Gloria Ramirez; Eddie Reyes; Jose M. Burgos; Carole Fuoco-Pokonski; Brian Tuthill; Albert Greene; Tiara Jackson; John Butcher; Mark Lanigan; Richard Saccomagno; Veronica Robertson; Manuel Rivera; Gerard Smith; James Willsen; Dymphna Farrell; Felix Torres; Gloria Tatum; Daniel Sarrubbo; Joseph Roman; William Hammond; Edward Springer; Annette Roman; Joseph Haviland; Thomas Caldwell; Dennis Maher; Kevin Costigan; Christopher Meehan; Mary Ryan; Daniel Loeb; Frank D'Amato; John Simadis; John McLean; Kim Waters; Robert Aucoin; Joseph Curcio; Steven Ross; Ferro Paul; Sandra Draves; Herns Mitton; Francis Fagan; Charles Hardy; Chris Clark; Joseph O'Donnell; Barbara Lopez; Christopher Outhouse; Flor Sanchez; Mark Doran; Michael Myles; Mei Qin Zheng; John Nunez; Francisco Navarro; Vibert Ridley; Christopher McCormack; Larry Delgrosso; Robert Hellmers; Fanny Diaz; John Channell; Steven Treco; James Rohan; Rinella Binns-Harty; Benito Guerrero; Thomas Bartkowski; Richard Oury; Nora Rosa; Mark Boyd; Donald Hoffman; Fabrizio Bivona; David Hamilton; Jon Basirico; Colin Gillis; William Hale; Denis O'Connor; Rosalind Henry; Drew Palmer; Vincent Slavik; Patrick Whalen; Robert Berkowitz. (Kreindler, James)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 9, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jose M. Burgos; William Perry, Jr.; Mary Ryan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Miriam Smith, Philip Gambino, George Gagnon, Blaise DelBianco, Robert Birmingham, Thomas Dunne, Mitchel Weitz, Thomas Hoy, Khalil Rahawi, Bartholomew Daddato, Evelyn Torres, Ford Weiner, Juan Cubero, Roy Edmonds, Samuel Moreno, Vincent Masci, Robert Singer, Peter Defeo, Timothy Post, William Perry, Jr, Willie Quattlebaum, Filomena Martin, John Xenakis, Gloria Ramirez, Eddie Reyes, Burgos M. Jose, Carole Fuoco-Pokonski, Brian Tuthill, Albert Greene, Tiara Jackson, John Butcher, Mark Lanigan, Richard Saccomagno, Veronica Robertson, Manuel Rivera, Gerard Smith, James Willsen, Dymphna Farrell, Felix Torres, Gloria Tatum, Daniel Sarrubbo, Joseph Roman, William Hammond, Edward Springer, Annette Roman, Joseph Haviland, Thomas Caldwell, Dennis Maher, Kevin Costigan, Christopher Meehan, Mary Ryan, Daniel Loeb, Frank D'Amato, John Simadis, John McLean, Kim Waters, Robert Aucoin, Joseph Curcio, Steven Ross, Ferro Paul, Sandra Draves, Herns Mitton, Francis Fagan, Charles Hardy, Chris Clark, Joseph O'Donnell, Barbara Lopez, Christopher Outhouse, Flor Sanchez, Mark Doran, Michael Myles, Mei Qin Zheng, John Nunez, Francisco Navarro, Vibert Ridley, Christopher McCormack, Larry Delgrosso, Robert Hellmers, Fanny Diaz, John Channell, Steven Treco, James Rohan, Rinella Binns-Harty, Benito Guerrero, Thomas Bartkowski, Richard Oury, Nora Rosa, Mark Boyd, Donald Hoffman, Fabrizio Bivona, David Hamilton, Jon Basirico, Colin Gillis, William Hale, Denis O'Connor, Rosalind Henry, Drew Palmer, Vincent Slavik, Patrick Whalen, Robert Berkowitz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kushlefsky, Noah) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jgo).
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Robert Aucoin, Thomas Bartkowski, Jon Basirico, Robert Berkowitz, Rinella Binns-Harty, Robert Birmingham, Fabrizio Bivona, Mark Boyd, John Butcher, Thomas Caldwell, John Channell, Chris Clark, Kevin Costigan, Juan Cubero, Joseph Curcio, Frank D'Amato, Bartholomew Daddato, Peter Defeo, Blaise DelBianco, Larry Delgrosso, Fanny Diaz, Mark Doran, Sandra Draves, Thomas Dunne, Roy Edmonds, Francis Fagan, Dymphna Farrell, Carole Fuoco-Pokonski, George Gagnon, Philip Gambino, Colin Gillis, Albert Greene, Benito Guerrero, William Hale, David Hamilton, William Hammond, Charles Hardy, Joseph Haviland, Robert Hellmers, Rosalind Henry, Donald Hoffman, Thomas Hoy, Tiara Jackson, Burgos M. Jose, Mark Lanigan, Daniel Loeb, Barbara Lopez, Dennis Maher, Filomena Martin, Vincent Masci, Christopher McCormack, John McLean, Christopher Meehan, Herns Mitton, Samuel Moreno, Michael Myles, Francisco Navarro, John Nunez, Denis O'Connor, Joseph O'Donnell, Richard Oury, Christopher Outhouse, Drew Palmer, Ferro Paul, William Perry, Jr, Timothy Post, Willie Quattlebaum, Khalil Rahawi, Gloria Ramirez, Eddie Reyes, Vibert Ridley, Manuel Rivera, Veronica Robertson, James Rohan, Annette Roman, Joseph Roman, Nora Rosa, Steven Ross, Mary Ryan, Richard Saccomagno, Flor Sanchez, Daniel Sarrubbo, John Simadis, Robert Singer, Vincent Slavik, Gerard Smith, Miriam Smith, Edward Springer, Gloria Tatum, Evelyn Torres, Felix Torres, Steven Treco, Brian Tuthill, Kim Waters, Ford Weiner, Mitchel Weitz, Patrick Whalen, James Willsen, John Xenakis, Mei Qin Zheng.(Kushlefsky, Noah) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jgo).
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 17, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Philip Gambino, George Gagnon, Blaise DelBianco, Robert Birmingham, Thomas Dunne, Bartholomew Daddato, Juan Cubero, Roy Edmonds, Peter Defeo, Burgos M. Jose, Carole Fuoco-Pokonski, Albert Greene, John Butcher, Dymphna Farrell, William Hammond, Joseph Haviland, Thomas Caldwell, Kevin Costigan, Frank D'Amato, Robert Aucoin, Joseph Curcio, Ferro Paul, Sandra Draves, Francis Fagan, Charles Hardy, Chris Clark, Mark Doran, Larry Delgrosso, Robert Hellmers, Fanny Diaz, John Channell, Rinella Binns-Harty, Benito Guerrero, Thomas Bartkowski, Mark Boyd, Fabrizio Bivona, David Hamilton, Jon Basirico, Colin Gillis, William Hale, Rosalind Henry, Robert Berkowitz, Gloria Ramirez, Mark Lanigan, Manuel Rivera, Vincent Masci, Edward Springer, Khalil Rahawi, Daniel Loeb, Willie Quattlebaum, Steven Treco, Veronica Robertson, William Perry, Jr, Donald Hoffman, Brian Tuthill, Robert Singer, Drew Palmer, Thomas Hoy, Vibert Ridley, Daniel Sarrubbo, Ford Weiner, Miriam Smith, Kim Waters, Mei Qin Zheng, James Willsen, Joseph O'Donnell, Christopher Meehan, John McLean, Steven Ross, Christopher McCormack, Christopher Outhouse, Herns Mitton, Gloria Tatum, John Xenakis, Dennis Maher, John Nunez, Gerard Smith, James Rohan, Samuel Moreno, Timothy Post, John Simadis, Richard Saccomagno, Denis O'Connor, Vincent Slavik, Mary Ryan, Eddie Reyes, Flor Sanchez, Evelyn Torres, Francisco Navarro, Nora Rosa, Richard Oury, Michael Myles, Tiara Jackson, Barbara Lopez, Mitchel Weitz, Patrick Whalen, Felix Torres, Annette Roman, Filomena Martin, Joseph Roman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Philip Gambino, George Gagnon, Blaise DelBianco, Robert Birmingham, Thomas Dunne, Bartholomew Daddato, Juan Cubero, Roy Edmonds, Peter Defeo, Burgos M. Jose, Carole Fuoco-Pokonski, Albert Greene, John Butcher, Dymphna Farrell, William Hammond, Joseph Haviland, Thomas Caldwell, Kevin Costigan, Frank D'Amato, Robert Aucoin, Joseph Curcio, Ferro Paul, Sandra Draves, Francis Fagan, Charles Hardy, Chris Clark, Mark Doran, Larry Delgrosso, Robert Hellmers, Fanny Diaz, John Channell, Rinella Binns-Harty, Benito Guerrero, Thomas Bartkowski, Mark Boyd, Fabrizio Bivona, David Hamilton, Jon Basirico, Colin Gillis, William Hale, Rosalind Henry, Robert Berkowitz, Gloria Ramirez, Mark Lanigan, Manuel Rivera, Vincent Masci, Edward Springer, Khalil Rahawi, Daniel Loeb, Willie Quattlebaum, Steven Treco, Veronica Robertson, William Perry, Jr, Donald Hoffman, Brian Tuthill, Robert Singer, Drew Palmer, Thomas Hoy, Vibert Ridley, Daniel Sarrubbo, Ford Weiner, Miriam Smith, Kim Waters, Mei Qin Zheng, James Willsen, Joseph O'Donnell, Christopher Meehan, John McLean, Steven Ross, Christopher McCormack, Christopher Outhouse, Herns Mitton, Gloria Tatum, John Xenakis, Dennis Maher, John Nunez, Gerard Smith, James Rohan, Samuel Moreno, Timothy Post, John Simadis, Richard Saccomagno, Denis O'Connor, Vincent Slavik, Mary Ryan, Eddie Reyes, Flor Sanchez, Evelyn Torres, Francisco Navarro, Nora Rosa, Richard Oury, Michael Myles, Tiara Jackson, Barbara Lopez, Mitchel Weitz, Patrick Whalen, Felix Torres, Annette Roman, Filomena Martin, Joseph Roman. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16064933)Document filed by Philip Gambino, George Gagnon, Blaise DelBianco, Robert Birmingham, Thomas Dunne, Joseph Curcio, Robert Aucoin, Bartholomew Daddato, Ferro Paul, Juan Cubero, Roy Edmonds, Sandra Draves, Francis Fagan, Charles Hardy, Peter Defeo, Chris Clark, Mark Doran, Burgos M. Jose, Carole Fuoco-Pokonski, Albert Greene, John Butcher, Robert Hellmers, Larry Delgrosso, John Channell, Fanny Diaz, Dymphna Farrell, Rinella Binns-Harty, William Hammond, Thomas Bartkowski, Benito Guerrero, Mark Boyd, Joseph Haviland, Thomas Caldwell, Kevin Costigan, David Hamilton, Fabrizio Bivona, Jon Basirico, Colin Gillis, William Hale, Rosalind Henry, Frank D'Amato, Robert Berkowitz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kushlefsky, Noah) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aucoin et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Simadis
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Torres
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Springer
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gagnon
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Rosa
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Navarro
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Smith
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Rivera
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bartkowski
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Henry
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Guerrero
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Edmonds
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Saccomagno
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaise DelBianco
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Delgrosso
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Tuthill
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Basirico
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalil Rahawi
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Gillis
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Cubero
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ramirez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Curcio
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filomena Martin
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Channell
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dunne
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Maher
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartholomew Daddato
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Torres
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Loeb
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nunez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchel Weitz
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Reyes
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Masci
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ross
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lanigan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Willsen
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Costigan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sarrubbo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Meehan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ryan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis O'Connor
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hardy
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mei Qin Zheng
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hamilton
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Aucoin
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Post
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Weiner
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Singer
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rinella Binns-Harty
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Roman
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Caldwell
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Boyd
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Slavik
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Smith
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Oury
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Outhouse
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Treco
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Clark
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Myles
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Robertson
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Perry, Jr.
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rohan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferro Paul
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lopez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burgos M. Jose
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hammond
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herns Mitton
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vibert Ridley
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Fagan
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Greene
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph O'Donnell
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Xenakis
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hale
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Moreno
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McLean
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Sanchez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Quattlebaum
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dymphna Farrell
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Tatum
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanny Diaz
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank D'Amato
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Fuoco-Pokonski
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Birmingham
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Palmer
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Waters
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Butcher
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Whalen
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hoy
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiara Jackson
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McCormack
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabrizio Bivona
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hellmers
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Berkowitz
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Doran
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Haviland
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Draves
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Gambino
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Roman
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Defeo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hoffman
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Burgos
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?